Lee v. Glebe

Petitioner: Donald Morris Lee
Respondent: Patrick Glebe
 
Case Number: 3:2014cv05309
Filed: April 14, 2014
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
 
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying petitioner's 12 Motion for release on bail; striking petitioner's 14 Motion for producation of documents; and striking petitioner's 15 Motion for Hearing. A copy of this Order has been mailed to petitioner today. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.(GB)
June 27, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting respondent's 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. A copy of this Order has been mailed to petitioner today. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.(GB)
July 18, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking petitioner's 23 Motion for an injunction; and striking petitioner's 24 Motion to Compel. A copy of this Order has been mailed to petitioner today. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.(GB)
April 17, 2014 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk is directed to transfer this case to Seattle. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG; cc to Petitioner and Seattle Prisoner Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lee v. Glebe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald Morris Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Glebe
Represented By: Alex A Kostin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]