Manchester et al v. Ceco Concrete Construction, LLC

Plaintiff: Bedrock Floors, Inc., Suzanne Manchester and Alan Manchester
Defendant: Ceco Concrete Construction, LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv00832
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5 Defendant's Motion to Compel; denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend, by Judge Richard A Jones.(MD)
May 6, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court GRANTS 20 defendant's motion with respect to Bedrock's claims, and DENIES defendant's motion with respect to Mrs. Manchester's claim. Plaintiffs may file their First Amended Complaint consistent with this order within fourteen (14) days of this order. (CL)
May 7, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. This amended order corrects a clerical error in the final paragraph of the order, and replaces the prior order at Dkt. # 23 . Neither party has requested oral argument. This matter may be decided on the papers submitted. (CL)
July 28, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Judge Richard A Jones.(MD)
November 24, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part dft Ceco Concrete Construction's 41 Motion for Judgment; granting in part and denying in part pltf Alan Manchester's 49 third Motion to Amend complaint; second amended complaint due 12/5/14 by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manchester et al v. Ceco Concrete Construction, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bedrock Floors, Inc.
Represented By: William P McArdel, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Manchester
Represented By: William P McArdel, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Manchester
Represented By: William P McArdel, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ceco Concrete Construction, LLC
Represented By: Jacob M Downs
Represented By: James B Stoetzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]