Getty Images (US), Inc. v. Virtual Clinics et al

Defendant: Kendra Ryan, Virtual Clinics, Veterinary Website Designers, Ronald Camp, John Doe One and John Doe Two
Plaintiff: Getty Images (US), Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00626
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER denying 15 Camps' Motion to Dismiss by Judge James L. Robart.(MD, mailed copy of order to pro se parties)
January 31, 2014 40 Featured Case ORDER granting 35 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/19/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD, cc to Pro Se Party)
March 20, 2014 47 Featured Case ORDER AWARDING STATUTORY DAMAGES AND ENTERING PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge James L. Robart. (RS) Modified on 3/20/2014/cc pro se parties (RS).
April 29, 2014 53 Featured Case ORDER granting 50 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge James L. Robart.(MD) Modified on 4/30/2014-mailed copy to pro se defts (MD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Getty Images (US), Inc. v. Virtual Clinics et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendra Ryan
Represented By: Judith A Endejan
Represented By: Kellen Andrew Hade
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virtual Clinics
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veterinary Website Designers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Camp
Represented By: Judith A Endejan
Represented By: Kellen Andrew Hade
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe One
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Two
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Getty Images (US), Inc.
Represented By: Scott T Wilsdon
Represented By: Jeremy E Roller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]