McDonald v. Employment Security Department

Plaintiff: Yvonne McDonald
Defendant: Employment Security Department
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv05248
Filed: April 3, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Defendants Motion to Dismiss; this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 7/23/2013 (DN). (cc to pltf)
April 23, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; plaintiff has 15 days from the date of this Order to pay the filing fee or this matter will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 4/23/2013 (DN). (cc to pltf)
May 9, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 5/9/2013 (DN). (cc to pltf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McDonald v. Employment Security Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne McDonald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employment Security Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]