Murphy et al v. The Bank of New York

Defendant: The Bank of New York
Plaintiff: Deborah Murphy and Aaron D Murphy
Case Number: 2:2014cv00955
Filed: June 27, 2014
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2014 2 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re plaintiffs' 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 7/14/2014, Noting Date 7/18/2014. A copy of this R&R has been mailed to plaintiffs today. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (Attachments: # 1 R&R Letter, # 2 R&R Proposed Order, # 3 R&R Judgment)(GB)
July 1, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 2 Report and Recommendation as plaintiff paid the filing fee by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) cc pltfs
July 2, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO. Preliminary/Permanent Injunction Hearing set for 7/31/2014 at 02:00 PM before Judge Ricardo S Martinez, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(MD, called pltf and mailed a copy of order to Pltf ) Modified on 7/2/2014 -e-mailed the order to pltf at debbiemurphy@me.com(MD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy et al v. The Bank of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron D Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.