Richfield et al v. FISH Food Banks of Pierce County

Defendant: FISH Food Banks of Pierce County
Plaintiff: Carolyn G Trumbull and Steven E Richfield
Case Number: 3:2014cv05516
Filed: June 27, 2014
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.(TG; cc mailed to plaintiffs)
October 21, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 13 Motion to strike and convert; granting 14 Motion to Vacate Judgment; denying 16 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 17 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Case reopened. Plaintiffs have until 11/7/2014 to file an amended complaint or case will be dismissed.(TG; cc mailed to plaintiffs)
January 22, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 33 Motion to convert motion; denying 22 Motion for immediate pretrial settlement conference; and granting 31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.(TG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richfield et al v. FISH Food Banks of Pierce County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FISH Food Banks of Pierce County
Represented By: Diana Virginia Blakney(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michael Barry Tierney
Represented By: Robert David Zeinemann(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn G Trumbull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven E Richfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.