Nevada Star Resource et al v. Angrisano et al

Plaintiff: Pure Nickel and Nevada Star Resource
Counter_claimant: Robert Angrisano and Monty D. Moore
Defendant: Robert Angrisano and Monty D. Moore
Counter_defendant: Nevada Star Resource and Pure Nickel
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00618
Filed: April 4, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltfs' 68 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
December 12, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking 84 Stipulated Protective Order by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(TF)
December 24, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TF)
February 5, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking dfts' 60 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting pltfs' 70 motion to continue or deny dfts' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nevada Star Resource et al v. Angrisano et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pure Nickel
Represented By: Todd T Williams
Represented By: Alan S. Mouritsen
Represented By: Derek Langton
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: Scott S. Bell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada Star Resource
Represented By: Todd T Williams
Represented By: Alan S. Mouritsen
Represented By: Derek Langton
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: Scott S. Bell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Robert Angrisano
Represented By: Peter H. Donaldson
Represented By: David Ryan Ebel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Monty D. Moore
Represented By: Peter H. Donaldson
Represented By: David Ryan Ebel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Angrisano
Represented By: David Ryan Ebel
Represented By: Peter H. Donaldson
Represented By: Farron Danelle Curry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monty D. Moore
Represented By: David Ryan Ebel
Represented By: Peter H. Donaldson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Nevada Star Resource
Represented By: Scott S. Bell
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: Derek Langton
Represented By: Alan S. Mouritsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Pure Nickel
Represented By: Scott S. Bell
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: Derek Langton
Represented By: Alan S. Mouritsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]