Synergy GreenTech Corporation v. Magna Force, Inc

Counter_defendant: Synergy GreenTech Corporation
Plaintiff: Synergy GreenTech Corporation
Defendant: Magna Force, Inc
Counter_claimant: Magna Force, Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv05543
Filed: June 19, 2012
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clallam
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2013 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 99 Magna Force's Motion for Bill of Costs; and denying 101 Synergy's Motion for Bill of Costs.(TG)
January 15, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Stipulated Protective Order re: Confidential Documents and Information. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MGC)
April 10, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Stay by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)
May 30, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Stipulated Motion to Seal by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)
May 30, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Stipulated Motion to Seal by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)
July 1, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 Stipulated Motion to Seal by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)
July 1, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 76 Stipulated Motion to Seal by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)
July 18, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 44 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment.(TG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synergy GreenTech Corporation v. Magna Force, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Synergy GreenTech Corporation
Represented By: K. T. Cherian
Represented By: Scott Wales
Represented By: Robin Wechkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synergy GreenTech Corporation
Represented By: Robin Wechkin
Represented By: Scott Wales
Represented By: K. T. Cherian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magna Force, Inc
Represented By: Warren Joseph Rheaume
Represented By: Daniel Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Magna Force, Inc
Represented By: Warren Joseph Rheaume
Represented By: Daniel Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.