Williams v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Williams and Carolyn W Colvin
Case Number: 3:2013cv05037
Filed: January 18, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Referring Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on the 3 Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. Matter noted for: 1/24/2014. (GMR)
January 27, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H Settle re 20 Report and Recommendations. (TG)
April 15, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Williams
Represented By: Sara M Herr-Waldroup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn W Colvin
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Represented By: Summer Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.