United States of America v. Armijo

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Henry Armijo
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv00337
Filed: May 27, 2009
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for Finding of Contempt. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/6/10. (vob)
January 27, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 MOTION TO DISMISS by Plaintiff United States of America. Defendant is in compliance. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/26/2010. (arw) Modified on 2/10/2010 (llj).
July 17, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 MOTION for Cancel Show Cause Hearing scheduled for July 22, 2009 at 8:30 AM re: 3 Order to Show Cause; granting 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/17/2009. (rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Armijo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Richard D. Humphrey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Armijo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]