Lucas et al v. Camacho et al

Plaintiff: Chassidy F Lucas, Bianca Lucas and CB Stormwater LLC
Defendant: Joe Camacho, Deborah Camacho, George Parker, Ali Parker and Angela Stephenson
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv05350
Filed: May 5, 2011
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clallam
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2012 100 Featured Case ORDER denying 89 Motion to Dismiss; denying 91 Motion to Dismiss; denying 97 Motion for Default Judgment and denying 98 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
May 8, 2012 152 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 119 Motion to Seal.(TG)
June 6, 2012 172 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 123 Motion for Contempt; denying 133 Motion for Permanent Injunction.(TG) (Modified to delete entry re mailing copies to plaintiffs as they are signed up to receive copies through CM/ECF; also modified to change "order" to "minute order")
July 19, 2012 188 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle finding as moot 113 Motion to Disqualify; finding as moot 155 Motion for Reconsideration ; finding as moot 159 Motion to Disqualify; granting 163 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 170 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 175 Motion to Strike; finding as moot 176 Motion to Strike; denying 185 Motion to Strike; denying 186 Motion to Strike.(TG)
September 18, 2012 198 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 190 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 194 Motion for Attorney Fees.(TG)
July 28, 2011 36 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Aric S. Bomsztyk terminated. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (cc: Parkers via mail)(MGC)
August 22, 2011 58 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 24 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.(TG; cc mailed to plaintiffs)
September 8, 2011 61 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 45 Motion for a Status Conference.(TG; cc mailed to plaintiffs)
October 7, 2011 76 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 51 Motion to Dismiss.(TG; cc mailed to pro parties)
October 17, 2011 82 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 63 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 65 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 68 Motion for trial. Joint Status Report due by 10/28/2011. (TG; cc mailed to pro se parties)
November 1, 2011 87 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PARTIES AND CAPTION signed by Judge Benjamin H Settle. (MET) Parties amended/terminated per order. (MET). cc: Bianca Lucas, Chassidy Lucas, Ali Parker.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lucas et al v. Camacho et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chassidy F Lucas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bianca Lucas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CB Stormwater LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Camacho
Represented By: Aric S Bomsztyk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Camacho
Represented By: Aric S Bomsztyk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Parker
Represented By: Aric S Bomsztyk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Parker
Represented By: Aric S Bomsztyk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Stephenson
Represented By: Aric S Bomsztyk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]