Fleming et al v. Parnell et al

Defendant: Samson Sports LLC and Scott Parnell
Plaintiff: Derral Fleming and MAG Enterprises, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv05062
Filed: January 29, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2014 104 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 76 Plaintiffs' Motion for Issuance of Request to Register of Copyrights and Stay Pending Response. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MGC)
April 10, 2014 120 Featured Case ORDER denying 77 Motion for Relief Under Rule 37 by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)
April 18, 2014 126 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 89 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 94 Motion for Summary Judgment. Parties are directed to meet and confer and submit a joint brief of both parties' positions by 4/25/2014.(TG)
June 26, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 11 Motion to Quash.(TG)
August 23, 2013 49 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 32 Motion for Leave to File surreply; granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for Protective Order; 23 MOTION to Compel Production: Noting Date 8/30/2013.(TG)
August 28, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER denying 41 Motion for Protective Order by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)
September 12, 2013 56 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Compel. The parties are directed to meet and confer by September 18, 2013. (TG)
January 2, 2014 71 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 57 Motion to Compel and denying motion to strike 60 .(TG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fleming et al v. Parnell et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samson Sports LLC
Represented By: Jon Per Stride
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Parnell
Represented By: Jon Per Stride
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derral Fleming
Represented By: Kurt Marcus Rylander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAG Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Kurt Marcus Rylander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]