Kearney v. Snaza et al

Defendant: Valerie Peters, Deborah Thompson, George Eaton, James Downing, Todd L Thoma, John D Snaza, Threasa Becker, S M Davis, Jon Tunheim and John M Jones
Plaintiff: Daniel J Kearney
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv05383
Filed: May 21, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Referring Judge: J Richard Creatura
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.(MET) cc: plaintiff
August 14, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion asking for a copy of the docket sheet; and denying 30 Motion to serve discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
August 14, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion for Order to file an answer; denying 26 Motion to Amend Complaint; and denying 29 Motion for Order to stay defendants' answer until receipt the amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
August 14, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Multiple pleadings received 8/7/13: the Court declines to file the documents received 8/7/13, and orders the Clerk's office to return this filing to the plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff w/attachments)
September 10, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motions: 33 Motion to Consolidate this Action with C13-5382BHS/KLS; 37 Motion for Order directing service on all defendants by clerk and to provide Plaintiff with copies; 47 Motion to Consolidate the Clerk's Record (Pleadings- 33, 35, 38, 39, and 45) for the 8/23/13 Hearing; and 48 Motion for Order Directing Service (Court to Issue and Serve All Process); signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (GMR- cc: pltf)
December 9, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Motion for Contempt or Imposition of Sanctions, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (GMR- cc: pltf)
December 30, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 54 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to plaintiff @ Olympia address . Modified on 12/30/2013 (JL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kearney v. Snaza et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Peters
Represented By: Donald R Peters, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Thompson
Represented By: Donald R Peters, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Eaton
Represented By: Donald R Peters, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Downing
Represented By: Donald R Peters, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd L Thoma
Represented By: Donald R Peters, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D Snaza
Represented By: Donald R Peters, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Threasa Becker
Represented By: Donald R Peters, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S M Davis
Represented By: Donald R Peters, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Tunheim
Represented By: Donald R Peters, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M Jones
Represented By: Donald R Peters, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J Kearney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]