Fujitsu Limited et al v. Netgear, Inc.

Plaintiff: Fujitsu Limited, LG ELECTRONICS, INC. and U.S. Philips Corporation
Defendant: Netgear, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2007cv00710
Filed: December 17, 2007
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of Country
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2009 301 Featured Case ORDER granting 227 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B Crabb on 1/5/09. (rep)
January 9, 2009 302 Featured Case ORDER denying 284 Motion to exclude improperly disclosed opinions. Deft. granted until 2/2/09 to submit an expert report response to the only the doctrine of equivalence opinions. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B Crabb on 1/8/09. (rep) Modified text on 1/9/2009 to correct date to submit expert report from 2/9/09 to 2/2/09. (llj)
January 29, 2009 309 Featured Case ORDER granting as modified 232 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiffs Fujitsu Limited, LG Electronics Inc. and U.S. Philips Corporation awarded attorney fees in the amount of $30,000.00. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B Crabb on 1/29/09. (rep)
July 29, 2009 575 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 443 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 467 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 485 Motion to Strike ; granting 503 Motion to Dismiss ; denying 504 Motion for Leave to File ; granting 508 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/28/09. (rep)
September 18, 2009 667 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 326 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 355 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/18/09. (rep) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2009: # 1 Appendix A) (rep). Modified on 10/1/2009 (llj/t).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fujitsu Limited et al v. Netgear, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fujitsu Limited
Represented By: John Singleton Skilton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LG ELECTRONICS, INC.
Represented By: John Singleton Skilton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Philips Corporation
Represented By: John Singleton Skilton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netgear, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]