Coe v. Strong

Respondent: Mark Strong
Petitioner: Kevin Coe
Case Number: 3:2013cv06088
Filed: December 26, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, and accepting the answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Petitioner)
September 11, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 17 Report and Recommendation. The Court denies the petition (Dkt. 6 ). Petitioner fails to show that the state court violated clearly established federal or constitutional law. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to plaintiff @ Steilacoom address . Modified on 9/11/2014 (JL).
January 22, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 3 Report and Recommendation. Petitioner's application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Dkt. 1 ) is DENIED. If petitioner desires to proceed with this civil action, he shall pay the $5 filing fee to the Court Clerk, not later than February 12, 2014. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to plaintiff @ Steilacoom address . Modified on 1/22/2014 (JL).
February 11, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class/Certified Mail/Return Receipt Requested; mailed to Respondent & AG's office on 2/11/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG; cc to Petitioner w/instruction sheet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coe v. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Coe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.