McGary v. Cunningham et al

Defendant: Kelly Cunningham, Don Gauntz, Jeff Cutshaw, Holly Coryell, Ed Young, Bruce Duthie and Reginald Woods
Plaintiff: Darnell McGary
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv05130
Filed: February 22, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Referring Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 77 Denying the motion for injunctive relief, 78 Granting in part and denying in part the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 5/22/2014 (DN). (cc to pltf)
May 23, 2014 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's 101 Motion to strike second motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
October 31, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 135 Motion to strike the declaration of Leslie Sziebert, and denying 139 Motion to strike portions of the summary judgment motion, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
July 12, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion for More Definite Statement; striking 34 Motion to Dismiss; granting 12 Motion for More Definite Statement. The Court order orders the Plaintiff to submit a "second amended complaint" curing the defects that are noted in this order. The second amended complaint will be due on or before 8/16/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
August 14, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
September 12, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 41 Objections to Report and Recommendation; Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief is denied. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 9/12/2013 (DN). (cc to pltf)
November 1, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 70 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Bruce Duthie, Kelly Cunningham, Don Gauntz, Jeff Cutshaw, Holly Coryell, Ed Young, Jay Inslee, James Buder, Reginald Woods, 72 Objection s to Report and Recommendation filed by Darnell McGary; State defendants' motion to dismiss 44 is granted in part and denied in part; Defendants Buder and Inslee are dismissed with prejudice; Defendant Cunningham's motion to dismiss is denied. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 11/1/2013 (DN). (cc to pltf)
November 4, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS 61 and 66 re: depositions signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.(MET) cc: plaintiff
November 4, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion for Protective Order signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.(MET) cc: plaintiff
December 6, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 Stipulated Motion signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.The action is stayed until June 20, 2014. On or before June 6, 2014 plaintiff must submit a report concerning his status. (MET) cc: plaintiff
December 10, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 77 Denying as Moot pending the stay, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 12/10/2013 (DN). (cc to pltf)
December 12, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 80 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Mark Lindquist; All deadlines have been stayed. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 12/12/2013 (DN). (cc to pltf)
April 18, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 91 Motion to Lift Stay; denying 93 Motion to file Third Amended Complaint; and granting 94 Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline: Discovery completed by 6/20/2014, Dispositive motions due by 9/5/2014, and the parties are advised that a due date for filing a Joint Pretrial Statement may be established at a later date pending the outcome of any dispositive motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McGary v. Cunningham et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Cunningham
Represented By: Nicholas A Williamson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Gauntz
Represented By: Nicholas A Williamson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Cutshaw
Represented By: Nicholas A Williamson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Coryell
Represented By: Nicholas A Williamson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Young
Represented By: Nicholas A Williamson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Duthie
Represented By: Nicholas A Williamson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald Woods
Represented By: Nicholas A Williamson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell McGary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]