Smith v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al

Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Eagle Home Mortgage, Does 1-20 and Wells Fargo Bank NA
Plaintiff: Rosalind Smith
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv05533
Filed: July 13, 2011
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2011 26 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage's Motion to Dismiss; plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice, and without leave to amend. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
October 19, 2011 27 Featured Case ORDER granting 17 Defendant Eagle Home Mortgage LLC's Motion to Dismiss; plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice, and without leave to amend. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
July 18, 2011 2 Featured Case ORDER re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; plaintiff has ten days from the date of this Order to file a Written Consent for Payment of Costs or this matter will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 7/18/2011 (DN). (Copy mailed to plaintiff.)
October 26, 2011 30 Featured Case ORDER re 28 29 Plaintiff's Responses to Motions to Dismiss; these motions are considered as Motions for Reconsideration and are DENIED. This matter is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Smith v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Ronald E Beard
Represented By: Benjamin J. Roesch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Home Mortgage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Benjamin J. Roesch
Represented By: Ronald E Beard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalind Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]