Firepower Marketing Inc v. Red Robin International Inc

Plaintiff: Firepower Marketing Inc
Defendant: Red Robin International Inc
Case Number: 3:2011cv05338
Filed: May 3, 2011
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 32 Motion for Protective Order.(TG)
March 5, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion for Protective Order by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)
October 22, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion to Compel.(TG)
August 5, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(CMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firepower Marketing Inc v. Red Robin International Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firepower Marketing Inc
Represented By: Robert Arnold Radcliffe
Represented By: Peter J. Gleekel
Represented By: Bradley J Walz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Robin International Inc
Represented By: Paul H Beattie
Represented By: Kirsten L Stoll-DeBell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]