Plechner v. State of Washington

Respondent: State of Washington
Petitioner: Richard Plechner
Case Number: 3:2014cv05321
Filed: April 16, 2014
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Mason
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Judge Karen L Strombom.(MET)cc: petitioner
June 4, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by Judge Karen L Strombom by certified mail on 6/4/2014 to Respondent & AG with Motion to Stay (dkt 6). (MET) cc: Petitioner w/ pro se sheet.
June 19, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Karen L Strombom granting 6 Motion to Stay pending resolution of the state court proceedings; Petitioners motion for counsel is DENIED. Petitioner shall advise the Court within thirty (30) days of receiving a final State court ruling.(MET) cc: petitioner
July 18, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion for Reconsideration re 17 Order on Motion to Stay and for Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG; cc to Petitioner)
August 5, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion for Bail and to Compel signed by Judge Karen L Strombom.(MET) cc: petitioner
August 5, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion to Seal signed by Judge Karen L Strombom.(MET) cc: petitioner
June 2, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 5 Report and Recommendations. (TG; cc mailed to petitioner)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plechner v. State of Washington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Washington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Plechner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]