Trinidad et al v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Oscar Trinidad and Susan Trinidad
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv05191
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion for Summary Judgment; 15 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment RENOTED to 1/10/2014.(TG)
January 16, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 15 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 24 Motion for Reconsideration.(TG)
March 4, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion to Compel by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trinidad et al v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Trinidad
Represented By: Tyler K Firkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Trinidad
Represented By: Tyler K Firkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nancy T. McKinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.