United States of America v. Haines et al

Defendant: Pierce County, Daniel F Haines, Yoshiko S. Haines and Tradewind Investments
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2013cv05082
Filed: February 7, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6502 IRS:Enforcement of tax liens
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Benjamin H Settle. Defendant Tradewind must show cause by April 25, 2013 or file notice of appearance of counsel by April 30, 2013.(TG; cc mailed to defendants)
July 3, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG; cc mailed to defendants)
July 26, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 39 Motion for Reconsideration.(TG; cc mailed to Haines)
August 5, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Answer and RENOTING the 42 MOTION for Default Entry against Tradewind Investments TO: 8/23/2013. Signed by Judge Benjamin H Settle. (CMG; cc to Tradewind Investments) Modified on 8/5/2013: cc to Defendant Haines (CMG).
September 27, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle re 47 Notice-Other filed by Daniel F Haines. (TG; cc mailed to defendant) (Main Document 55 replaced on 9/27/2013) (TG).
October 30, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 57 Motion to Dismiss.(TG; cc mailed to defendant)
April 16, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time; 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Defendant Daniel F. Haines and for Default Judgment against Defendant Tradewind Investments : RENOTED to 5/16/2014. (TG; cc mailed to defendants)
September 3, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 82 Motion to Lift Stay; Case reopened. (TG; cc mailed to defendant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Haines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel F Haines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoshiko S. Haines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradewind Investments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nathaniel B. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.