Moeller v. Gilbert

Petitioner: David Douglas Moeller
Respondent: Margaret Gilbert
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv05337
Filed: May 2, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Referring Judge: J Richard Creatura
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 10 Report and Recommendation. Petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot because the filing fee has been paid. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to plaintiff @ Monroe address . Modified on 6/21/2013 (JL).
September 25, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 18 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to plaintiff @ Monroe address . Modified on 9/25/2013 (JL).
May 10, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER that Petitioner file an amended 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus or a motion to change the case caption. Petitioner's amended petition or motion to amend caption will be due on or before 6/14/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG; cc to Petitioner w/blank forms)
May 22, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class/Certified Mail/Return Receipt Requested; mailed on 5/22/13 to Respondent and AG's office.Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG; cc to Petitioner w/General Order)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Moeller v. Gilbert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Douglas Moeller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Margaret Gilbert
Represented By: John Joseph Samson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]