Bury v. NCS Power Inc.,et al

Defendant: The Allyn Group LLC, Lumeria Research Inc, NCS Power Inc, Estate of Lance Chandler, Leanne Erdelbrock, Douglas Chandler and Joyce Chandler
Plaintiff: Robert F Bury
Case Number: 3:2012cv05641
Filed: July 19, 2012
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2013 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 112 Motion for Extension of Time. Noting Date 11/15/2013 re 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 106 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(TG)
December 18, 2013 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 102 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 106 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 109 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 121 Motion for Leave to File; granting 135 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 141 Motion for Relief.(TG)
May 27, 2014 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 155 Motion to Amend. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint. (TG)
September 18, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.(TG)
November 1, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion; granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim signed by Judge Benjamin H Settle. Bury shall file an amended complaint no later than 11/16/12. Joyce Chandler and Leanne Erdelbrock are terminated. (MET)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bury v. NCS Power Inc.,et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Allyn Group LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumeria Research Inc
Represented By: Timothy J. Heinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCS Power Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Lance Chandler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leanne Erdelbrock
Represented By: Timothy J. Heinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Chandler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Chandler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert F Bury
Represented By: John Francis Bury
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]