Beasley v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jerymaine Beasley
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01106
Filed: June 26, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Robert S. Lasnik; Show Cause Response and Joint Status Report due by 10/4/2013. (TF)
November 22, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER denying pltf's 11 Motion to Remand by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
March 25, 2014 59 Featured Case ORDER Denying Motions to Compel by Judge Robert S. Lasnik; Pltf's 26 34 motions to compel are DENIED without prejudice. Pltf's 33 motion to strike the affidavit of Don G. Lusk is DENIED as moot. (TF)
April 16, 2014 62 Featured Case ORDER RE CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; denying pltf's 40 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying dft's 54 Motion for Relief; granting dft's 35 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Beasley v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Toni Y Anders
Represented By: Joseph D Hampton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerymaine Beasley
Represented By: Terence F Traverso
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]