Barton v. Snaza et al

Defendant: Threasa Becker, Valerie Peters, Deborah Thompson, George Eaton, James Downing, John D Snaza, Todd L Thoma, Jon Tunheim, Scott M Jackson and Olivia Zhou
Plaintiff: JD Jones Barton
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv05382
Filed: May 21, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Referring Judge: Karen L Strombom
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time; Amended Complaint or Response due by 7/5/2013, signed by Judge Karen L Strombom.(MET) cc: plaintiff
July 8, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Karen L Strombom.(MET) cc: plaintiff
July 8, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 17 MOTION for Recusal filed by JD Jones Barton signed by Judge Karen L Strombom. It is hereby ORDERED that the undersigned DECLINES to recuse voluntarily. Plaintiffs motion for recusal of the undersigned is REFERRED to Chief Judge Marsha J. Pechman for decision. This action, and all motions currently pending before the Court are hereby STAYED pending resolution of the recusal issue.(MET) cc: plaintiff
August 5, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's 20 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
August 5, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion for Order directing Clerk to provide Plaintiff copies of all pro se pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
August 19, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying motions 24 ; 26 ; 27 ; 28 and 30 signed by Judge Karen L Strombom. See order for additional details. (MET) cc: plaintiff
August 28, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion to Stay; denying 39 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 40 Motion for Order; denying 41 Motion for Order; denying 42 Motion to Compel signed by Judge Karen L Strombom. Plaintiff is directed to file no further motions with the Court until he has responded to the Courts Second Order to Amend or Show Cause (ECF No. 35). Failure to comply with this directive will result in a recommendation that this matter be dismissed.(MET) cc: plaintiff
November 4, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 47 Report and Recommendations. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
May 31, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to AMEND or SHOW CAUSE and DENYING 8 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Plaintiff's amended complaint or response to the Order to Show Cause due by 6/28/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff w/enclosures) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/31/2013) (CMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Barton v. Snaza et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Threasa Becker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Peters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Eaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Downing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D Snaza
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd L Thoma
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Tunheim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott M Jackson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivia Zhou
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JD Jones Barton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]