The Dry Dock L.L.C. v. The Godfrey Conveyor Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: The Dry Dock L.L.C.
Defendant: The Godfrey Conveyor Company, Inc. and Zieman Manufacturing
Case Number: 3:2009cv00396
Filed: June 22, 2009
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: St. Croix
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2010 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 64 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/7/2010. (llj)
June 10, 2010 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/10/2010. (lak)
July 22, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Requiring Proof of Diversity Citizenship. Proof of Diversity Citizenship due by 6/30/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/22/09. (krj)
July 28, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requesting additional information from defendant on diversity of citizenship by 7/30/09. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/27/09. (krj)
August 4, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescheduling Injunctive Hearing to 8/7/09 at 2:00 pm. Plaintiff's proposed finding of fact due by noon on 8/5/09; defendants' proposed facts in response due by noon on 8/7/09. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/4/09. (krj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Dry Dock L.L.C. v. The Godfrey Conveyor Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Dry Dock L.L.C.
Represented By: Warren Lee Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Godfrey Conveyor Company, Inc.
Represented By: James Michel Susag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zieman Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.