Rachuy et al v. McCarney

Plaintiff: Gale A. Rachuy and Sandra K. Rachuy
Defendant: Tom McCarney
Case Number: 3:2009cv00356
Filed: June 8, 2009
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion to reopen case. Plaintiffs have until 9/8/09 to file a renewed motion signed by both plaintiffs and accompanied by an affidavit from each plaintiff about his or her citizenship as well as their belief regarding defendants citizenship. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/31/09. (elc),(ps)
January 7, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Order dismissing complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/6/10. (elc),(ps)
January 7, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant dismissing the case for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 1/7/10. (elc),(ps) Modified text on 1/21/2010 (llj/t).
July 2, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing complaint without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/2/09. (elc),(ps)
July 9, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant Tom McCarney dismissing the case. (PAO / MFH). (eds),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rachuy et al v. McCarney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gale A. Rachuy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra K. Rachuy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom McCarney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]