Villarreal v. Glebe

Petitioner: Jesus Miguel Villarreal
Respondent: Patrick Glebe
 
Case Number: 3:2014cv05358
Filed: May 1, 2014
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Cowlitz
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Referring Judge: Karen L Strombom
 
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG; cc to Petitioner)
September 29, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY, re 19 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to plaintiff @ Aberdeen address . Modified on 9/29/2014 (JL).
May 12, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Judge Karen L Strombom.(MET) cc: petitioner
May 12, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by Judge Karen L Strombom. Certified mail sent on 5/12/2014 to Respondent and Attorney General. (MET) cc: petitioner

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Villarreal v. Glebe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesus Miguel Villarreal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Glebe
Represented By: Mandy Lynn Rose
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]