Capello v. Sziebert et al

Defendant: Galina Dixon, Kelly Cunningham, Henry Richards, Randall Griffith, Howard Welsh, Paul Temposky, Leslie Sziebert, William Bailey and Unknown Defendant(s) 1 through 10
Plaintiff: Ricardo Capello
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv05275
Filed: April 10, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Referring Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2014 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 102 Report and Recommendations. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
June 2, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 103 Report and Recommendations. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff and Pro se Defendant)
May 10, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk's office send a service packet to Mr. Welsh as the address listed in 5/7/13 filing 16 . If Mr. Welsh wishes the Court to take action, he will have to file a motion that is properly noted and served on all parties who have filed a notice of appearance. Mr. Welsh's two letters will remain in the file, but the Court will take no further action. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff and Mr. Welsh w/svc pkt)
June 24, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class Mail, to Defendant Dr Henry Richards, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (Service mailed on 6/24/2013) (GMR- cc: pltf & Dft Welsh)
August 14, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion for the US Marshal service to personally serve Mr. Cunningham with a summons and complaint in this action. Defendant Cunningham is directed to Show cause on or before 10/4/13, why he should not be charged for the cost of serving him. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
April 15, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (GMR- cc: pltf)
August 20, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H Settle re 38 Report and Recommendations. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff and to Mr. Welsh)
October 8, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Defendant Cunningham TO PAY THE COST OF SERVICE, within the next thirty days, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (GMR- cc: pltf; H. Welsh; USDC finance)
November 5, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 MOTION for Order Requiring Plaintiff's Physical Presence at Deposition(s), signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (GMR- cc: pltf & dft Welsh)
December 18, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on the 65 Letter by pro se Defendant, Howard Welsh, regarding the rescheduling of his deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff & Mr. Welsh)
April 15, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class Mail to all named defendants; and to the Plaintiff- a copy of the General Order with a courtesy copy of this Order, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (service mailed on 4/15/2013) (GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Capello v. Sziebert et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galina Dixon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Cunningham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Richards
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Griffith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Welsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Temposky
Represented By: Thomas Russell Knoll, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Sziebert
Represented By: Thomas Russell Knoll, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Bailey
Represented By: Thomas Russell Knoll, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendant(s) 1 through 10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Capello
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]