Reisbeck v. United States of America

Petitioner: Anthony Wayne Reisbeck
Respondent: United States of America
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv05781
Filed: September 26, 2011
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
 
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2011 16 Featured Case ORDER Granting Government's Request to File Declarations on or Before December 21, 2011, signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.(DK) Modified on 12/20/2011 (DK).(Copy mailed to Petitioner @ USP Lompoc)
December 28, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER SEALING PRESENTENCE REPORT, by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (Copy mailed to Petitioner.)(DK)
March 19, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion to Appoint Counsel, by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (SEE CR10-5407RJB) (cc: CJA Panel) (DK)
October 16, 2012 31 Featured Case ORDER Continuing Evidentiary Hearing on Petitioner's Motion Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 2255, signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Evidentiary Hearing RESET for 12/21/2012 at 09:30 AM.(DK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Reisbeck v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Wayne Reisbeck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Backhus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]