Bunge Limited et al v. Bungechicago.com

Plaintiff: Bunge Chicago, Inc. and Bunge Limited
Defendant: Bungechicago.com
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00621
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltfs' 9 Motion for leave to proceed on an in rem basis by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
May 22, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' LEAVE TO TAKE EXPEDITED DISCOVERY by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(TF)
August 13, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 20 Motion for Summary Judgment and Directing Transfer of Domain Name by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
January 8, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 31 Leave to Amend by Judge Robert S. Lasnik; The Clerk of Court is directed to accept and docket the Second Amended Complaint filed by plaintiffs at Dkt. # 31-2. (TF)
January 23, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 32 Second Motion for Leave to proceed in rem and to take discovery by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
July 24, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 37 Second Motion for Summary Judgment and directing transfer of domain name by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bunge Limited et al v. Bungechicago.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bunge Chicago, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Sableman
Represented By: Michael A Moore
Represented By: Christopher Hohn
Represented By: Sarah E Tilstra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bunge Limited
Represented By: Sarah E Tilstra
Represented By: Michael A Moore
Represented By: Mark Sableman
Represented By: Christopher Hohn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bungechicago.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]