Markovic et al v. State of Wisconsin Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Drazen Markovic and Darius Walker
Defendant: State of Wisconsin Department of Corrections, Richard Raemisch, John Bett, Larry Jenkins, Michael Reigh, Jackie Kuhn, J.L. Marcus, Inc., Union Supply, Inc., Access Securepak, Inc. and Walkkenhorst's, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv00042
Filed: January 22, 2009
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Anti-Trust Office
County: Waushara
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:13 Antitrust Litigation - Price

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as unnecessary 10 Motion to Supplement. Each plaintiff to advise by 3/6/09 whether they intend to prosecute this action. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B Crabb on 2/19/2009. (llj),(ps)
April 30, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing complaint. Strike recorded against plaintiffs Drazen Markovic and Darius Walker. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/29/09. (elc),(ps)
April 30, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing case against defendants. (PAO / MFH) (elc),(ps)
January 29, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening and granting motion 2 for screening of the complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B Crabb on 1/28/09. (vob),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Markovic et al v. State of Wisconsin Department of Corrections et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drazen Markovic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darius Walker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wisconsin Department of Corrections
Represented By: Ann M. Peacock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Raemisch
Represented By: Ann M. Peacock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bett
Represented By: Ann M. Peacock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Jenkins
Represented By: Ann M. Peacock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Reigh
Represented By: Ann M. Peacock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Kuhn
Represented By: Ann M. Peacock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.L. Marcus, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Watton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Sybert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access Securepak, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Fuller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walkkenhorst's, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Watton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]