Hill v. Glebe

Petitioner: Scott Michael Hill
Respondent: Patrick Glebe
Case Number: 3:2014cv05330
Filed: April 22, 2014
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Referring Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion to Seal signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. The Court gives petitioner 20 days to withdraw the appendix. If the appendix is not withdrawn it will be unsealed. If the appendix is withdrawn, the Court orders that the Clerks Office delete the entry from the docket.(MET)
November 13, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 24 Stipulation filed by Scott Michael Hill by Judge J Richard Creatura. (MET)
March 17, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 27 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Patrick Glebe. If no motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b), is made, the parties SHALL FILE a joint status report on or before April 17, 2015. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Glebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott Michael Hill
Represented By: Suzanne Lee Elliott
Represented By: Ann Marie Schwartz(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Glebe
Represented By: John Joseph Samson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]