Trader Joe's Company v. Hallatt et al Featured Case

Counter_defendant: Trader Joe's Company
Counter_claimant: Michael Norman Hallatt
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Michael Norman Hallatt
Plaintiff: Trader Joe's Company
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00768
Filed: May 1, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2013 26 DECLARATION of Michael Hallatt filed by Defendant Michael Norman Hallatt re 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Alexander, Nathan)
August 1, 2013 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant Michael Norman Hallatt. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/23/2013, (Alexander, Nathan)
July 12, 2013 24 AMENDMENT to 17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 1 Complaint by Defendant Michael Norman Hallatt. (Alexander, Nathan)
July 9, 2013 23 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 Stipulation to extend deadline for Trader Joe's to respond to defendant's counterclaim filed by Trader Joe's Company by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
July 8, 2013 22 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Trader Joe's to Respond to Defendant's Counterclaim by parties. (Roller, Jeremy)
July 2, 2013 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patchen Marie Haggerty on behalf of Defendant Michael Norman Hallatt. (Haggerty, Patchen)
July 2, 2013 20 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The 19 Notice of Appearance filed on 7/1/2013 was improperly signed by PATCHEN M HAGGERTY. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 11 and LCR 83.2(a), signatures must comply with Section III(L) of the Electronic Filing Procedures, which states, "An electronically filed pleading or other document which requires an attorney's signature must have the signors' names printed or typed on the line and under all signature lines." (KN)
July 1, 2013 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nathan Thomas Alexander on behalf of Defendant Michael Norman Hallatt. (Alexander, Nathan)
June 28, 2013 18 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: At the request of the Defendant, with no opposition from Plaintiff, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 8/16/2013. All other FRCP 26-related deadlines are adjusted accordingly. Failure to adhere to these deadlines may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
June 14, 2013 17 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Trader Joe's Company by Michael Norman Hallatt.(Hallatt, Michael)
June 4, 2013 16 NOTICE: Defendant Michael Norman Hallatt has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KN)
June 3, 2013 15 Featured Case SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 Stipulation extending deadine for defendant to file a responsive pleading filed by Trader Joe's Company by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
June 3, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 7/15/2013, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/1/2013, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/8/2013, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
May 31, 2013 13 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER (Second) Extending Deadline for Defendant to File a Responsive Pleading by parties. (Wilsdon, Scott)
May 22, 2013 12 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 11 Stipulation extending deadline for defendant to file a responsive pleading filed by Trader Joe's Company by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
May 22, 2013 11 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Defendant to File a Responsive Pleading by parties. (Wilsdon, Scott)
May 14, 2013 10 DECLARATION of Jeremy Roller for Personal Service Out of State by Plaintiff Trader Joe's Company. (Roller, Jeremy)
May 13, 2013 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Michael Norman Hallatt on 5/8/2013, filed by Plaintiff Trader Joe's Company. (Wilsdon, Scott)
May 2, 2013 8 Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) Michael Norman Hallatt. (RE)
May 2, 2013 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (RE)
May 2, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER re 4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jordan Raphael for Trader Joe's Company, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
May 2, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER re 3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian M. Berliner for Trader Joe's Company, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
May 1, 2013 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of a Trademark action. E-mailed to the US Patent & Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Trademark Report filed by counsel) (RE)
May 1, 2013 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jordan Raphael FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Trader Joe's Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3194494. (Roller, Jeremy)
May 1, 2013 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian M. Berliner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Trader Joe's Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3194473. (Roller, Jeremy)
May 1, 2013 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T.A.C.T. Holding, Inc. for Trader Joe's Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Plaintiffs Trader Joe's Company, T.A.C.T. Holding, Inc.. (Roller, Jeremy)
May 1, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-3194202), filed by Trader Joe's Company. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form120))(Roller, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Trader Joe's Company v. Hallatt et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Trader Joe's Company
Represented By: Scott T Wilsdon
Represented By: Jeremy E Roller
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Represented By: Brian M. Berliner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Michael Norman Hallatt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Norman Hallatt
Represented By: Nathan Thomas Alexander
Represented By: Patchen Marie Haggerty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trader Joe's Company
Represented By: Scott T Wilsdon
Represented By: Jeremy E Roller
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Represented By: Brian M. Berliner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]