Malicoat v. Obenland

Petitioner: William James Roy Malicoat
Respondent: Mike Obenland
Case Number: 3:2014cv05578
Filed: July 17, 2014
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Referring Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND DISMISSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, re 17 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by William James Roy Malicoat. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to plaintiff @ Clallam Bay address . Modified on 11/12/2014 (JL).
August 4, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class/Certified Mail/Return Receipt Requested; mailed on 8/4/14 to Respondent & AG's office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; cc to Petitioner w/instruction sheet)
August 5, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion to file a Memorandum in Support of Habeas Petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG; cc to Petitioner)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malicoat v. Obenland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William James Roy Malicoat
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Obenland
Represented By: John Joseph Samson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]