Calixto v. JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association et al

Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services Inc and JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association
Plaintiff: David J Calixto
Case Number: 2:2013cv01153
Filed: July 3, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The parties shall, no later than Friday, October 4, 2013, file their Joint Status Report and show cause to the Court why sanctions including dismissal should not be imposed for their failure to comply with the Order of July 31, 2013. (CL)
January 3, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss; JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association is dismissed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
March 25, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT NORTHWEST TRUSTEE SERVICES,INC. by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calixto v. JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services Inc
Represented By: Lance E Olsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association
Represented By: Daniel Davies
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J Calixto
Represented By: Ajibola O Oladapo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]