Koschnick, Randy R. v. Doyle, James et al

Defendant: Dawn Marie Sass, James Doyle and Kevin Kennedy
Plaintiff: Randy R. Koschnick
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv00767
Filed: December 21, 2009
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: Visiting Judge
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion to Intervene by Common Cause in Wisconsin, League of Women Voters of Wisconsin Education Fund, Wisconsin Democracy Campaign. Proposed intervenors are granted leave to file briefs as amicus curiae on the pending motion for judgment on the pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/10/2010. (arw)
March 31, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; denying as moot 14 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Plaintiff Randy R. Koschnick. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/31/2011. (arw)
March 31, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (PAO) (arw)
September 21, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/20/2011. (arw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Koschnick, Randy R. v. Doyle, James et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Marie Sass
Represented By: Thomas Charles Bellavia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Doyle
Represented By: Thomas Charles Bellavia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Kennedy
Represented By: Thomas Charles Bellavia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy R. Koschnick
Represented By: John Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]