Holcomb v. Colvin

Plaintiff: James Byron Holcomb
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv05256
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Kitsap
Presiding Judge: Karen L Strombom
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405 Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER denying 7 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 6 . Defendant's 6 MOTION to Dismiss is renoted for 8/23/2013. Plaintiff shall have until 8/12/13 to file a response to the motion. Defendant's reply, if any, is due by 8/22/13. By Judge Karen L Strombom.(TW)
August 16, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER that the undersigned DECLINES to recuse voluntarily and plaintiff's motion to recuse the undersigned hereby is REFERRED to Chief Judge Marsha J Pechman for decision. This action is stayed pending resolution of the recusal issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
January 7, 2014 18 Featured Case ORDER granting defendant's 6 Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Holcomb v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Byron Holcomb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]