Taylor v. Universal Auto Group I, Inc.

Defendant: Universal Auto Group I, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Taylor, Sr.
Case Number: 3:2013cv05245
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227 Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion for Protective Order by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)
July 1, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 28 Motion for Summary Judgment; regarding Plaintiff's claims under the TCPA, the motion is GRANTED as to all calls made in 2011 and 2012; and regarding Plaintiff's claims under the WADAD and Consumer Protection Act, the motion is DENIED; by Judge Karen L Strombom.(GMR)
August 8, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant is requested to file a response consisting of no more than 5 pages on or before 8/22/14 regarding the 54 MOTION for Reconsideration re 50 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG)
November 24, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 55 Motion for Class Certification with Leave to Amend Complaint, signed by Judge Karen L Strombom. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by no later than December 22, 2014. (GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Universal Auto Group I, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Auto Group I, Inc.
Represented By: Lucy Russell Clifthorne
Represented By: James A. Krueger
Represented By: Henry Andrew Saller, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Taylor, Sr.
Represented By: Kimberlee L Gunning
Represented By: Bradley E Neunzig
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]