Enterprises International, Inc. et al v. International Knife & Saw, Inc.

Plaintiff: Enterprises International, Inc. and Legacy Automation Inc.
Defendant: International Knife & Saw, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv05638
Filed: July 18, 2012
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Grays Harbor
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2014 146 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 104 Motion for Summary Judgment.(TG)
May 16, 2014 159 Featured Case ORDER denying 147 Motion to Appoint Neutral Discovery Master by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
July 24, 2014 171 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting in part and denying in part 123 Motion for Summary Judgment.(TG)
August 12, 2013 71 Featured Case ORDER denying 35 Motion to Compel by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)
November 26, 2013 84 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Enterprises International, Inc. et al v. International Knife & Saw, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enterprises International, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Lovejoy
Represented By: C James Frush
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Legacy Automation Inc.
Represented By: Jack Lovejoy
Represented By: C James Frush
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Knife & Saw, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]