United States of America v. Undetermined quantities of cases of an article of food, each case containing 12/7 ounce packages, labeled in part: ***Strawberry Dreams*** 12x7 OZ. Manufacture Code*** et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Undetermined quantities of cases of an article of food, each case containing 12/7 ounce packages, labeled in part: ***Strawberry Dreams*** 12x7 OZ. Manufacture Code***, Undetermined quantities of cases of an article of food, each case containing 12/7 ounce packages, labeled in part: ***Juicee Gummee***Strawberry Dreams***Ingredients:Corn Syrup***A Company of: Grupo B and All other articles of food in various sizes and types of containers (excluding metal and glass containers) that are located anywhere on the premises of Mid-States Closeouts, 254 South Chestnut Street,
Case Number: 3:2010cv00042
Filed: February 1, 2010
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Food and Drug
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/19/2010. (vob)
February 1, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to Seal documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/1/2010. (vob)
March 5, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for release of goods. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/4/2010. (vob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Undetermined quantities of cases of an article of food, each case containing 12/7 ounce packages, labeled in part: ***Strawberry Dreams*** 12x7 OZ. Manufacture Code*** et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Undetermined quantities of cases of an article of food, each case containing 12/7 ounce packages, labeled in part: ***Strawberry Dreams*** 12x7 OZ. Manufacture Code***
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Undetermined quantities of cases of an article of food, each case containing 12/7 ounce packages, labeled in part: ***Juicee Gummee***Strawberry Dreams***Ingredients:Corn Syrup***A Company of: Grupo B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All other articles of food in various sizes and types of containers (excluding metal and glass containers) that are located anywhere on the premises of Mid-States Closeouts, 254 South Chestnut Street,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.