Ira Green, Inc. v. J.L. Darling Corporation

Plaintiff: Ira Green, Inc.
Defendant: J.L. Darling Corporation
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv05796
Filed: September 29, 2011
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2012 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE, granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
December 5, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS, denying 13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
April 16, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGASTORIES AND FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM, granting 32 Motion for Leave to File; granting 31 Motion to Compel. J.L. Darling is ORDERED to file J.L. Darling Corp.'s Proposed First Amended Answer and Counterclaims (Dkt. 42-1) within five days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.(JL)
August 13, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFF IRA GREEN, INC.'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURES AND REPORT AND TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY, denying 53 Motion to Exclude. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ira Green, Inc. v. J.L. Darling Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Green, Inc.
Represented By: Craig M Scott
Represented By: Stacie Foster
Represented By: Steven Wade Edmiston
Represented By: Christine K Bush
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.L. Darling Corporation
Represented By: Timothy LeRoy Boller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]