Aronson v. Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Ken Aronson
Defendant: Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv05293
Filed: April 27, 2010
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2011 66 Featured Case ORDER on stipulation for dismissal of all claims against defendants w/ prejudice and w/o costs by Judge Karen L Strombom. (TW)
March 8, 2011 65 MANDATE of USCA as to 26 Notice of Appeal #10-35815 filed by Ken Aronson; pursuant to stipulation of the parties, appeal is voluntarily DISMISSED w/ prejudice; each party to bear own costs (MW)
March 7, 2011 64 STIPULATION for Dismissal of All Claims by parties. (Kvasnosky, Noelle)
March 7, 2011 63 NOTICE Re Satisfaction of Order re 54 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees ; filed by Defendants Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc., Goldflat Productions LLC. (Johnson, Bruce)
March 3, 2011 62 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Filed by Defendants Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc., Goldflat Productions LLC. Noting Date 3/25/2011, (Kvasnosky, Noelle)
February 17, 2011 61 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Filed by Defendants Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc., Goldflat Productions LLC. Noting Date 3/4/2011, (Johnson, Bruce)
February 14, 2011 60 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Ken Aronson, to 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Amala, Jason)
January 21, 2011 59 DECLARATION of Noelle H. Kvasnosky filed by Defendants Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc., Goldflat Productions LLC re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Kvasnosky, Noelle)
January 21, 2011 58 NOTICE of Filing dvd "Oh England" and CD "I'm Alive" in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Defendants Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc., Goldflat Productions LLC. (Kvasnosky, Noelle)
January 21, 2011 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc., Goldflat Productions LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/18/2011, (Kvasnosky, Noelle)
January 14, 2011 56 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 26 Notice of Appeal #10-35815 filed by Ken Aronson; court has recd the response to the order to show cause, as well as the reply to the response; order to show cause is discharged; BRIEFING SCHEDULE: opening brief due 2/7/11; answering brief due 3/9/11; opt reply due w/in 14 days; **See order for details** (MW)
November 24, 2010 55 AMENDED Notice of Appeal as to 26 Notice of Appeal, 34 AMENDED Notice of Appeal, 49 AMENDED Notice of Appeal by Plaintiff Ken Aronson. (Talmadge, Philip)
November 16, 2010 54 Featured Case ORDER granting 30 Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees in the sum of $31,430, costs in the sum of $697, and statutory award of $10,000 by Judge Karen L Strombom.(TW)
November 16, 2010 53 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc., Goldflat Productions LLC Filed by Defendants Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc., Goldflat Productions LLC.(Kvasnosky, Noelle)
November 16, 2010 52 ANSWER to 48 Amended Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE AND OTHER DEFENSES by Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc., Goldflat Productions LLC.(Kvasnosky, Noelle)
November 16, 2010 51 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Noelle Helen Kvasnosky on behalf of Defendant Goldflat Productions LLC. (Kvasnosky, Noelle)
November 4, 2010 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 50 Response to Order to Show Cause : FILING ERROR. (JJT)
November 3, 2010 50 FILING ERROR. RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Ken Aronson. (Talmadge, Philip) Modified on 11/4/2010 (JJT).
October 29, 2010 49 AMENDED Notice of Appeal as to 26 Notice of Appeal, 34 AMENDED Notice of Appeal by Plaintiff Ken Aronson. (Talmadge, Philip)
October 26, 2010 Party Goldflat Productions LLC added per 48 Amended Complaint. (KN)
October 25, 2010 48 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Ken Aronson.(Vertetis, Thomas)
October 22, 2010 47 Featured Case ORDER granting 42 Motion to Amend. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint. By: Judge Karen L Strombom.(PH)
October 18, 2010 46 RESPONSE, by Defendant Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc., to 42 MOTION to Amend Complaint. (Kvasnosky, Noelle)
October 18, 2010 45 Featured Case PLEASE DISREGARD, DUPLICATE ENTRYORDER denying Plaintiff's Second 38 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG) Modified on 10/18/2010: matter entered twice, see #44 (CMG).
October 18, 2010 44 Featured Case ORDER denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration by Judge Karen L Strombom.(TW)
October 12, 2010 43 DECLARATION of Thomas B. Vertetis filed by Plaintiff Ken Aronson re 42 MOTION to Amend Complaint (Vertetis, Thomas)
October 12, 2010 42 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Ken Aronson. Noting Date 10/12/2010, (Vertetis, Thomas)
October 8, 2010 41 DECLARATION of Bruce E. H. Johnson filed by Defendant Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc. re 30 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Kvasnosky, Noelle)
October 8, 2010 40 REPLY, filed by Defendant Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc., TO RESPONSE to 30 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Kvasnosky, Noelle)
October 8, 2010 39 DECLARATION of Thomas B. Vertetis filed by Plaintiff Ken Aronson re 38 MOTION for Reconsideration re 33 Order on Motion for Reconsideration (Vertetis, Thomas)
October 8, 2010 38 MOTION for Reconsideration re 33 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Ken Aronson. Noting Date 10/8/2010, (Vertetis, Thomas)
October 4, 2010 37 DECLARATION of Thomas B. Vertetis filed by Plaintiff Ken Aronson re 30 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Vertetis, Thomas)
October 4, 2010 36 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Ken Aronson, to 30 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Oral Argument Requested. (Vertetis, Thomas)
October 1, 2010 35 APPEAL NOTIFICATION packet sent to US Court of Appeals re 34 Amended Notice of Appeal, related to 26 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 docket report)(MW)
September 30, 2010 34 AMENDED Notice of Appeal as to 26 Notice of Appeal by Plaintiff Ken Aronson. (Talmadge, Philip)
September 28, 2010 33 Featured Case ORDER denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration by Judge Karen L Strombom.(TW)
September 22, 2010 32 DECLARATION of L. Keith Gorder, Jr. filed by Defendant Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc. re 30 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Kvasnosky, Noelle)
September 22, 2010 31 DECLARATION of Bruce H. Johnson filed by Defendant Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc. re 30 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Kvasnosky, Noelle)
September 22, 2010 30 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Defendant Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc.. Noting Date 10/8/2010, (Kvasnosky, Noelle)
September 14, 2010 29 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER as to 26 Notice of Appeal #10-35815 filed by Ken Aronson : MEDIATION QUESTIONNAIRE due 9/21/10; Appellant's opening brief due by 12/22/10; Appellee's answering brief due by 1/21/11; Appellants optional reply brief due within 14 days of service of the response brief. (MW)
September 14, 2010 USCA Case Number 10-35815 for 26 Notice of Appeal filed by Ken Aronson. (MW)
September 14, 2010 AMENDED Appeal Fees received: fee in the amount of $ 455 (receipt # TAC-7843) re 26 Notice of Appeal filed by Ken Aronson (MW)
September 14, 2010 28 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER and MEDIATION UNDER LR 39.1(c); Length of Trial: *5 days*. Jury Trial is set for 12/5/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom F before Judge Karen L Strombom. Joinder of Parties due by 10/12/2010, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 6/8/2011, Discovery completed by 8/8/2011, Dispositive motions due by 9/6/2011, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 9/15/2011, Motions in Limine due by 11/7/2011, Pretrial Order due by 11/23/2011, Trial briefs to be submitted by 11/23/2011, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 11/23/2011, Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom F before Judge Karen L Strombom. By: Judge Karen L Strombom. (PH)
September 13, 2010 27 APPEAL NOTIFICATION packet sent to US Court of Appeals re 26 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 docket report)(MW)
September 13, 2010 NO Appeal Fees received: re 26 Notice of Appeal filed by Ken Aronson (MW)
September 13, 2010 26 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 23 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Plaintiff Ken Aronson. (Talmadge, Philip)
September 13, 2010 25 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Philip A Talmadge on behalf of Plaintiff Ken Aronson. (Talmadge, Philip)
September 9, 2010 24 MOTION for Reconsideration re 23 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Plaintiff Ken Aronson. Noting Date 9/9/2010, (Amala, Jason)
August 31, 2010 23 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's claims of Misappropriation of Likeness and Invasion of Privacy. Defendant is awarded its reasonable attorney fees and costs incurred in presenting this motion and the statutorily prescribed amount of ten thousand dollars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG)
July 27, 2010 22 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Ken Aronson, Defendant Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc.. (Vertetis, Thomas)
July 9, 2010 21 REPLY, filed by Defendant Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc., TO RESPONSE to 15 MOTION (Special) To Strike Plaintiff's Claims (Kvasnosky, Noelle)
July 5, 2010 20 DECLARATION of Thomas B. Vertetis filed by Plaintiff Ken Aronson re 15 MOTION (Special) To Strike Plaintiff's Claims (Vertetis, Thomas)
July 5, 2010 19 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Ken Aronson, to 15 MOTION (Special) To Strike Plaintiff's Claims. Oral Argument Requested. (Vertetis, Thomas)
June 11, 2010 18 NOTICE of Filing Eric Turnbow and Ken Aronsons travel footage from 1997, DVDs 1-3, as Exhibit A to the Declaration of Eric Turnbow in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Defendant Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc.. (Kvasnosky, Noelle)
June 11, 2010 17 DECLARATION of Noelle H. Kvasnosky filed by Defendant Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc. re 15 MOTION (Special) To Strike Plaintiff's Claims (Kvasnosky, Noelle)
June 11, 2010 16 DECLARATION of Eric Turnbow filed by Defendant Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc. re 15 MOTION (Special) To Strike Plaintiff's Claims (Kvasnosky, Noelle)
June 11, 2010 15 MOTION (Special) To Strike Plaintiff's Claims by Defendant Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc.. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/9/2010, (Kvasnosky, Noelle)
June 9, 2010 14 NOTICE of Filing Eric Turnbow and Ken Aronson's travel footage from 1997 DVDs 1-3 as Exhibit B and Sicko (Dog Eat Dog Films 2007) as Exhibit D in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Defendant Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc.. (Kvasnosky, Noelle)
June 9, 2010 13 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc..(Kvasnosky, Noelle)
May 25, 2010 12 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 10 Stipulation and order to extend defendant's deadline to answer the complaint and/or make any motion in response, filed by Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc. By Judge Karen L Strombom. (PH)
May 25, 2010 11 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Strombom. (TW)
May 19, 2010 10 STIPULATION to Extend Time To Answer by parties. (Johnson, Bruce)
May 11, 2010 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bruce EH Johnson on behalf of Defendant Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc.. (Johnson, Bruce)
April 28, 2010 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If consent, return the executed form by 6/28/2010. Please Note: Consents must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW)
April 28, 2010 7 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Karen L Strombom. (TW)
April 28, 2010 6 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 7/27/2010, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/13/2010, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/20/2010, by Judge Karen L Strombom. (TW)
April 28, 2010 5 Summons electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc.. (RE)
April 27, 2010 Judge Karen L Strombom added. (RE)
April 27, 2010 4 REPORT Re Copyright Infringement by Plaintiff Ken Aronson. (Vertetis, Thomas)(Hardcopy mailed to U.S. Copyright Office) (RE).
April 27, 2010 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Ken Aronson. (Vertetis, Thomas)
April 27, 2010 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Ken Aronson.. (Vertetis, Thomas)
April 27, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc., filed by Ken Aronson.(Vertetis, Thomas) (Receipt #SEA33946)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aronson v. Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Aronson
Represented By: Thomas Brian Vertetis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]