Garrott v. Glebe

Petitioner: Rodney L Garrott
Respondent: Pat Glebe
Case Number: 2:2013cv00887
Filed: May 20, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Referring Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Respondent shall file his answer on or before 8/16/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG; cc to Petitioner)
November 4, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time; 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Rodney L Garrott: RENOTED to 11/29/2013. Objections must be filed by 11/22/2013. (TG; cc mailed to petitioner)
January 13, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H Settle re 17 Report and Recommendations. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
May 30, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (GMR- cc: petitioner)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrott v. Glebe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rodney L Garrott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pat Glebe
Represented By: Ronda Denise Larson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]