Apple Inc. v. Motorola Mobility, Inc. Featured Case

Defendant: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00178
Filed: March 11, 2011
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2013 518 Transcript of Telephonic Status Conference, held 5/19/2011 before Judge Barbara B. Crabb. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see Electronic Transcript Instructions and Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (arw)
January 30, 2013 517 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Samuel F. Ernst re: Plaintiff Apple Inc., Counter Defendant Apple Inc. -- Notice of Withdrawal of Covington & Burling LLP as Counsel for Apple Inc. (Ernst, Samuel)
January 25, 2013 516 USCA Case Number 13-1182 (Federal Circuit) for 514 Cross Notice of Appeal by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (arw)
January 18, 2013 515 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Appeal Information Sheet, Docket Sheet and Judgment to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals re: 514 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Info sheet, # 2 Order #194, # 3 Order #509, # 4 Judgment, # 5 Docket sheet) (mmo)
January 18, 2013 514 CROSS NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Filing fee of $455, receipt number 0758-1112529 paid. No Docketing Statement filed. (Swedlow, Stephen) Modified docket text on 1/18/2013. (mmo)
January 18, 2013 513 Transcript Request Form by Plaintiff Apple Inc., Counter Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Powers, Matthew) Modified on 1/18/2013; mailed to Fed. Circuit. (mmo)
January 11, 2013 USCA Case Number 13-1150 re: 511 Notice of Appeal by Apple Inc. (arw)
January 7, 2013 512 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Appeal Information Sheet, Docket Sheet and Judgment to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals re 511 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 Info sheet, # 2 Order, # 3 Judgment, # 4 Docket sheet) (mmo)
January 4, 2013 511 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Plaintiff Apple Inc., Counter Defendant Apple Inc. as to 510 Judgment. Filing fee of $455, receipt number 0758-1105242 paid. (Fram, Robert)
December 5, 2012 510 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. dismissing with prejudice plaintiff Apple Inc.'s claims that defendant violated § 2 of the Sherman Act (count 5), violated Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code § 17200 (count 6), and tortiously interfered with contracts (count 13); and dismissing without prejudice plaintiff's claims against defendant for equitable estoppel (count 1), breach of contract (counts 2, 3 and 4), and declaratory judgment (counts 7, 11 and 12). (PAO) (arw)
November 28, 2012 509 Featured Case ORDER dismissing with prejudice Apple Inc.'s claims that Motorola Mobility, Inc. violated § 2 of the Sherman Act (count 5), violated Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code § 17200 (count 6), and tortiously interfered with contracts (count 13); dismissing without prejudice Apple's claims against Motorola for equitable estoppel (count 1), breach of contract (counts 2, 3 and 4) and declaratory judgment (counts 7, 11 and 12). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/28/2012. (arw)
November 19, 2012 508 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 505 Motion for Leave to File filed by Apple Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
November 15, 2012 507 Declaration of Samuel F. Ernst filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. In Support of Apple's Reply Regarding the Proper Form of Any Dismissal re: 505 Motion for Leave to File (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter from Bruce Sewell to Kent Walker dated November 8, 2012, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Letter from Kent Walker to Bruce Sewell dated November 13, 2012) (Ernst, Samuel)
November 15, 2012 506 Brief in Reply Regarding the Proper Form of Any Dismissal by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 11/19/2012. (arw)
November 15, 2012 505 Motion for Leave to File Apple's Motion for Leave to Reply to Motorola's Response Brief Regarding the Nature of Dismissal by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Ernst, Samuel)
November 14, 2012 504 Response re: 502 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Motorola's Response to Apple's Bench Memorandum regarding the Court's Jurisdiction and the Nature of Any Dismissal by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Swedlow, Stephen)
November 13, 2012 Dismissal with or without Prejudice. (arw)
November 8, 2012 503 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 488 Motion for Reconsideration; denying as moot 489 Motion to Exclude Motorola's Newly Disclosed FRAND Theories; denying as moot 491 Motion to Enforce Summary Judgment Order Determination that ETSI's IPR Policy Unambiguously Requires Pre-Adopotion Disclosure Where a Party Submits a Technical Proposal. This case is DISMISSED. The court will decide whether dismissal is with or without prejudice after the parties have completed briefing on the issue. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/8/2012. (arw)
November 8, 2012 502 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 501 Motion for Leave to Respond re 499 Memorandum regarding the court's jurisdiction and the nature of any dismissal. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/8/2012. (lak)
November 7, 2012 501 Motion for Leave to Respond re: 499 Notice (Other) by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Response due 11/14/2012. (Swedlow, Stephen)
November 6, 2012 500 Transcript of First Day of Court Trial, held 11/5/2012 before Judge Barbara B. Crabb. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see Electronic Transcript Instructions and Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (arw)
November 5, 2012 499 Memorandum regarding the court's jurisdiction and the nature of any dismissal by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (krj)
November 5, 2012 498 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Barbara B. Crabb: Hearing held on 11/5/2012. [1:57] (Court Reporter LS.) (krj)
November 4, 2012 497 Response re: 487 Order, Apple's Response to the Court's Order of November 2, 2012 by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Ernst, Samuel)
November 4, 2012 496 Response re: 487 Order, Motorola's Brief Regarding Jurisdiction and Availability of Remedies by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
November 3, 2012 495 Declaration of Samuel F. Ernst filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. in Support of Apple's Motion to Exclude Motorola's Newly Disclosed FRAND Theories (PUBLIC) re: 494 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Apple Inc.'s Fourth Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 18-25), # 2 Exhibit 2 - Motorola's Amended Objections and Responses to Apple's Fourth Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 18-25) (PUBLIC) (Ernst, Samuel)
November 3, 2012 494 Motion to Exclude Motorola's Newly Disclosed FRAND Theories (PUBLIC) re: 481 Trial Brief by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Response due 11/13/2012. (Ernst, Samuel)
November 3, 2012 493 Motion to to Enforce Summary Judgment Order Determination that ETSI's IPR Policy Unambiguously Requires Pre-Adoption Disclosure Where a Party Submits a Technical Proposal (PUBLIC) re 194 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Plaintiff Apple Inc.. Response due 11/13/2012. (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 11/5/2012; This document is the Public version of 491 . (mmo).
November 3, 2012 492 Declaration of Samuel F. Ernst filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. in Support of Apple's Motion to Enforce Summary Judgment Order Determination that ETSI's IPR Policy Unambiguously Requires Pre-Adoption Disclosure Where a Party Submits a Technical Proposal re: 491 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Annex 1 IPR Information and Declaration Statement, dated Oct. 6, 2000 (MOTO-APPLE-0007144703-05), # 2 Exhibit 2 - Annex 1 IPR Information Statement, dated Oct. 27, 1999 (WI-178-011302-04) (Ernst, Samuel)
November 3, 2012 491 Motion to Enforce Summary Judgment Order Determination that ETSI's IPR Policy Unambiguously Requires Pre-Adopotion Disclosure Where a Party Submits a Technical Proposal (SEALED) re: 194 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Response due 11/13/2012. (Ernst, Samuel)
November 3, 2012 490 Declaration of Samuel F. Ernst filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. in Support of Apple's Motion to Exclude Motorola's Newly Disclosed FRAND Theories (SEALED) re: 489 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Apple Inc.'s Fourth Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 18-25), # 2 Exhibit 2 - Motorola's Amended Objections and Responses to Apple's Fourth Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 18-25) (SEALED) (Ernst, Samuel)
November 3, 2012 489 Motion to Exclude Motorola's Newly Disclosed FRAND Theories (SEALED) re: 481 Trial Brief (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Response due 11/13/2012. (Ernst, Samuel)
November 2, 2012 488 Motion for Reconsideration Whether Motorola Breached its Contracts by Seeking an Injunction in the Illinois Case and as Exclusionary Order in the International Trade Commission re: 424 Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Ernst, Samuel) Modified docket text on 11/5/2012. (mmo)
November 2, 2012 487 Featured Case ORDER requiring response from the parties by 12:00 PM on Sunday, November 4, 2012. The parties should be prepared to discuss the issues identified in this order at 9:00 AM on Monday, November 5, and to commence the trial at 1:00 PM. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/2/2012. (arw)
November 2, 2012 486 Transcript of final pretrial conference, held 11/1/12 before Judge Barbara B. Crabb. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see Electronic Transcript Instructions and Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (krj)
November 2, 2012 485 Final Pretrial Conference Order. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/2/12. (krj)
November 1, 2012 484 Expert Report of Chris Heegard (September 15, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 11/2/2012; see 476 for exhibits. (mmo)
November 1, 2012 483 Expert Report of Chris Heegard (September 15, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 11/2/2012; see 475 for exhibits. (mmo)
November 1, 2012 482 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Barbara B. Crabb: Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/1/2012. Trial predicted to last 9 days. [1:07]Attention: In the event of a settlement of this matter over the weekend, counsel are advised to contact the Clerk of Court at (608) 287-4875 or the Chief Deputy Clerk at (608) 354-8004. (Court Reporter LS.) (krj)
October 31, 2012 481 Trial Brief Motorola's Trial Brief by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 31, 2012 480 Expert Report of Mark Lanning (May 23, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 479 Expert Report of Mark Lanning (July 13, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 11/1/2012; requested attorney refile with exhibits attached separately and described. (mmo) Disregard removed on 11/1/2012. (rep)
October 31, 2012 478 Expert Report of Louis Berneman (September 15, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 11/1/2012; requested attorney refile with exhibits attached separately and described. (mmo) Disregard removed on 11/1/2012. (rep)
October 31, 2012 477 Expert Report of Chris Heegard (October 25, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 11/1/2012; requested attorney refile with exhibit attached separately and described. (mmo) Removed disregard on 11/1/2012. (rep)
October 31, 2012 476 Exhibits to 484 Expert Report of Chris Heegard (September 15, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - CV, # 2 Exhibit B - List of Cases, # 3 Exhibit C - Materials Considered, # 4 Exhibit D - Invalidity Chart, # 5 Exhibit E - Invalidity Chart, # 6 Exhibit F - Invalidity Chart, # 7 Exhibit G - Invalidity Chart, # 8 Exhibit H - Invalidity Chart, # 9 Exhibit I - Invalidity Chart, # 10 Exhibit J - Invalidity Chart, # 11 Exhibit K - Invalidity Chart, # 12 Exhibit L - Invalidity Chart, # 13 Exhibit M - Invalidity Chart, # 14 Exhibit N - Invalidity Chart, # 15 Exhibit O - Invalidity Chat, # 16 Exhibit P - Invalidity Chart) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 11/1/2012; requested attorney refile; abode acrobat error with main document. (mmo).
October 31, 2012 475 Exhibits to 483 Expert Report of Chris Heegard (September 15, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - CV, # 2 Exhibit B - Materials Reviewed, # 3 Exhibit C - Invalidity Claim Charts) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 11/1/2012; adobe error message for main document, requested attorney refile. (mmo).
October 31, 2012 474 Expert Report of J. Stevenson Kenney (March 1, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 11/1/2012; requested attorney refile with exhibits attached separately and described. (mmo). Removed disregard on 11/1/2012 (rep).
October 31, 2012 473 Expert Report of Brian Napper (March 20, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Documents Reviewed, # 2 Exhibit 1.1 - CV, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Exemplary Shot Screens, # 4 Exhibit 2.1 - Previous Testimony, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Publications, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Documents Reviewed, # 7 Exhibit 5 - Summary of Motorola Accused Products, # 8 Exhibit 6.1 - Motorola Accused Products - Units Sold (Quarterly), # 9 Exhibit 6.2 - Motorola Accused Products - Unit Sold (Annual), # 10 Exhibit 7.1 - Motorola Accused Products - Revenue, Cost of Revenue and Gross Margin (Quarterly), # 11 Exhibit 7.2 - Motorola Accused Products - Revenue, Cost of Revenue and Gross Margin (Annual), # 12 Exhibit 8 - Motorola Global Mobile Device Business - Statement of Operations, # 13 Exhibit 9 - Motorola U.S. Mobile Device Business - Revenue, Cost of Revenue and Gross Margin, # 14 Exhibit 10 - Apple License Agreement Summary, # 15 Exhibit 11 - Motorola License Agreement Summary, # 16 Exhibit 12 - Motorola Lost Operating Profit from '647 Design Around (September 2009 - December 2009, # 17 Exhibit 13.1 - Summary of Damages, # 18 Exhibit 13.2 - Royalty Calculation for the '949 Patent, # 19 Exhibit 13.3 - Royalty Calculation for the '647 patent) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 472 Expert Report of Chris Heegard (October 25, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Materials Considered, # 2 Exhibit B - IMC Summary) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 471 Expert Report of Chris Heegard (March 22, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 470 Expert Report of Chris Heegard (March 22, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Materials Considered) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 469 Expert Report of Brian Napper (April 15, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - CV, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Napper Testimony for Previous Five Years, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Publications of Brian W. Napper, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Documents Reviewed and Considered, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Reasonably Royalty Damages, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Reasonable Royalty Damages Limited to the '516 Patent Notification, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Reasonable Royalty Damages Based on Mulhern Opinion of Individual Patent Share, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Reasonable Royalty Damages Based on Mulhern Opinion of Individual Patent Share Limited to the '516 Patent Notification, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Per Unit Profitability of Accused Apple iPhone Products, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Per Unit Profitability of Accused Apple iPad Products, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Per Unit Profitability of Accused Apple AirPort Card Products, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Per Unit Profitability of Accused Apple AirPort Base Station Products, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Apple U.S. Sales of Accused Products, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Apple U.S. Sales of Accused Products - Average Selling Price, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Apple U.S. Sales of Accused Products - Per Unit Standard Cost, # 16 Exhibit 16 - Apple Worldwide Per Unit GAAP Line of Business Reporting Apple Desktop and Laptop Computers, # 17 Exhibit 17 - Apple Worldwide Per Unit GAAP Line of Business Reporting - Apple iPhone, # 18 Exhibit 18 - Apple Worldwide Per Unit GAAP Line of Business Reportin - Aple iPad, # 19 Exhibit 19 - Motorola License Agreement Summary, # 20 Exhibit 20 - Apple License Agreement Summary, # 21 Exhibit 21 - Top Vendor Traditional Handset and Smartphone Market Hardware Revenue, # 22 Exhibit 22 - Maximum Payment_Royalty Rate, # 23 Exhibit 23 - Theoretical Maximum Payment_Royalty Rate, # 24 Exhibit 24 - Theoretical Maximum Payment_Royalty Rate, # 25 Exhibit 25 - Theoretical Maximum Payment_Royalty Rate, # 26 Exhibit 26 - Theoretical Maximum Payment_Royalty Rate, # 27 Exhibit 27 - Apple's Actual v. Forecasted Units, # 28 Exhibit 28 - Motorola Android Product Sales - Units, # 29 Exhibit 29 - Motorola Global Mobile Devices Business Statement of Operations, # 30 Exhibit 30 - Royalties paid to Motorola by Licensee (2006-2010), # 31 Exhibit 31 - Adjustment 1 to Mulhern's Lost Profit Calculation - Adjusting Market Expansion Factor, # 32 Exhibit 32 - Adjustment 2 to Mulhern's Lost Profit Calculation - Adjusting Motorola's Market Share, # 33 Exhibit 33 - Adjustment 3 to Mulhner's Lost Profit Calculation - Adjusting Market Expansion Factor and Motorola's Market Share, # 34 Exhibit 34 - Estimated Motorola Benefit Due to Apple's Presence in the Market) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 468 Expert Report of Leonard J. Cimini (October 25, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Materials Considered) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 467 Expert Report of Chris Heegard (March 1, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Materials Considered, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Screen Shot) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 466 Declaration of Samuel F. Ernst in Support of 465 Apple's Trial Brief (Opposing Counsel CC'd and Exhibits Filed with the Clerk's Office on CD-Rom) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified docket text/docket relationship on 11/1/2012 (mmo).
October 31, 2012 465 Trial Brief by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 464 Expert Report of Tim Williams (September 15, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 11/1/2012; requested attorney refile with exhibits attached separately and described. (mmo). Removed disregard on 11/1/2012 (rep).
October 31, 2012 463 Expert Report of Dennis Carlton (April 15, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Materials Relied Upon) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 462 Expert Report of Louis P. Berneman (April 15, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 461 Expert Report of Brian W. Napper (April 20, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Documents Reviewed and Considered, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Motorola Cliq Features and Functions Usage, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Summary of Motorola Accused Products, # 4 Exhibit 4.1 - Motorola Accused Products - Units Sold (Quarterly), # 5 Exhibit 4.2 - Motorola Accused Products - Units Sold (Annual), # 6 Exhibit 5.1 - Motorola Accused Products - Revenue, Cost of Revenue and Gross Margin (Quarterly), # 7 Exhibit 5.2 - Motorola Accused Products - Revenue, Cost of Revenue and Gross Margin (Annual), # 8 Exhibit 6.1 - Summary Damages, # 9 Exhibit 6.2 - Royalty Calculation for the '949 Patent, # 10 Exhibit 6.3 - Royalty Calculation for the '647 Patent, # 11 Exhibit 6.4 - Royalty Calculation for the '263 Patent, # 12 Exhibit 6.4.2 - Royalty Calculation for the '263 Patent, # 13 Exhibit 6.5 - Royalty Calculation for the '002 Patent) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 460 Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Chris Heegard (April 20, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 459 Expert Report of Leonard J. Cimini (September 15, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - CV, # 2 Exhibit B - Items Considered in Forming Expert Opinion, # 3 Exhibit C - Reasons fof Allowance, # 4 Exhibit D - Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Jeffrey Smolinske) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 458 Expert Report of Richard J. Holleman (May 23, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - CV, # 2 Exhibit B - Materials and Documents Reviewed) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 457 Expert Report of Timothy S. Simcoe (September 14, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - CV, # 2 Exhibit B - Materials Reviewed, # 3 Exhibit C - ETSI Rules of Procedure, # 4 Exhibit D - Essential Patent Family Counts by License, # 5 Exhibit E - Classificaton of ETSI Project Codes into 2G, 3G, and 4G Standards, # 6 Exhibit F - Essential Patent Families by Company and Standard - INPADOC Families) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 456 Expert Report of Timothy S. Simcoe (March 6, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -Appendix A - Expert Report of Timothy Simcoe (9/14/11), # 2 Exhibit 2 - Appendix B - Expert Report of Timothy Simcoe (3/1/2012), # 3 Exhibit A - CV, # 4 Exhibit B - Materials Reviewed, # 5 Exhibit C - ETSI Rules of Procedure, # 6 Exhibit D - Essential Patent Family Counts by License, # 7 Exhibit E - Classification of ETSI Project Codes into 26,36, and 46 Standards, # 8 Exhibit F - Essential Patent Families by Company and Standard INPADOC Families) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 455 Supplemental Expert Report of Timothy Simcoe (March 1, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 454 Expert Report of Mark Lanning (May 6, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 453 Expert Report of Jerry A. Hausman (May 6, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 452 Expert Report of J. Stevenson Kenney (April 20, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt from "Principles of Communications Systems") (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 451 Expert Report of Gregory K. Leonard (May 23, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - CV, # 2 Exhibit B - Documents Reviewed and/or Relied Upon) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 450 Expert Report of Gregory K. Leonard (October 25, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 449 Expert Report of Brian W. Napper (September 14, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - CV, # 2 Exhibit B - Previous Testimony, # 3 Exhibit C - Publications, # 4 Exhibit D - Materials Reviewed and Considered, # 5 Exhibit E - Select your iPhone) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified exhibit description on 10/31/2012 (mmo).
October 31, 2012 448 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 444 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Clarification. (Ernst, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 447 Expert Report of Louis P. Berneman (March 6, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - CV, # 2 Exhibit Appendix A - Expert Report of Louis P. Berneman (Sept. 15, 2011), # 3 Exhibit Appendix B - Supplemental Expert Report of Louis P. Berneman (March 1, 2012) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified exhibit description on 10/31/2012. (mmo)
October 30, 2012 446 Declaration of Richard Anthony Lopez filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. In Support of Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion to Strike Reports of Undisclosed "Experts" David E. Culler and Steve W. McLaughlin re: 417 Motion to Strike (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - E-mail chain between Jason Raofield and Stephen Swedlow) (Lopez, Richard)
October 30, 2012 445 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 417 Motion to Strike filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Lopez, Richard)
October 30, 2012 Set/Reset Briefing Deadlines as to 444 Motion for Clarification re: 424 Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Brief in Opposition due 10/31/2012 by noon. (sp/krj)
October 30, 2012 444 Motion for Clarification re: 424 Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Response due 10/31/2012 by noon. (Swedlow, Stephen) Modified on 10/30/2012. (arw) Modified briefing schedule per chambers on 10/30/2012 (krj).
October 30, 2012 Action Requested: Counsel are requested to provide by the close of business on October 29, 2012 courtesy copies of proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law, witness lists, exhibit lists and proposed verdict forms. If they have not done so already, counsel may bring courtesy copies of deposition transcripts to the Final Pretrial Conference on November 1, 2012. (arw/sp)
October 29, 2012 443 Joint Final Pretrial Conference Report Parties' Pretrial Statement by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Facts and Issues of Law (Sealed Document), # 2 Exhibit B - Stipulation Regarding Expert Qualifications (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel) Exhibits A and B sealed on 10/30/2012. (arw)
October 29, 2012 442 Proposed Conclusions of Law by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 29, 2012 441 Proposed Findings of Fact by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 29, 2012 440 Proposed Conclusions of Law by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 29, 2012 439 Proposed Findings of Fact by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 29, 2012 438 Proposed Special Verdict - Liability and Damages by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (McCray, Michael)
October 29, 2012 437 Proposed Special Verdict - Liability and Damages Apple Inc.'s Proposed Special Verdict by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Ernst, Samuel)
October 29, 2012 436 Deposition Designations Parties' Deposition Designations by Plaintiff Apple Inc.. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 29, 2012 435 Exhibit List Parties' Exhibit List by Plaintiff Apple Inc.. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 29, 2012 434 Witness List Parties' Witness List by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 29, 2012 433 Deposition of Brian Blasius taken on November 18, 2011 Direct Witness Statement (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 29, 2012 432 Deposition of Yong Hui Tong taken on August 28, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 29, 2012 431 Deposition of Carla Mulhern taken on April 27, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 29, 2012 430 Deposition of Richard Holleman taken on April 11, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 29, 2012 429 Deposition of Kirk Dailey taken on April 12, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 29, 2012 428 Deposition of Mark Buckley taken on July 8, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 29, 2012 427 Deposition of Mark Buckley taken on February 22, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 29, 2012 426 Deposition of Boris Teksler taken on December 9, 2010 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 29, 2012 425 Deposition of Brian Blasius taken on June 3, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 29, 2012 424 Featured Case ORDER denying 310 Motion in Limine No. 1; granting in part and denying in part 311 Motion in Limine No. 2; granting 312 Motion in Limine No. 3; granting in part and denying in part 313 Motion in Limine No. 4; granting in part and denying in part 314 Motion in Limine No. 5; denying 315 Motion in Limine No. 6; denying 316 Motion in Limine No. 7; denying 317 Motion in Limine No. 8; granting in part and denying in part 318 Motion in Limine to Exclude Dr. Leonard from Opining on the Correct FRAND Royalty Rate; denying 319 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Gregory Leonard Relating to Synergies; granting 321 Motion in Limine Request for Judicial Notice; denying 226 Motion for Leave to Rely Upon Supplemental Expert Reports; denying 280 Motion in Limine to Preclude Apple From Seeking Specific Performance; denying 283 Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Timeliness of Patent Disclosures to ETSI; denying 286 Motion in Limine to Determine the Terms of ETSI and IEEE Policies; granting in part and denying in part 289 Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument in Support of Apple's Frand Breach and Estoppel Claims; denying 292 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Concerning Prior Litigation Judicial Decisions; denying 295 Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Non-Parties CMCS and Qualcomm; granting in part and denying in part 298 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and References to Irrelevant Standards and Standard Setting Bodies; denying 301 Motion in Limine to Preclude Testimony and Opinions of Mr. Louis Berneman; denying 304 Motion in Limine to Preclude Testimony and Opinions of Dr. Dennis Carlton; denying 307 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Related to Allegedly Non-Infringing Alternatives; granting 218 Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Leonard Cimini; granting 229 Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Brian Napper. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/29/2012. (arw)
October 26, 2012 423 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Motorola has filed a request for guidance, directed to the scheduling of the trial set to begin on November 5, 2012 (dkt. 386 .) At present, the trial is expected to run for two weeks. The court will make every effort to keep the trial to one week but can make no promises that it will not last longer. Motorola will have to work within this schedule and plan its witnesses' testimony accordingly. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/26/12. (krj)
October 26, 2012 422 Supplemental Declaration of Samuel F. Ernst filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. In Support of Apple's Opposition to Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Motion for Guidance on the Trial Schedule re: 386 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18 - Amendment to Order of October 11, 2012, Microsoft v. Motorola, No. C10-1823JLR (W.D. Wash.) (Dkt. No. 469)) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 26, 2012 421 Notice by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re 419 Brief in Opposition Notice of Corrected Citations. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 26, 2012 420 Declaration of Samuel F. Ernst filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. In Support of Apple's Opposition to Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Motion for Guidance on the Trial Schedule re: 386 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Cellular Essential Properties Cross License Agreement, dated October 24, 2003 and Bates Stamped as MOTO-APPLE 0003986319-86, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Blanket Purchase Order, dated June 22, 2007 and Bates Stamped WI-178 006789, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Blanket Purchase Order, dated June 29, 2007 and Bates Stamped WI-178 010707, # 4 Exhibit 4 - letter to Mr. Huang from Mr. Dailey, dated August 4, 2007 and Bates Stamped MOTO-APPLE 0004351575_001141, # 5 Exhibit 5 - letter to Mr. Rosenberg from Mr. Whitaker, dated August 6, 2007 and Bates Stamped WI-178 003651-52, # 6 Exhibit 6 - letter to Mr. Sonnentag from Mr. Mavrakakis, dated March 5, 2008 and Bates Stamped WI-178 002651-52, # 7 Exhibit 7 - e-mail chain between Mr. Dailey and Mr. Teksler, dated April 20-21, 2010 and Bates Stamped WI-178 002028-31, # 8 Exhibit 8 - e-mail chain between Mr. Mavrakakis and Mr. Sonnetag, dated October 19, 2007 and Bates Stamped WI-178 002554-55, # 9 Exhibit 9 - e-mail from Mr. Mavrakakis to Mr. Sonnentag, dated October 31, 2007 and Bates Stamped WI-178 006514, # 10 Exhibit 10 - e-mail from Mr. Sonnentag to Mr. Mavrakakis attaching Motorola response letter dated November 12, 2007 and Bates Stamped WI-178 002618-20, # 11 Exhibit 11 - e-mail from Mr. Mavrakakis to Mr. Sonnentag, dated December 11, 2007 and Bates Stamped WI-178 002647, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Motorola document titled Feature Requirements and Architecture Specification, dated May 28, 2003 and Bates Stamped MOTO-APPLE 0000753910-754061, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Apple document Bates Stamped WI-178 004236, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Order from Microsoft v. Motorola, Case No. C10-1823JLR (W.D. Wash.), dated October 22, 2012, Docket No. 490, # 15 Exhibit 15 - ETSI Rules of Procedure, dated November 18, 1997 and Bates Stamped 745 Apple 7256417-421, # 16 Exhibit 16 - Order from Microsoft v. Motorola, Case No. C10-1823JLR (W.D. Wash.), dated October 10, 2012, Docket No. 465, # 17 Exhibit 17 - Pretrial Order from Microsoft v. Motorola, Case No. C10-1823JLR (W.D. Wash.), dated October 24, 2012, Docket 493) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 26, 2012 419 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 386 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 24, 2012 418 Corrected Deposition of Dwight Smith taken on April 13, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 24, 2012 Reset Briefing Deadlines re: 386 Motion for Guidance on Trial Schedule by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Brief in Opposition due 10/26/2012 by 12:00 PM CST. (arw/bbc)
October 23, 2012 417 Motion to Strike REPORTS OF UNDISCLOSED "EXPERTS" DAVID E. CULLER AND STEVEN W. MCLAUGHLIN (Sealed Document) by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Response due 10/30/2012. (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 416 Deposition of Anne Layne-Farrar taken on May 17, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 415 Deposition of Richard Sonnentag taken on May 11, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 414 Deposition of Robert O'Hara taken on May 25, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 413 Deposition of Charlotte Whitaker taken on June 13, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 412 Deposition of Jonathan Meyer taken on June 15, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 411 Deposition of Patrick Murphy taken on October 12, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 410 Deposition of Taraneh Maghame taken on October 12, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 409 Deposition of Kenneth McNeill Taylor, Jr., taken on April 27, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen) Modified on 10/24/2012; corrected name. (mmo).
October 23, 2012 408 Disregard - refiled as entry 418 ; Modified on 10/24/2012; requested attorney refile in condensed format (mmo).
October 23, 2012 407 Deposition of Colin Frank taken on May 26, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 406 Deposition of Helene Workman taken on September 19, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 405 Deposition of Stephan Schell taken on April 13, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 404 Deposition of Mark Lanning taken on June 2, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 403 Deposition of Mark Lanning taken on June 1, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 402 Deposition of Timothy Simcoe taken on April 30, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 401 Deposition of Brian Napper taken on September 19, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 400 Deposition of Brian Napper taken on May 22, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 399 Deposition of Brian Napper taken on April 29, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 398 Deposition of Chris Heegard taken on May 4, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 397 Deposition of Leonard Cimini taken on July 13, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 396 Deposition of Louis Berneman taken on May 8, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 395 Deposition of Gregory Leonard taken on July 5, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen) Modified on 10/24/2012; corrected date. (mmo).
October 23, 2012 394 Deposition of J. Stevenson Kenney taken on May 31, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 393 Deposition of J. Stevenson Kenney taken on April 27, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 392 Deposition of Kevin Almeroth taken on June 3, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 391 Deposition of Timothy Kowalski taken on September 27, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 390 Deposition of Meng Zhu taken on April 13, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Errata) (Swedlow, Stephen) Modified on 10/24/2012; corrected first name and date of deposition. (mmo).
October 23, 2012 389 Deposition of David Willard taken on August 25, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 388 Deposition of Kevin Laird taken on June 7, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 23, 2012 387 Deposition of Tyler Brown taken on April 11, 2012, Vol. 3, (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen) Modified on 10/24/2012; corrected date of depo., added vol. number 3. (mmo).
October 23, 2012 386 Motion for Guidance on Trial Schedule by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Response due 10/30/2012. (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 22, 2012 Set Deadlines and Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2012 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Barbara B. Crabb. (arw)
October 16, 2012 385 Expert Report of David E. Culler by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 16, 2012 384 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 346 Motion to Admit Michael Rex McCray Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 10/16/2012. (arw)
October 15, 2012 383 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re 251 Motion for Sanctions (Sealed Document) filed by Apple Inc. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Withdrawal of Its Motion for Discovery Sanctions. (Shafroth, Nathan)
October 12, 2012 382 Declaration of Samuel F. Ernst filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. in Support of Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions re: 301 Motion in Limine, 307 Motion in Limine, 289 Motion in Limine, 286 Motion in Limine, 283 Motion in Limine, 298 Motion in Limine, 304 Motion in Limine, 280 Motion in Limine, 292 Motion in Limine, 295 Motion in Limine (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17 - GPD Standards Strategy Version 0.2 08/09/98, # 2 Exhibit 18 - Platform Planning and Systems Architecture, Business Update Meeting (Dec. 19, 2007), # 3 Exhibit 19 - PCS Research and Advanced Technology Labs 1999 Second Half Review (Jan. 15, 2000), # 4 Exhibit 20 - 3GPP E-UTRA Long Term Evolution (LTE) (Oct. 20, 2006), # 5 Exhibit 21 - Agenda Overview (MOT_ITC2586191-2586208), # 6 Exhibit 22 - OMA PoC and PAG Standard (May 31, 2006) (MOT_ITC2205834-2205866), # 7 Exhibit 23 - NDIL, Motorola's Brief Pursuant to the Court's June 13, 2012 Order, in Illinois Case (June 18, 2012), # 8 Exhibit 24 - November 1999 submission to ETSI (WI-178-011302-11304), # 9 Exhibit 25 - IPR Information and Declaration Statement (WI-178-026111-2611, # 10 Exhibit 26 - Letter to From R. Sonnentag to R. Pocknell (Apr. 20, 2005), # 11 Exhibit 27 - Letter from K. Dailey to D. Aberle (Jan. 11, 2011), # 12 Exhibit 28 - Letter from K. Dailey to J. Huang (Aug. 31, 2007), # 13 Exhibit 29 - Certified translation of Samsung Electronics Co. v. S.A.R.I. Apple, RG No. 11/58301, Tribunal de grand instance [TGI] [Court of First Instance] Paris, Dec. 8, 2011 (Fr.), # 14 Exhibit 30 - Letter from R. Sonnentag to B. Booth (June 21, 2005), # 15 Exhibit 31 - Palm, Inc. Development and Supply Line Agreement (June 2003), # 16 Exhibit 32 - Chi Mei Commercial Invoice (Jan. 15, 2004), # 17 Exhibit 33 - Revised Direct Witness Statement of Kirk Dailey, in 745 Investigation (Dec. 7, 2011), # 18 Exhibit 34 - NDIL, Motorola's Opposition to Apple's Motion in Limine No. 11 to Preclude Motorola, in Illinois case (May 21, 2012), # 19 Exhibit 35 - Judgment in a Civil Action, in the Illinois case (June 22, 2012), # 20 Exhibit 36 - Pretrial Conference Hearing Transcript, in the Illinois case (June 7, 2012), # 21 Exhibit 37 - NDIL, Declaration of Justin Huang, in the Illinois case (March 1, 2012), # 22 Exhibit 38 - Cellular Essential Properties Cross License Agreement (Oct. 1, 2003) (MOTO-APPLE-0003986319-86), # 23 Exhibit 39 - purchase order from Chi Mei Communication Systems to Apple (June 22, 2007) (WI-178-006789), # 24 Exhibit 40 - purchase order from Chi Mei Communication Systems to Apple (June 29, 2007) (WI-178-010707), # 25 Exhibit 41 - Motorola's letter to Chi Mei Communication Systems (August 4, 2007) (MOTO-APPLE-0004351575_01141), # 26 Exhibit 42 - Motorola's letter to Apple (August 6, 2007) (WI-178-003651-67), # 27 Exhibit 43 - Apple's letter to Motorola (March 5, 2008) (WI-178-002651-52), # 28 Exhibit 44 - E-mail exchange between Apple and Motorola (Apr. 21, 2010) (WI-178-002028-31), # 29 Exhibit 45 - Verified Complaint Under Section 337 of the Tariff Act of 1930, in 745Investigation (October 6, 2010), # 30 Exhibit 46 - Patent License Agreement between Motorola and Qualcomm (Sept. 26, 1990) (MOTO-APPLE-0004351575_01124-37), # 31 Exhibit 47 - Agreement to Amend the Patent License Agreement between Motorola and Qualcomm (MOTO-APPLE-0004104703-20), # 32 Exhibit 48 - Qualcomm's letter to Motorola (Mar. 7, 2007) (MOTO-APPLE-0004104762-74), # 33 Exhibit 49 - PCS-IP Licensing (MOT_ITC1260687-743), # 34 Exhibit 50 - PCS IP & Global Standards World Class Leadership (Oct. 9, 2003) (MOT_ITC1057510-35), # 35 Exhibit 51 - OMA Device Management (MOTO-APPLE-0003333564-73), # 36 Exhibit 52 - Standards, IP Network Systems Standards Report (Jan. 19, 2006) (MOTO-APPLE-0003310707-58), # 37 Exhibit 53 - Motorola Mobility MMI - Samsung Meeting (Mar. 23, 2011) (MOTO-APPLE-005218084_00770-84), # 38 Exhibit 54 - Motorola Mobility - HTC Meeting, IP License Discussions (Feb. 2, 2011) (MOTO-APPLE-0005218084_00762-69), # 39 Exhibit 55 - Motorola Licensing Presentation to Apple (Sept. 27, 2007( (WI-178-001697-99) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified exhibit descriptions on 10/15/2012. (mmo)
October 12, 2012 381 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 304 Motion in Limine filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Opinions of Dr. Dennis Carlton Relating to FRAND and Market Power on Rule 702 and Daubert Grounds (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 12, 2012 380 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 301 Motion in Limine filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. Apple's Opposition to Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Opinions of Dr. Louis Berneman Relating to FRAND on Rule 702 and Daubert Grounds (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 12, 2012 379 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 307 Motion in Limine filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Related to Allegedly "Non-Infringing Alternatives" to Motorola U.S. Patent Nos. 5,311,516, 6,175,559, and 6,359,898 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 12, 2012 378 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 283 Motion in Limine filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Timeliness to Patient Disclosures to ETSI (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 12, 2012 377 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 280 Motion in Limine filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. Apple's Brief in Opposition to Motorola's Motion in Limine to Preclude Apple from Seeking Specific Performance (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 12, 2012 376 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 295 Motion in Limine filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. Apple's Brief in Opposition to Motorola's Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Non-Parties (1) CMCS, and (2) Qualcomm (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 12, 2012 375 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 298 Motion in Limine filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and References to Irrelevant Standards and Standard Setting Bodies (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 12, 2012 374 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 289 Motion in Limine filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion in Limine Under FRE 408 to Preclude Evidence and Argument in Support of Apple's FRAND Breach and Estoppel Claims after January 4, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 12, 2012 373 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 286 Motion in Limine filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion in Limine to Determine the Terms of ETSI and IEEE Policies (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 12, 2012 372 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 292 Motion in Limine filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Concerning Prior Litigation Judicial Decisions Regarding the Patents-in-Suit (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 12, 2012 371 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 315 Motion in Limine filed by Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 370 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 314 Motion in Limine filed by Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 369 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 313 Motion in Limine filed by Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 368 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 312 Motion in Limine filed by Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 367 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 311 Motion in Limine filed by Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 366 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 310 Motion in Limine, filed by Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 365 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 317 Motion in Limine filed by Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 364 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 319 Motion in Limine filed by Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 363 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 318 Motion in Limine filed by Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 362 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 316 Motion in Limine filed by Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 361 Declaration of David Elihu re 360 Brief in Opposition of Apple Inc's Request for Judicial Notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- 337-TA-745 Initial Determination, # 2 Exhibit B-337-TA-794 Initial Determination (Part One), # 3 Exhibit B-337-TA-794 Initial Determination (Part Two), # 4 Exhibit C-Correspondence from Ericsson, Inc., # 5 Exhibit D-Correspondence from Interdigital Communications, LLC, # 6 Exhibit E-Submission of the Office of Unfair Import Investigations on Remedy and the Public Interest, # 7 Exhibit F-Qualcomm Incorporated in Response to the Commission's Request for Written Submissions, # 8 Exhibit G-Correspondence from Research in Motion Corporation, # 9 Exhibit H-Statement from Samsung, # 10 Exhibit I-Correspondence from The Innovation Alliance) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 360 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 321 Motion in Limine filed by Apple Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 359 Expert Report of Dr. J. Stevenson Kenney Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,246,697 by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - C.V. of J. Stevenson Kenney, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Expert Report of J. Stevenson Kenney (May 7, 2011), # 3 Exhibit 3 - Rebuttal Expert Report of J. Stevenson Kenney (May 23, 2011), # 4 Exhibit 4 - Rebuttal Expert Report of J. Stevenson Kenney (July 21, 2011), # 5 Exhibit 5 - Corrected Direct Witness Statement of Dr. J. Stevenson Kenney (November 18, 2011), # 6 Exhibit 6 - Corrected Rebuttal Witness Statement of Dr. J. Stevenson Kenney (November 30, 2011)) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 358 Expert Report of J. Stevenson Kenney, Ph.D Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - C.V. of J. Stevenson Kenney, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Expert Report of J. Stevenson Kenney (September 15, 2011), # 3 Exhibit 3 - Rebuttal Expert Report of J. Stevenson Kenney (October 25, 2011), # 4 Exhibit 4 - Supplemental Expert Report of J. Stevenson Kenney (March 1, 2012), # 5 Exhibit 5 - Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of J. Stevenson Kenney (March 22, 2012)) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 357 Expert Report of Dr. Kevin C. Almeroth Regarding U.S. Patent No. 5,636,223 (April 15, 2012) by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - C.V. of Kevin C. Almeroth, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Expert Report of Kevin C. Almeroth (May 6, 2011), # 3 Exhibit 3 - Rebuttal Expert Report of Kevin C. Almeroth (May 23, 2011), # 4 Exhibit 4 - Corrected Direct Witness Statement of Kevin C. Almeroth (November 18, 2011), # 5 Exhibit 5 - Rebuttal Witness Statement of Kevin C. Almeroth (November 30, 2011), # 6 Exhibit 6 - Deposition of David Andrus (May 6, 2011), # 7 Exhibit 7 - Deposition of Karl Reardon (May 27, 2011), # 8 Exhibit 8 - 337-TA-745 Hearing Transcript (December 8, 2011)) (Swedlow, Stephen) Modified exhibit description on 10/15/2012; depos. previously filed. (mmo).
October 12, 2012 356 Deposition of Kirk Dailey taken on May 11, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 355 Supplemental Expert Report of Brian W. Napper (March 1, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - C.V. for Brian Napper, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Testimony, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Publications, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Documents Reviewed and Considered, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Traditional Handset and Smartphone Revenue, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Motorola's Theoretical Maximum Payment for Rights, # 7 Exhibit 6.1 - Traditional Handset and Smartphone Revenue, # 8 Exhibit 6.2 - Traditional Handset and Smartphone Revenue, # 9 Exhibit 6.3 - Motorola Home and Networks Mobility Revenue, # 10 Exhibit 7 - Motorola's Theoretical Maximum Payment for Rights to Nokia, # 11 Exhibit 7.1 - Traditional Handset and Smartphone Revenue, # 12 Exhibit 7.2 - Traditional Handset and Smartphone Revenue, # 13 Exhibit 7.3 - Motorola Home and Networks Mobility Revenue, # 14 Exhibit 7A - Motorola's Theoretical Maximum Payment for Rights, # 15 Exhibit 7A.1 - Traditional Handset and Smartphone Revenue, # 16 Exhibit 7A.2 - Traditional Handset and Smartphone Revenue, # 17 Exhibit 7A.3 - Motorola Home and Networks Mobility Revenue, # 18 Exhibit 8 - Motorola's Theoretical Maximum Payment for Rights, # 19 Exhibit 8.1 - Traditional Handset and Smartphone Revenue, # 20 Exhibit 8.2 - Traditional Handset and Smartphone Revenue, # 21 Exhibit 8.3 - Motorola Home and Network Mobility Revenue, # 22 Exhibit 8A - Motorola Theoretical Maximum Payment for Rights, # 23 Exhibit 8A.1 - Traditional Handset and Smartphone Revenue, # 24 Exhibit 8A.2 - Traditional Handset and Smartphone Revenue, # 25 Exhibit 8A.3 - Motorola Home and Networks Mobility Revenue) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 12, 2012 354 Expert Report of Mark Lanning (March 6, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 12, 2012 353 Supplemental Expert Report of Louis P. Berneman (March 1, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Curriculum Vitae for Louis Berneman, # 2 Exhibit B - Additional Materials Considered, # 3 Exhibit C - License Agreement between CMCS and Motorola, # 4 Exhibit D - Expert Report of Dennis Carlton) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 12, 2012 352 Expert Report of Louis P. Berneman (September 15, 2011) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Curriculum Vitae for Louis Berneman, # 2 Exhibit B - Materials Considered, # 3 Exhibit C - Motorola Declarations Submitted to ETSI re GSM, # 4 Exhibit D - IEEE and ETSI 3GPP Policies) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 12, 2012 351 Disregard - refiled as entry 385 ; Modified on 10/15/2012; no signature, requested attorney refile. (mmo).
October 12, 2012 350 Expert Report of Carla S. Mulhern (March 20, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 12, 2012 349 Expert Report of Tim Williams (April 15, 2012) by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - C.V. of Tim Williams, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Expert Report of Tim Williams (September 15, 2011), # 3 Exhibit 3 - Rebuttal Expert Report of Tim Williams (October 25, 2011), # 4 Exhibit 4 - Supplemental Expert Report of Time Williams (March 1, 2012), # 5 Exhibit 5 - Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of Tim Williams (March 22, 2012) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 348 Deposition of Kevin C. Almeroth taken on August 31, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 347 Expert Report of Kevin C. Almeroth (April 15, 2012) by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - C.V. of Kevin C. Almeroth, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Expert Report of Kevin C. Almeroth (September 15, 2011), # 3 Exhibit 3 - Rebuttal Expert Report of Kevin C. Almeroth (October 25, 2011), # 4 Exhibit 4 - Supplemental Expert Report of Kevin C. Almeroth (March 1, 2012), # 5 Exhibit 5 - Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of Kevin C. Almeroth (March 22, 2012) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 346 Motion to Admit Michael Rex McCray Pro Hac Vice. (Pro Hac Vice fee $50, receipt number 0758-1065163) by Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer. (McCray, Michael)
October 10, 2012 345 Deposition of J. Stevenson Kenney taken on Sept. 7, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 10, 2012 344 Deposition of Colin Frank taken on Aug. 23, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 5, 2012 343 Notice by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Notice of Intent to Serve Trial Subpoenas. (Fram, Robert)
October 5, 2012 342 Deposition of David Tom taken on October 2, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 341 Deposition of Jeff Williams taken on September 25, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 340 Deposition of Kenneth Stewart taken on August 28, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 339 Deposition of Robert Love taken on August 28, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 338 Deposition of Brian Classon taken on August 24, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 337 Deposition of Tony Blevins taken on May 18, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 336 Deposition of Mark Buckley taken on March 16, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 335 Deposition of Boris Teksler taken on March 14, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 334 Deposition of Mark Buckley taken on February 22, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 333 Deposition of Stan Ng taken on February 17, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 332 Deposition of Boris Teksler taken on February 16, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 331 Deposition of Tom Mavrakakis taken on July 19, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 330 Deposition of Boris Teksler taken on July 7, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 329 Deposition of Jerry Hausman taken on June 8, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 328 Deposition of Daniel Borges taken on June 2, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 327 Deposition of Karl Reardon taken on May 27, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 3, 2012 326 Declaration of Amanda S. Williamson re 325 Brief in Opposition (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 3, 2012 325 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 251 Motion for Sanctions filed by Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 1, 2012 324 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 266 Motion to Admit Robert Joseph Williams Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 10/1/2012. (arw)
September 28, 2012 323 Exhibit to 322 Declaration, filed by Apple Inc. Exhibits 20-45 to Lopez Declaration In Support of Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 20 - (Part 1) Apple's Amended Complaint in the Illinois case, # 2 Exhibit 20 - (Part 2) Apple's Amended Complaint in the Illinois case, # 3 Exhibit 20 - (Part 3) Apple's Amended Complaint in the Illinois case, # 4 Exhibit 21 - Apple's Answer to Corrected Verified Complaint in the ITC 745 Investigation, # 5 Exhibit 22 - Apple's Second Amended Complaint in Case. No. 3:12cv00355 (S.D. Cal. Aug. 3, 2012), # 6 Exhibit 23 - Motorola's Answer to Second Amended Complaint in the S.D. Cal. Case, # 7 Exhibit 24 - U.S. Patent No. 4,975,952, # 8 Exhibit 25 - U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559, # 9 Exhibit 26 - U.S. Patent No. 6,359,898, # 10 Exhibit 27 - U.S. Patent No. 6,359,898 patent provisional application, # 11 Exhibit 28 - U.S. Patent No. 5,490,230, # 12 Exhibit 29 - U.S. Patent No. 5,636,223, # 13 Exhibit 30 - U.S. Patent No. 5,319,712, # 14 Exhibit 31 - U.S. Patent No. 5,572,193, # 15 Exhibit 32 - U.S. Patent No. 6,246,697, # 16 Exhibit 33 - U.S. Patent No. 5,311,516, # 17 Exhibit 34 - LM Ericsson Telephone Co., Form 6-K (Jan. 25, 2012), # 18 Exhibit 35 - Motorola, Inc. Form 10-K, year ended December 31, 2008, # 19 Exhibit 36 - Motorola, Inc. Form 10-K, year ended December 31, 2009, # 20 Exhibit 37 - Nokia Corp., Form 6-K (Jan. 26, 2012), # 21 Exhibit 38 - Nokia Corp., Form 20-F (Dec. 31, 2010), # 22 Exhibit 39 - Nokia Corp., Form 6-K (May 2, 2011), # 23 Exhibit 40 - Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Form 20-F, year ended December 31, 2007, # 24 Exhibit 41 - Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Form 20-F, year ended December 31, 2008, # 25 Exhibit 42 - Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Form 20-F, year ended December 31, 2009, # 26 Exhibit 43 - Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Form 20-F, year ended December 31, 2010, # 27 Exhibit 44 - Federal Reserve Selected Interest Rates (Daily), # 28 Exhibit 45 - Federal Reserve Historical Rates for the Euro) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified docket text on 10/1/2012 (mmo).
September 28, 2012 322 Declaration of Richard Anthony Lopez filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. In Support of Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice re: 321 Motion in Limine (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Order of January 16, 2012, in the Illinois case, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Order of April 9, 2012, in the Illinois case, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Order of June 5, 2012, in the Illinois case, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Opinion and Order of October 13, 2011 in the Illinois case, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Commission Decision Finding No Violation of Section 337 from ITC 745 Investigation, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Opinion and Order of June 22, 2012 in the Illinois case, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Motorola's Answer and Counterclaims in Case No. 2:08-CV-247 (E.D. Tex.), # 8 Exhibit 8 - Motorola's Responses to Apple's Proposed Findings of Fact, filed May 30, 2012, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Motorola's Answer and Counterclaims to Amended Complaint in the Illinois case, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Motorola's Corrected Verified Complaint in the ITC 745 Investigation, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Third Party US FTC Statement on the Public Interest attached to Injunctive Relief Opposition in the ITC 745 Investigation, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Business Software Alliance's Response on the Public Interest-Industry participant briefs in the ITC 745 Investigation, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Hewlett Packard Co.'s Response of Public Interest-Industry participant briefs in the ITC 745 Investigation, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Verizon's Statement of Public Interest-Industry participant briefs in the ITC 745 Investigation, # 15 Exhibit 15 - RILA's Statement of Public Interest-Industry participant briefs in the ITC 745 Investigation, # 16 Exhibit 16 - ACT's Statement of Public Interest-Industry participant briefs in the ITC 745 Investigation, # 17 Exhibit 17 - Nokia's Statement of Public Interest-Industry participant briefs in the ITC 745 Investigation, # 18 Exhibit 18 - Cisco's Statement of Public Interest-Industry participant briefs Opposition in the ITC 745 Investigation, # 19 Exhibit 19 - AT&T's Statement of Public Interest-Industry participant briefs in the ITC 745 Investigation) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 321 Motion in Limine - Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 320 Declaration of Samuel F. Ernst filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. In Support of Apple's Motions In Limine Nos. 1-8 and Daubert Motions re: 318 Motion in Limine, 312 Motion in Limine, 314 Motion in Limine, 313 Motion in Limine, 311 Motion in Limine, 310 Motion in Limine, 317 Motion in Limine, 315 Motion in Limine, 319 Motion in Limine, 316 Motion in Limine (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Motorola's Answer and Counterclaims in Case No. 3:10-cv-00661 (W.D. Wis. Nov. 9,, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Motorola's Answer and Counterclaims in Case No. 3:10-cv-00662 (W.D. Wis. Nov. 9, 2010), # 3 Exhibit 3 - Order of January 16, 2012 in the Illinois case, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Order of April 9, 2012, in the Illinois case, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Order of June 5, 2012, in the Illinois case, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Motorola's Supplemental Objections and Responses to Apple's Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 9, 12-16) (Sep. 6, 2012), # 7 Exhibit 7 - Cellular Essential Properties Cross License Agreement between Motorola and Chi Mei (Oct. 2003), # 8 Exhibit 8 - Motorola letter to Chi Mei (Aug. 31, 2007), # 9 Exhibit 9 - ND of IL - Declaration of Richard Lutton (Dec. 12, 2011), # 10 Exhibit 10 - Notice of Commission Decision Finding No Violation of Section 337 from ITC 745 Investigation") (Aug. 24, 2012), # 11 Exhibit 11 - Order of May 22, 2012, in the Illinois case, # 12 Exhibit 12 - spreadsheet produced by Motorola, and Bates Stamped as MOTO-APPLE-0007539444, # 13 Exhibit 13 - USA CRMOTO results and Bates Stamped as MOTO-APPLE-0007372450-0007372522, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Motorola's Answer and Counterclaims to Apple's Amended Complaint in Case No. 3:10-cv-00662 (W.D. Wis. Mar. 22, 2011), # 15 Exhibit 15 - Motorola's letter to Chi Mei (Oct. 5, 2007) (Warren Dep. Ex. 31), # 16 Exhibit 16 - Motorola's letter to Chi Mei (Oct. 26, 2007) (Warren Dep. Ex. 28) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified exhibit description on 10/1/2012. (mmo)
September 28, 2012 319 Motion in Limine - Daubert Motion To Exclude Testimony Of Dr. Gregory Leonard Relating To Synergies (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 318 Motion in Limine - Daubert Motion To Exclude Dr. Leonard From Opining On The Correct FRAND Royalty Rate For Motorola's Declared Standards-Essential Patents (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 317 Motion in Limine No. 8 To Exclude Improper Motorola Expert Testimony (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 316 Motion in Limine No. 7 To Preclude Evidence And Argument Regarding Opinions On Alternatives From Motorola's Technical Experts (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 315 Motion in Limine No. 6 To Preclude Motorola From Arguing That Its Cellular Standards-Essential Patent Rights Were Not Exhausted As To The First iPhone (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 314 Motion in Limine No. 5 To Preclude Motorola From Offering Evidence About Why It Purported To Suspend Its License With Chi Mei (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 313 Motion in Limine No. 4 To Preclude Motorola From Offering Evidence Or Argument That It Had A "Process" For Complying With IPR Disclosure Policies (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 312 Motion in Limine No. 3 To Exclude Evidence And Argument That Apple Must Satisfy A Condition Precedent To Trigger Motorola's FRAND Obligation (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 311 Motion in Limine No. 2 To Exclude Evidence And Argument That Motorola's Patents Ruled Invalid Or Not Infringed Have Value (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 310 Motion in Limine No. 1 To Preclude Motorola From Offering Evidence Or Argument That It Was Entitled To Seek Injunctive Relief And/Or That It Did Not Breach Its FRAND Contracts By So Doing (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 309 Declaration of Stephen A. Swedlow filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 307 Motion in Limine (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Tdoc SMG2 GPRS 75/95, # 2 Exhibit 2 - ETSI SMG2/3/GPRS Tdoc 99/96) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 308 Brief in Support of 307 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Related to Allegedly "Non-Infringing Alternatives" to Motorola Patents by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 307 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Related to Allegedly "Non-Infringing Alternatives" to Motorola Patents by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 306 Declaration of Stephen A. Swedlow filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 304 Motion in Limine (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- August 6, 2007 correspondence from C. Whitaker, # 2 Exhibit 2 - July 24, 2008 correspondence from R. Sonnentag, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Expert Reports of Brian W. Napper, dated September 14, 2011, March 1, 2012 and March 6, 2012, # 4 Exhibit 4 - 1992 Agreement) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 305 Brief in Support of 304 Motion in Limine to Preclude the Testimony and Opinions of Dr. Dennis Carlton Relating to FRAND and Market Power on Rule 702 and Daubert Grounds by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 304 Motion in Limine to Preclude the Testimony and Opinions of Dr. Dennis Carlton Relating to FRAND and Market Power on Rule 702 and Daubert Grounds (Sealed Document) by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 303 Declaration of Stephen A. Swedlow filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 301 Motion in Limine (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Louis P. Berneman (sans appendices), dated March 6, 2012) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 302 Brief in Support of 301 Motion in Limine to Preclude the Testimony and Opinions of Mr. Louis Berneman Relating to FRAND on Rule 702 and Daubert Grounds by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 301 Motion in Limine to Preclude the Testimony and Opinions of Mr. Louis Berneman Relating to FRAND on Rule 702 and Daubert Grounds (Sealed Document) by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 300 Declaration of Stephen A. Swedlow filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 298 Motion in Limine (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - July 2005 Presentation, # 2 Exhibit 2 - June 2005 Presentation, # 3 Exhibit 3 - January 2006 Report, # 4 Exhibit 4 - January 2007 Report, # 5 Exhibit 5 - April 2007 Report, # 6 Exhibit 6 - February 7, 2007 correspondence from W. Weigel, # 7 Exhibit 7 - April 19, 2007 correspondence from J. Meyer, # 8 Exhibit 8 - February 19, 2007 correspondence from W. Weigel, # 9 Exhibit 9 - August 2, 2007 correspondence from L. Gordon) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 299 Brief in Support of 298 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and References to Irrelevant Standards and Standard Setting Bodies by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 298 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and References to Irrelevant Standards and Standard Setting Bodies by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 297 Declaration of Stephen A. Swedlow filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 295 Motion in Limine (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - September 19, 2012 email from R. Fram, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 2003 Agreement, # 3 Exhibit 3 - August 4, 2007 correspondence from K. Dailey, # 4 Exhibit 4 - 2007 Agreement, # 5 Exhibit 5 - January 11, 2011 correspondence from K. Dailey) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 296 Brief in Support of 295 Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Non-Parties (1) CMCS, and (2) Qualcomm by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 295 Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Non-Parties (1) CMCS, and (2) Qualcomm (Sealed Document) by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 294 Declaration of Stephen A. Swedlow filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 292 Motion in Limine (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Commission Opinion from U.S.I.T.C. Investigation No. 337-TA-745, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Motorola's December 20, 2002 IPR disclosure to ETSI, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Motorola's April 8, 2003 IPR disclosure to ETSI, # 4 Exhibit 4 - August 6, 2007 correspondence from C. Whitaker of Motorola, Inc. to D. Rosenberg of Apple Inc., # 5 Exhibit 5 - July 24, 2008 correspondence from R. Sonnentag of Motorola, Inc. to T. Mavrakakis of Apple Inc., # 6 Exhibit List of Patents, July 2011, # 7 Exhibit January 2011 Agreement) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 293 Brief in Support of 292 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Concerning Prior Litigation Judicial Decisions Regarding the Patents-In-Suit by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 292 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Concerning Prior Litigation Judicial Decisions Regarding the Patents-In-Suit by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 291 Declaration of Stephen A. Swedlow filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 289 Motion in Limine (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, January 2011 Agreement, # 2 Exhibit 2, November 2011 Agreement) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 290 Brief in Support of 289 Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument in Support of Apple's Frand Breach and Estoppel Claims After January 4, 2011 by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 289 Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument in Support of Apple's Frand Breach and Estoppel Claims After January 4, 2011 (Sealed Document) by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 288 Declaration of Stephen A. Swedlow filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 286 Motion in Limine (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - September 19, 2012 email from R. Fram, counsel for Apple Inc., to counsel for Motorola Mobility LLC, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Apple Inc.'s Amended First Supplemental Responses to Motorola's Second Set of Interrogatories (No. 5), # 3 Exhibit 3 - ETSI's Intellectual Property Rights Policy, Annex 6 to ETSI's Rules of Procedure, dated April 8, 2009, # 4 Exhibit 4 - IEEE-SA Standards Board Bylaws, Approved by the IEEE-SA Board of Governors February 2011, # 5 Exhibit 5 - ETSI Guide on Intellectual Property Rights (IPRs) adopted on November 27, 2008, # 6 Exhibit 6 - The ETSI IPR Policy and Undertaking as approved by the ETSI General Assembly held 16th to 18th March 1993, # 7 Exhibit 7 - ETSI Interim IPR Policy to be approved by the 21st ETSI General Assembly (22-23 November 1994) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 287 Brief in Support of 286 Motion in Limine to Determine the Terms of ETSI and IEEE Policies by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 286 Motion in Limine to Determine the Terms of ETSI and IEEE Policies by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 285 Declaration of Stephen A. Swedlow filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 283 Motion in Limine (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - September 19, 2012 email from R. Fram, counsel for Apple Inc., to counsel for Motorola Mobility LLC, # 2 Exhibit 2 - ETSI's Intellectual Property Rights Policy from November 18, 1997, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Motorola's December 20, 2002 IPR disclosure to ETSI, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Motorola's April 8, 2003 IPR disclosure to ETSI) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 284 Brief in Support of 283 Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Timeliness of Patent Disclosures to ETSI by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 283 Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Timeliness of Patent Disclosures to ETSI by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 282 Declaration of Stephen A. Swedlow filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 280 Motion in Limine. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - September 19, 2012 email from R. Fram, counsel for Apple Inc., to counsel for Motorola Mobility LLC, # 2 Exhibit 2 - ETSI's Intellectual Property Rights Policy, Annex 6 to ETSI's Rules of Procedure, dated April 8, 2009, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Report of the GA ad hoc group on ETSI's IPR Policy Operation from ETSI's November 2003 General Assembly Meeting, # 4 Exhibit 4 - ETSI IPR Review Ad Hoc Group Report from October 10, 2006, # 5 Exhibit 5 - ETSI Guide on Intellectual Property Rights (IPRs) from November 27, 2008, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Section 6 from the IEEE-SA Standards Board Bylaws, printed February 18, 2011, # 7 Exhibit 7 - August 6, 2007 correspondence from C. Whitaker of Motorola, Inc. to D. Rosenberg of Apple Inc., # 8 Exhibit 8 - July 24, 2008 correspondence from R. Sonnentag of Motorola, Inc. to T. Mavrakakis of Apple Inc., # 9 Exhibit 9 - Agreement dated January 4, 2011, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Agreement dated November 16, 2011) (Swedlow, Stephen) Modified on 10/1/2012. (arw)
September 28, 2012 281 Brief in Support of 280 Motion in Limine to Preclude Apple From Seeking Specific Performance by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 280 Motion in Limine to Preclude Apple From Seeking Specific Performance (Sealed Document) by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 279 Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Chris Heegard by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Materials considered) (Robson, Matthew) Modified exhibit description on 10/1/2012 (mmo).
September 28, 2012 278 Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Chris Heegard by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Materials considered) (Robson, Matthew) Modified exhibit description on 10/1/2012 (mmo).
September 28, 2012 277 Expert Report of Richard Holleman (dated April 15, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Curriculum Vitae, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of R. Holleman in Support of Motorola's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 3 Exhibit 3 - ND of IL - Expert Report of R. Holleman, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Rebuttal Witness Statement of R. Holleman, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Materials Considered, # 6 Exhibit 6 - 1993 ETSI IPR Policy and Undertaking, # 7 Exhibit 7 - November 1994 ETSI Interim IPR Policy, # 8 Exhibit 8 - November 11, 2011 Letter from Apple to ETSI, # 9 Exhibit 9 - March 20, 2012 Apple submission to ETSI, # 10 Exhibit 10 - October 10, 2006 ETSI IPR Review ad hoc group Report, # 11 Exhibit 11 - 2003 Report of the GA ad hoc group on ETSI's IPR Policy operation) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified exhibit description on 10/1/2012 (mmo).
September 28, 2012 276 Expert Report of Tim Williams (dated March 22, 2012 Supplemental Rebuttal Report) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 275 Expert Report of J. Stevenson Kenney (March 22, 2012 Supplemented Rebuttal Report) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 274 Expert Report of J. Stevenson Kenney by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Curriculum Vitae, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Initial Expert Report of J. Kenney (Infringement), # 3 Exhibit 3 - Rebuttal Expert Report of J. Kenney (Validity), # 4 Exhibit 4 - Rebuttal Expert Report of J. Kenney Regarding Expert Report of M. Lanning, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Corrected Direct Witness Statement of J. Kenney, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Corrected Rebuttal Witness Statement of J. Kenney) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 273 Deposition of Jean-Pierre Le Cannellier taken on May 13, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 272 Deposition of Gregory Leonard taken on April 25, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 271 Deposition of Latonia Gordon taken on September 13, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 270 Expert Report of Tim Williams Regarding U.S. Patent 6,359,898 (Apr. 15, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Curriculum Vitae, # 2 Exhibit 2 - T. Williams Initial Expert Report (Infringement), # 3 Exhibit 3 - T. Williams Rebuttal Expert Report (Validity), # 4 Exhibit 4 - T. Williams Supplemental Initial Expert Report (Infringement), # 5 Exhibit 5 - T. Williams Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report (Validity) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 269 Expert Report of Kevin Almeroth (dated March 22, 2012 Supplemented Rebuttal Report) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 268 Deposition of Ray Warren taken on September 25, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 267 Deposition of Tim Williams taken on September 21, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 266 Motion to Admit Robert Joseph Williams Pro Hac Vice. (Pro Hac Vice fee $50, receipt number 34690015369) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (Williams, Robert)
September 28, 2012 265 Deposition of Mark Lanning taken on September 20, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 264 Deposition of Chris Heegard taken on September 7, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 263 Deposition of Brian Blasius taken on February 22, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 262 Deposition of Leonard Cimini taken on August 31, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 261 Deposition of Dennis Carlton taken on August 15, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 260 Deposition of Louis Berneman taken on May 8, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 259 Deposition of Dwight Smith taken on August 21, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 27, 2012 258 Stipulation for the Exchange of Rule 26(A)(3) Disclosures by Plaintiff Apple Inc., Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fram, Robert)
September 27, 2012 Reset Trial Deadlines/Hearings: Court Trial set for 11/5/2012 at 9:00 AM. (arw)
September 25, 2012 257 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 255 Unopposed Motion for Bench Trial by Plaintiff Apple Inc. The parties are to comply with the requirements of the order in non-jury cases assigned to Judge Crabb that they received following the July 21, 2011 pretrial conference before Magistrate Judge Crocker. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/25/2012. (arw)
September 24, 2012 256 Declaration of Samuel F. Ernst filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. in Support of Apple's Unopposed Motion for Bench Trial re: 255 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Motorola's Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Aug. 28, 2012)) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 24, 2012 255 Unopposed Motion for Bench Trial (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff Apple Inc.. Response due 10/1/2012. (Ernst, Samuel)
September 21, 2012 Set Briefing Deadlines re: 251 Motion for Sanctions by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Brief in Opposition due 10/3/2012. Brief in Reply due 10/15/2012. (arw/pao)
September 20, 2012 254 Deposition of Leonard J. Cimini (Final Transcript) taken on August 31, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 19, 2012 253 Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 251 Motion for Sanctions (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Apple's First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-71) (July 13, 2012), # 2 Exhibit 2 - Motorola's Objections and Responses to Apple's First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-71) (Aug. 16, 2012), # 3 Exhibit 3 - Motorola's Objections and Amended Responses to Apple's First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-71) (Sept. 5, 2012), # 4 Exhibit 4 - E-mail from A. Williamson (Sept. 11, 2012), # 5 Exhibit 5 - E-mail from N. Shafroth (Sept. 13, 2012), # 6 Exhibit 6 - E-mail from A. Williamson (Sept. 14, 2012), # 7 Exhibit 7 - November 30, 2010 press release, "Motorola to Complete Separation on January 4, 2011", # 8 Exhibit 8 - Apple's Answer, in Inv. No. 337-TA-745 (ITC) (Dec. 1, 2010), # 9 Exhibit 9 - Nov. 18, 1997 ETSI Rules of Procedure, Annex Six, Bates Stamped as 745-Apple7256417-21, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Nov. 22, 2000 ETSI Rules of Procedure, Annex Six, Bates Stamped as 745-Apple7256411-16, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Nov. 21, 2001 ETSI Rules of Procedure, Annex Six, and Bates Stamped as 745-Apple7256422-27, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Apr. 2003 ETSI Directives and IPR Policy, Bates Stamped as 745-Apple4743298-390, # 13 Exhibit 13 - December 1993 IEEE Standards Board Bylaws, Bates Stamped as IEEE-APP-ITC-000190-206, # 14 Exhibit 14 - December 1994 IEEE Standards Board Bylaws, Bates Stamped as IEEE-APP-ITC-000207-222, # 15 Exhibit 15 - December 1995 IEEE Standards Board Bylaws, Bates Stamped as IEEE-APP-ITC-000223-39, # 16 Exhibit 16 - December 1996 IEEE Standards Board Bylaws, Bates Stamped as IEEE-APP-ITC-000240-256, # 17 Exhibit 17 - January 1998 IEEE Standards Board Bylaws, Bates Stamped as IEEE-APP-ITC-000334-50, # 18 Exhibit 18 - January 1999 IEEE Standards Board Bylaws, Bates Stamped as IEEE-APP-ITC-000351-65, # 19 Exhibit 19 - October 1999 IEEE Standards Board Bylaws, Bates Stamped as IEEE-APP-ITC-000433-49, # 20 Exhibit 20 - December 2000 IEEE Standards Board Bylaws, Bates Stamped as IEEE-APP-ITC-000257-72) (Shafroth, Nathan)
September 19, 2012 252 Brief in Support of 251 Motion for Sanctions by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Shafroth, Nathan)
September 19, 2012 251 Motion for Sanctions (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Shafroth, Nathan)
September 19, 2012 250 Deposition of Latonia Gordon (Rough) taken on September 13, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Shafroth, Nathan)
September 11, 2012 249 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 229 Motion to Strike filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: The Supplemental Expert Report of Brian Napper (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 11, 2012 248 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 240 Motion to Admit Matthew John Connolly Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 9/11/2012. (arw)
September 10, 2012 247 Exhibit to 246 Declaration of Richard Anthony Lopez filed by Apple Inc. Ex. 2 - Declaration of Leonard J. Cimini in Case 11-cv-08540 (N.D. Ill. Apr. 13, 2012). (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 9/11/2012. (arw)
September 7, 2012 246 Declaration of Richard Anthony Lopez filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. In Support of Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion to Strike The Expert Report of Dr. Leonard Cimini re: 218 Motion to Strike, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Apple's Motion to Supplement Its Expert Reports in Case No. 11-cv-08540 (N.D. Ill. Apr. 13, 2012), # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Leonard J. Cimini in Case No. 11-cv-08540 (N.D. Ill. Apr. 13, 2012) - See 247 , # 3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Tim A. Williams in Case No. 11-cv-08540 (N.D. Ill. May 7, 2012) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 9/10/2012; Error message in opening Exhibit 2; requested attorney refile. (mmo)
September 7, 2012 245 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 218 Motion to Strike, filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: The Expert Report of Dr. Leonard Cimini (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 7, 2012 244 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 226 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Apple Inc. Motorola's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Leave to Reply Upon Supplemental Expert Reports (Sealed Document) (Cannon, Brian)
September 7, 2012 243 Deposition of Tim Williams taken on May 8, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 7, 2012 242 Deposition of Leonard Cimini (Rough) taken on August 31, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 7, 2012 241 Expert Report of Leonard J. Cimini (March 22, 2012 Rebuttal Report) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - List of materials considered, # 2 Exhibit B - Excerpt from the rough transcript of Tiberiu Muresan) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 7, 2012 240 Motion to Admit Matthew John Connolly Pro Hac Vice. (Pro Hac Vice fee $50, receipt number 34690015217) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (Connolly, Matthew)
September 6, 2012 239 Deposition of Gregory K. Leonard taken on August 28, 2012 (Final Transcript) (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 5, 2012 238 Declaration of Brian C. Cannon filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 218 Motion to Strike,, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - March 2, 2012 Motorola Production Cover Letter, # 2 Exhibit 2 - March 30, 2012 Apple Production Cover Letter, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Joint Motion to Modify the Case Schedule, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Apple's Motion to Supplement Expert Reports (N.D. Ill.), # 5 Exhibit 5 - Order Denying in Part Apple's Motion to Supplement (N.D. Ill.), # 6 Exhibit 6 - Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Expert report of Leonard J. Cimini, Ph.D. Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,359,898) (Cannon, Brian)
September 5, 2012 237 Declaration of Samuel Ernst re 236 Expert Report, in support of Expert Report of Brian W. Napper (March 6, 2012) (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - summary of invoice from the law firm of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP in ITC Investigation Case No. 337-TA-745, # 2 Exhibit B - summary of invoice from the law firm of Covington & Burling LLP in ITC Investigation Case No. 337-TA-745, # 3 Exhibit C - summary of invoice from the law firm of Tensegrity Law Group LLP in ITC Investigation Case No. 337-TA-745, # 4 Exhibit D - summary of invoice from the law firm of Covington & Burling LLP in Wisconsin and Illinois cases, # 5 Exhibit E - summary of invoice from the law firm of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP in instant case, # 6 Exhibit F - summary of invoice from the law firm of Covington & Burling LLP in instant case) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 5, 2012 236 Expert Report of Brian W. Napper (March 6, 2012) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Curriculum Vitae, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Previous Five Years Testimony, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Publications, # 4 Exhibit 4 - First Amended Complaint) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 5, 2012 Reset Briefing Deadlines as to 229 Motion to Strike 223 Expert Report of Brian Napper. Brief in Opposition due 9/11/2012. (rep)
September 4, 2012 235 Supplemental Expert Report of Brian W. Napper by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Curriculum Vitae, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Napper Testimony, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Publications, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Apple's Amended First Supplemental Responses to Motorola's 2nd Set of Interrogatories (August 23, 2012), # 5 Exhibit 5 - Invoices for the services of J. Hausman, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Invoices for the services of Compass Lexecon, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Invoices for the services of FTI Consulting/Napper, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Invoices for the services of Leonard Cimini, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Invoices for the services of Chris Heegard, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Invoices for the services of Louis Berneman/Cornerstone Research, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Invoices re California Case) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 4, 2012 234 Expert Report of Leonard J. Cimini, PH.D. by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Items Considered, # 2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of report of Tim Williams, # 3 Exhibit C - Motorola's Notice of Subpoena to AT&T, # 4 Exhibit D - Apple's Notice of Subpoena to AT&T, # 5 Exhibit E - Custodian Declaration of H. Axelsson, # 6 Exhibit F - Custodian Declaration of D. Rawdin, # 7 Exhibit G - GSM 03.64 (WI-Apple 0530977-0531019), # 8 Exhibit H - Tdoc SMG2 GPRS 239/97 (WI-Apple 0530882-530902), # 9 Exhibit I - Tdoc SMG2 GPRS 75/95 (WI-APPLE 0531060-531073) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 9/5/2012; corrected event to match document. (mmo)
September 4, 2012 233 Supplemental Expert Report of Leonard J. Cimini, PH.D. by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - List of Materials Considered, # 2 Exhibit B - Search Strings re Prior Art) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 9/5/2012; corrected event to match document. (mmo).
September 4, 2012 232 Brief in Support of 218 Motion to Strike, Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Dr. Leonard Cimini by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian Cannon - see 238 , # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7) (Cannon, Brian) Modified on 9/5/2012; requested attorney refile Declaration as a separate document with exhibits attached separately and described. (mmo).
September 1, 2012 231 Declaration of Meghan E. Bordonaro filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 229 Motion to Strike (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Apple's Response to Motorola's First Notice of Deposition, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Apple's First Supplemental Response to Motorola's Interrogatory No. 5, # 3 Exhibit 3 - August 31, 2012 Email from S. Ernst to S. Swedlow) (Cannon, Brian) Modified exhibit numbers on 9/5/2012 (mmo).
September 1, 2012 230 Brief in Support of 229 Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Brian Napper by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Cannon, Brian)
September 1, 2012 229 Motion to Strike 223 Supplemental Expert Report of Brian Napper by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Response due 9/10/2012. (Cannon, Brian) Modified docket text on 9/5/2012. (mmo)
August 31, 2012 228 Declaration of Richard Anthony Lopez filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 226 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Apple Inc.'s Supplemental Responses to Motorola's Second Set of Interrogatories (August 23, 2012), # 2 Exhibit 2 - Second Amended Complaint in Case No. 12cv00355 (S.D. Ca. Aug. 3, 2012), # 3 Exhibit 3 - Ericsson Document, Bates numbered WI-APPLE4403509-WI-APPLE4403573, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Nokia Document, excerpts of Bates numbered ATT000207-662, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Motorola's Notice of Subpoena to Third Party AT&T Inc. and AT&T Mobility LLC (Feb. 8, 2012), # 6 Exhibit 6 - Apple's Notice of Subpoena to Third Party AT&T Inc. and AT&T Mobility LLC (March 30, 2012), # 7 Exhibit 7 - E-mail from Ernst to Swedlow (Aug. 31, 2012) (Ernst, Samuel)
August 31, 2012 227 Brief in Support of 226 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Apple's Motion for Leave to Rely Upon Supplemental Expert Reports by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
August 31, 2012 226 Motion for Leave to Rely Upon Supplemental Expert Reports (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Response due 9/7/2012. (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 9/5/2012. (arw)
August 31, 2012 225 Disregard - refiled as entry 233 . (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 9/4/2012; wrong document attached, requested attorney refile Supplemental Report with exhibits attached separately and described. (mmo)
August 31, 2012 224 Disregard - refiled as entry 234 . (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 9/4/2012; wrong document attached, requested attorney refile Expert Report with exhibits attached separately and described. (mmo)
August 31, 2012 223 Disregard - refiled as entry 235 . (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 9/4/2012; requested attorney refile with exhibits attached separately and described. (mmo)
August 31, 2012 222 Disregard - refiled as entry 236 . (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 9/4/2012; requested attorney refile with exhibits attached separately and described. (mmo)
August 31, 2012 221 Deposition of Gregory Leonard (Rough) taken on August 28, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
August 31, 2012 220 Deposition of Leonard J. Cimini, Ph.D. taken on May 4, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
August 31, 2012 219 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 217 Motion to Admit Matthew Daniel Robson Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 8/31/2012. (arw)
August 31, 2012 218 Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Leonard Cimini (Sealed Document) by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Response due 9/7/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support - See 232 , # 2 Declaration of Brian C. Cannon - See 238 , # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7) (Cannon, Brian) Modified on 9/4/2012; brief and declaration refiled separately. (mmo)
August 30, 2012 217 Motion to Admit Matthew Daniel Robson Pro Hac Vice. (Pro Hac Vice fee $50, receipt number 0758-1039954) by Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (Robson, Matthew)
August 30, 2012 216 Transcript of Telephone Motion Hearing, held 8/29/2012 before Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see Electronic Transcript Instructions and Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (arw)
August 29, 2012 215 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** At an August 29, 2012 telephonic hearing, after hearing from both sides, the court denied defendant's Motion for Protective Order 197 and granted plaintiff's Motion to Compel 205 for the reasons stated on the record. Each side will bear its own costs on these motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/28/2012. (jaf)
August 29, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer: Motion Hearing held on 8/29/2012 re 197 Motion for Protective Order precluding plaintiff from taking certain depositions filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., 205 Motion to Compel Rule 30(B)(6) Depositions (Sealed Document) filed by Apple Inc. [1:00] (Court Reporter LS.) (jaf)
August 27, 2012 214 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 205 Motion to Compel filed by Apple Inc. Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Response to Apple's Motion to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amanda S. Williamson, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Apple's 1st Supp Resp to Moto's 2nd Set of Rogs (No 5), # 3 Exhibit 2 - Motorola's Supplemental Response to Apple's Fourth Notice of Deposition) (Cannon, Brian) Modified on 8/28/2012; requested attorney refile Declaration as a separate document with exhibits attached separately to it and described. (mmo).
August 23, 2012 213 Declaration of Richard Anthony Lopez filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. In Support of Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Protective Order re: 197 Motion for Protective Order (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 26 - e-mail from Tyler Brown (May 25, 1999), and Bates Stamped as MOTO APPLE 0007229209, # 2 Exhibit 27 - e-mail from Kevin Laird, and Bates Stamped as MOTO APPLE 0004110939-40, # 3 Exhibit 28 - e-mail from Nick Whinnett (June 18, 1998), and Bates Stamped as MOTO APPLE 0004110915-16, # 4 Exhibit 29 - ITC Prehearing and Tutorial transcript on December 8, 2011 in the Case No. 337-TA-745 (ITC), # 5 Exhibit 30 - e-mail from Amanda Williamson (August 13, 2012), # 6 Exhibit 31 - Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment in Case No. 11-cv-8540 (N.D. Ill. January 9, 2012), # 7 Exhibit 32 - letter from Raymond Warren to Justin Huang (October 26, 2007), # 8 Exhibit 33 - e-mail from Amanda Williamson (August 6, 2012), # 9 Exhibit 34 - Case No. 11-cv-8540 (N.D. Ill. April 16, 2012) Declaration of Colleen Robinson including exhibits, # 10 Exhibit 35 - Exhibit 1 (Confidential GPD Standards Action list V1.6 - 10 July 98) from the Howard Benn deposition (May 2, 2012)) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified exhibit description on 8/24/2012 (mmo).
August 23, 2012 212 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 197 Motion for Protective Order filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ernst, Samuel)
August 23, 2012 211 Deposition of Justin Huang taken on March 16, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
August 23, 2012 210 Deposition of Fabian Dennis Gonell taken on August 21, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
August 21, 2012 209 Expert Report of Dr. Gregory K. Leonard (Motorola) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
August 21, 2012 208 Expert Report of Dennis W. Carlton, PH. D by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
August 21, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 205 Motion to Compel Rule 30(B)(6) Depositions. Telephone Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2012 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer. Counsel for Defendant responsible for setting up the call to chambers at 608-261-5795. (llj)
August 20, 2012 207 Declaration of Richard Anthony Lopez filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 205 Motion to Compel (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Motorola's Objections and Response to Apple's Second Notice of Deposition (Aug. 6, 2012), # 2 Exhibit 2 - Motorola's Motion in Limine To Preclude Dr. Heegard From Testifying On Prior Art in Case No. 11-cv-8540 (N.D. Ill. May 15, 2012), # 3 Exhibit 3 - Motorola's Objections and Responses to Apple's Fourth Set of Request for Admissions (Nos. 519-567) (Aug. 16, 2012), # 4 Exhibit 4 - Motorola's Objections and Responses to Apple's Third Set of Interrogatories (No. 17) (Aug. 16, 2012), # 5 Exhibit 5 - Motorola's First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Apple's Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 9, 12-16) (Aug. 17, 2012), # 6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts of deposition notices in Inv. No. 337-TA-745 (ITC) and Case No. 10-cv-662 (W.D. Wis.), # 7 Exhibit 7 - Expert Report of Dennis W. Carlton, Ph. D. (Mar. 6, 2012) - see 208 , # 8 Exhibit 8 - Expert Report of Dr. Gregory K. Leonard (Apr. 15, 2012) - see 209 , # 9 Exhibit 9 - Opinion and Order of June 22, 2012 in Case No. 11-cv-8540 (N.D. Ill.), # 10 Exhibit 10 - Document produced by Motorola, Bates Stamped as MOT_ITC2588020-53, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Document produced by Motorola, Bates Stamped as MOT_ITC2586191-208, # 12 Exhibit 12- Part 1 - ETSI GSM Draft Technical Specification 04.60 v2.0.0, Bates Stamped WI-178-011008-140, # 13 Exhibit 12- Part 2 - ETSI GSM Draft Technical Specification 04.60 v2.0.0, Bates Stamped WI-178-011008-140, # 14 Exhibit 12- Part 3 - ETSI GSM Draft Technical Specification 04.60 v2.0.0, Bates Stamped WI-178-011008-140, # 15 Exhibit 13- Part 1 - ETSI GSM Technical Specification 04.60 v6.0.0, Bates Stamped as WI-178-011141-273, # 16 Exhibit 13 -Part 2 - ETSI GSM Technical Specification 04.60 v6.0.0, Bates Stamped as WI-178-011141-273, # 17 Exhibit 13 - Part 3 - ETSI GSM Technical Specification 04.60 v6.0.0, Bates Stamped as WI-178-011141-273, # 18 Exhibit 14 - Document produced by Motorola, Bates Stamped as MOT_ITC1595918-23, # 19 Exhibit 15 - ETSI submission numbered Tdoc SMG 684/97, Bates Stamped as WI-178-011326-29, # 20 Exhibit 16 - U.S. Patent 6,359,898, # 21 Exhibit 17 - ETSI website "Contact Us" page, # 22 Exhibit 18 - IEEE website "Contact & Support" page, # 23 Exhibit 19 - e-mail from Nathan Shafroth (Aug. 15, 2012), # 24 Exhibit 20 - e-mail from Amanda Williamson (Aug. 17, 2012), # 25 Exhibit 21 - Motorola's Objections and Responses to Apple's Fourth Notice of Deposition (Aug. 15, 2012), # 26 Exhibit 22 - Apple's Second Notice of Deposition of Motorola (July 13, 2012), # 27 Exhibit 23 - Apple's Fourth Notice of Deposition of Motorola (July 24, 2012), # 28 Exhibit 24 - Letter Tony Lopez to Meghan Bordonaro (July 13, 2012), # 29 Exhibit 25 - e-mail from Tony Lopez (Aug. 16, 2012)) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 8/21/2012; requested attorney refile Expert Report, Exhibit #7, as a separate document. Exhibit #8 is opposing counsel report. (mmo).
August 20, 2012 206 Brief in Support of 205 Motion to Compel Rule 30(B)(6) Depositions by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
August 20, 2012 205 Motion to Compel Rule 30(B)(6) Depositions (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff Apple Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. Response due 8/27/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ernst, Samuel)
August 20, 2012 204 Deposition of Mark Cudak taken on September 13, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
August 20, 2012 203 Deposition of Tyler Brown, Ph.D. taken on February 27, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
August 20, 2012 202 Deposition of Howard Benn taken on May 2, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
August 20, 2012 201 Notice of Appearance of Paul T. Ehrlich for Plaintiff Apple Inc., Counter Defendant Apple Inc. (Powers, Matthew) Modified on 8/21/2012 (llj).
August 20, 2012 Set Deadlines as to 197 Motion for Protective Order. Response due 8/24/2012. Telephone Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2012 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer. Counsel for Defendant responsible for setting up the call to chambers at 608-261-5795. (llj)
August 17, 2012 200 Proposed Protective Order re: 101 Corrected Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report Relating to Deposition of Kenneth Stewart by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 8/20/2012; called attorney, no motion filed. (mmo). Modified on 8/20/2012. (llj) Modified docket relationship per attorney on 8/22/2012. (mmo)
August 16, 2012 199 Declaration of Amanda Williamson filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 197 Motion for Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Apple's First Notice of Deposition of Motorola, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Apple's Third Notice of Deposition of Motorola, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Individual Notices of Depositions, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Lopez Letter of August 13, 2012, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Bordonaro Letter of September 8,2011, # 6 Exhibit 6 - US International Trade Commission Hearing Transcript from December 8, 2011, Investigation No. 337-TA-745, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Apple's Second Notice of Deposition in Investigation 337-TA-745, Topics 15 and 16, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Apple's First Notice of Deposition, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Apple's Second Notice of Deposition Investigaiton 337-TA-745, Topics 1-7, 21, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Apple's Notice of Deposition to Motorola in 11-cv-8540, Topic 47) (Cannon, Brian) Modified on 8/20/2012; added exhibit numbers. (mmo). Modified on 8/20/2012 (llj).
August 16, 2012 198 Brief in Support of 197 Motion for Protective Order by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Cannon, Brian) Modified event on 8/20/2012 (mmo).
August 16, 2012 197 Motion for Protective Order precluding plaintiff from taking certain depositions by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Cannon, Brian) Modified on 8/20/2012. (llj)
August 15, 2012 196 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 195 Motion to Admit Peter John Chassman Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/15/12. (rep)
August 14, 2012 195 Motion to Admit Peter John Chassman Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-1030906.) by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (Chassman, Peter)
August 10, 2012 194 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 150 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc., granting 143 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/10/2012. (arw)
August 6, 2012 193 Notice of Appearance filed by Azra M. Hadzimehmedovic for Plaintiff Apple Inc., Counter Defendant Apple Inc. (Hadzimehmedovic, Azra)
August 3, 2012 192 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Samuel F. Ernst re: Plaintiff Apple Inc. as to Stephen W. Rodger (Ernst, Samuel)
August 1, 2012 191 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 186 , 187 , 188 , 189 and 190 , Motions to Admit Krzysztof Bebenek, Danielle Luce Goldstein, Richard Anthony Lopez, Charlin Lu and Nathan Evans Shafroth Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 8/1/2012. (arw)
July 31, 2012 190 Motion to Admit Nathan Evans Shafroth Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 34690014869.) by Plaintiff Apple Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (Shafroth, Nathan)
July 31, 2012 189 Motion to Admit Charlin Lu Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 34690014869.) by Plaintiff Apple Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (Lu, Charlin)
July 31, 2012 188 Motion to Admit Richard Anthony Lopez Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 34690014869.) by Plaintiff Apple Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (Lopez, Richard)
July 31, 2012 187 Motion to Admit Danielle Luce Goldstein Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 34690014869.) by Plaintiff Apple Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (Goldstein, Danielle)
July 31, 2012 186 Motion to Admit Krzysztof Bebenek Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 34690014869.) by Plaintiff Apple Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (Bebenek, Krzysztof)
July 31, 2012 185 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 184 Motion to Admit Thomas William Cushing Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 7/31/2012. (arw)
July 30, 2012 184 Motion to Admit Thomas William Cushing Pro Hac Vice. (Pro Hac Vice fee $50, receipt number 0758-1022735) by Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (Cushing, Thomas)
July 27, 2012 183 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 182 Motion to Admit Amanda Scott Williamson Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/27/12. (rep)
July 26, 2012 182 Motion to Admit Amanda Scott Williamson Pro Hac Vice. (Pro Hac Vice fee $50, receipt number 0758-1021999) by Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer. (Williamson, Amanda)
July 24, 2012 181 Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen Andrew Swedlow for Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
July 3, 2012 180 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re 143 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Judge Posner Opinion and Order dated June 22, 2012, # 2 Exhibit 2 - FTC Opinion dated June 6, 2012, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Judge Koh Order dated June 30, 2012) (Ernst, Samuel)
June 11, 2012 179 Declaration of Cortlin H. Lannin filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. in Support of Reply Brief in support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re: 143 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 - IEEE Amicus Brief, # 2 Ex. 2 - Motorola's Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss Anti-trust and Contract Claims) (Ernst, Samuel)
June 11, 2012 178 Reply in Support of Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 143 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Apple Inc.'s Reply to Motorola's Response to Apple's Proposed Findings of Fact and Response to Motorola's Additional Proposed Findings of Fact (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
June 11, 2012 177 Brief in Reply by Plaintiff Apple Inc. in Support of 143 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Ernst, Samuel)
June 11, 2012 176 Declaration of Meghan E. Bordonaro filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 150 Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Excerpt from The French Law of Contract (2d ed. 1992)) (Cannon, Brian)
June 11, 2012 175 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 150 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Cannon, Brian)
June 11, 2012 174 Reply in Support of Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 150 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Cannon, Brian)
June 11, 2012 173 Brief in Reply by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. in Support of 150 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Cannon, Brian)
May 31, 2012 172 Deposition of Richard Lutton taken on April 1, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
May 30, 2012 171 Declaration of Corlin H. Lannin filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 150 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 - Motorola's Response to Microsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment in Case No. 2:10-cv-01823-JLR, # 2 Ex. 2 - Motorola's Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss or Stay Apple's Antitrust and Contract Claims in Case No. 3:08-CV-0284-G (N.D. Tex.), # 3 Ex. 3 - Order Denying Rambus's Motion to Withdraw Jury Demand With Respect to Phase III of Trial, # 4 Ex. 4 - Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Responses to Respondent Apple Inc.'s Fourth Set of Interrogatories, # 5 Ex. 5 - Motorola's Response to Apple's Proposal Re: Case No. 3:11-cv-178, # 6 Ex. 6 - Apple's First Amended Complaint in Case No. 12-cv-355 (S.D. Cal.), # 7 Ex. 7 - Notice Regarding Initial Determination on Violation of Section 337, # 8 Ex. 8 - Motorola, Inc. and Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Answer and Counterclaims to Apple Inc.'s Amended Complaint in Case No. 10-cv-662 (W.D. Wis.), # 9 Ex. 9 - Order on Summary Judgment in Case No. 11-cv-8540 (N.D. Ill.), # 10 Ex. 10 - June 22, 2007 purchase order, # 11 Ex. 11 - September 26, 2006 agreement, # 12 Ex. 12 - October 27, 2003 excerpt from agreement) (Ernst, Samuel)
May 30, 2012 170 Declaration of Fabian Gonell filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 150 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 - January 11, 2011 Letter, # 2 Ex. 2 - April 25, 2001 Letter, # 3 Ex. 3 - July 14, 2011 Letter) (Ernst, Samuel)
May 30, 2012 169 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 150 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
May 30, 2012 168 Supplemental Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 150 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
May 30, 2012 167 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 150 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
May 30, 2012 166 Declaration of Meghan E. Bordonaro filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 143 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 35 U.S.C. 122, effective to November 28, 2000, # 2 Exhibit Excerpt of IEEE-SA Standards Board Operations Manual, # 3 Exhibit IPR Information and Declaration Statement dated October 6, 2000) (Cannon, Brian)
May 30, 2012 165 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 143 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Statement of Additional Proposed Findings of Fact (Sealed Document) (Cannon, Brian)
May 30, 2012 164 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 143 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Cannon, Brian)
May 30, 2012 163 Disregard - refiled as entry 172 ; Modified on 5/31/2012; requested attorney refile in compressed format. (mmo).
May 30, 2012 162 Deposition of Ray Warren taken on June 7, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Cannon, Brian)
May 30, 2012 161 Deposition of Latonia Gordon taken on July 13, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Cannon, Brian)
May 30, 2012 160 Deposition of Bruce Hilton Watrous, Jr. taken on May 10, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Cannon, Brian)
April 30, 2012 159 Expert Report of Professor Philippe Delebecque by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A - Delebeque CV, # 2 Exhibit B-ETSI Guide on IP Rights, Nov. 27, 2008, # 3 Exhibit C-ETSI Rules of Procedure, April 8, 2009, # 4 Exhibit D-ETSI Rules of Procedure, Nov. 18, 1997, # 5 Exhibit E-ETSI IPR Policy FAQs, # 6 Exhibit F-Declaration of Laurent Aynes, # 7 Exhibit G-Letter from Motorola to ETSI, April 8, 2003, # 8 Exhibit H-Droit De La Propriete Industrielle) (Ernst, Samuel)
April 30, 2012 158 Deposition of Neill Taylor taken on June 8, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Stathas, Lynn)
April 30, 2012 157 Deposition of David Singer taken on May 13, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Stathas, Lynn)
April 30, 2012 156 Deposition of Richard Joseph Lutton, Jr. taken on July 8, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Stathas, Lynn)
April 30, 2012 155 Deposition of Greg Joswiak taken on April 24, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Stathas, Lynn)
April 30, 2012 154 Deposition of David Andrus taken on May 6, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Stathas, Lynn)
April 30, 2012 Reset Briefing Deadlines re: 143 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Plaintiff Apple Inc., 150 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Opposition Briefs due 5/30/2012. Reply Briefs due 6/11/2012. (arw)
April 27, 2012 153 Declaration of Meghan E. Bordonaro filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 150 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Response to Apple's 1st Set of RFA's, # 2 Exhibit 2: fax to Karl Heinz Rosenbrock from Kirk W. Dailey, dated January 26, 1998,, # 3 Exhibit 3: Motorola's ETSI IPR Information Statement and Licensing Declaration with regards to GPRS, dated April 8, 2003, # 4 Exhibit 4: Motorola's letter to ETSI regarding ETSI Telecom Standards - UMTS 3GPP, dated December 20, 2002, # 5 Exhibit 5: Motorola's IEEE 802.11Intellectual Property Statement, dated March 1, 1994, # 6 Exhibit 6: excerpts from the deposition transcript of David C. Andrus, deposed in Inv. No. 337-TA-745 on May 6, 2011, # 7 Exhibit 7: excerpts from the deposition transcript of David Singer, deposed in Inv. No. 337-TA-745 on May 13, 2011, # 8 Exhibit 8: excerpts from the deposition transcript of Neill Taylor, deposed in Inv. No. 337-TA-745 on June 8, 2011, # 9 Exhibit 9: Motorola's Licensing Agreement History, # 10 Exhibit 10: Kirk W. Dailey Declaration in Support of Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed on 4/8/2011, # 11 Exhibit 11: licensing agreement between Motorola and Ericsson, # 12 Exhibit 12: licensing agreement between Motorola and Ericsson, # 13 Exhibit 13: licensing agreement between Motorola and Ericsson, # 14 Exhibit 14: licensing agreement between Motorola and Ericsson, # 15 Exhibit 15: licensing agreement between Motorola and Nokia, # 16 Exhibit 16: licensing agreement between Motorola and Nokia, # 17 Exhibit 17: licensing agreement between Motorola and Nokia, # 18 Exhibit 18: licensing agreement between Motorola and Samsung, # 19 Exhibit 19: licensing agreement between Motorola and Samsung, # 20 Exhibit 20: licensing agreement between Motorola and HTC, # 21 Exhibit 21: licensing agreement between Motorola and RIM, # 22 Exhibit 22: licensing agreement between Motorola and RIM, # 23 Exhibit 23: licensing agreement between Motorola and RIM, # 24 Exhibit 24: licensing agreement between Motorola and LG, # 25 Exhibit 25: licensing agreement between Motorola and LG, # 26 Exhibit 26: certified transcript of the hearing on Apple's Motion for Preliminary Injunction in this case, held before this Court on April 26, 2011, # 27 Exhibit 27: excerpts from the deposition transcript of Greg Joswiak, deposed in N.D. Ill. No. 11-cv-08540 on April 24, 2012, # 28 Exhibit 28: excerpts from the deposition transcript of Richard Joseph Lutton, Jr., deposed in Inv. No. 337-TA-745 and Inv. No. 337-TA-750 on July 8, 2011., # 29 Exhibit 29: PA Consulting Group report entitled Essential Intellectual Property in 3GPP-FDD, dated May, 2006, # 30 Exhibit 30: PA Consulting Group report entitled Essential Intellectual Property in GSM, dated June, 2006, # 31 Exhibit 31: excerpts from the deposition transcript of Kirk W. Dailey, deposed in Inv. No. 337-TA-745 on April 12, 2011, # 32 Exhibit 32: excerpts from the deposition transcript of Richard Lutton, deposed in W.D. Wis. No. 10-CV-662 on April 1, 2011, # 33 Exhibit 33: Expert Report of Jerry A. Hausman, dated May 6, 2011, # 34 Exhibit 34: excerpts of the Initial Determination on Violation of Section 337 and Recommended Determination on Remedy and Bond issued in ITC Inv. No. 337-TA-745 on April 24, 2012, # 35 Exhibit 35: letter from Mark G. Davis, counsel for Apple, to Alexander Rudis, dated July 20, 2011, # 36 Exhibit 36: Expert Report of Brian W. Napper, dated March 6, 2012, # 37 Exhibit 37: excerpts from the Expert Report of Dennis W. Carlton, Ph.D., dated March 6, 2012, # 38 Exhibit 38: Apple Inc.'s 2nd Supplemental Response to Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories and Objections and Responses to Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories filed April 23, 2012, # 39 Exhibit 39: contract between Apple and Qualcomm, # 40 Exhibit 40: contract between Apple and Qualcomm, # 41 Exhibit 41: contract between Apple and Qualcomm, # 42 Exhibit 42: letter sent by Charlotte B. Whitaker, to Donald J. Rosenberg, dated August 6, 2007) (Cannon, Brian) Modified exhibit descriptions on 5/1/2012. (arw) Modified on 5/1/2012; expert reports are opposing counsel. (mmo).
April 27, 2012 152 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 150 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Cannon, Brian)
April 27, 2012 151 Brief in Support of 150 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Cannon, Brian)
April 27, 2012 150 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Brief in Opposition due 5/18/2012. Brief in Reply due 5/29/2012. (Cannon, Brian)
April 27, 2012 149 Exhibit to 147 Declaration filed by Apple Inc. Exhibits 31-50 to the Declaration of Cortlin Lannin (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 31 - Declaration of John Phillips (and exhibits thereto), submitted by Plaintiff Apple Inc. in Case No. 10-cv-662, # 2 Ex. 32 - '898 patent, bearing production nos. MOTO-APPLE-0002885884-89, # 3 Ex. 33 - a proposal entitled "Countdown Value definition" dated November 10-14, 1997 and bearing production nos. WI-Apple0129750-53, # 4 Ex. 34 - U.S. Provisional Application No. 60/057,327 and bearing production nos. WI-Apple0129856-75, # 5 Ex. 35, part 1 - ETSI TS 144 060 technical specification, dated April 2001 and bearing production nos. WI-Apple1684534-860, # 6 Ex. 35, part 2 - ETSI TS 144 060 technical specification, dated April 2001 and bearing production nos. WI-Apple1684534-860, # 7 Ex. 35, part 3 - ETSI TS 144 060 technical specification, dated April 2001 and bearing production nos. WI-Apple1684534-860, # 8 Ex. 35, part 4 - ETSI TS 144 060 technical specification, dated April 2001 and bearing production nos. WI-Apple1684534-860, # 9 Ex. 35, part 5 - ETSI TS 144 060 technical specification, dated April 2001 and bearing production nos. WI-Apple1684534-860, # 10 Ex. 35, part 6 - ETSI TS 144 060 technical specification, dated April 2001 and bearing production nos. WI-Apple1684534-860, # 11 Ex. 35, part 7 - ETSI TS 144 060 technical specification, dated April 2001 and bearing production nos. WI-Apple1684534-860, # 12 Ex. 36 - document entitled "Proposal for RACH Preambles" dated July 13-16, 1999 and bearing production nos. 745-Apple7255199-224, # 13 Ex. 37, part 1 - '559 patent file history and patent, # 14 Ex. 37, part 2 - '559 patent file history and patent, # 15 Ex. 38 - the TS 25.213 V3.2.0 technical specification, dated March 2000 and bearing production nos. 745-Apple-7255594-619, # 16 Ex. 39 - letter dated September 20, 2002 and bearing production nos. MOTO-APPLE-0004802613, # 17 Ex. 40 - '697 patent, bearing production nos. MOTO-APPLE-0001613466-73, # 18 Ex. 41 - a proposal dated January 26, 1998 and bearing production nos. MOTO-APPLE-0004111028-033, # 19 Ex. 42 - a proposal dated March 4-6, 1998 and bearing production nos. MOTO-APPLE-0004110874-879, # 20 Ex. 43 - an article bearing production nos. MOTO-APPLE-0004111178-182, # 21 Ex. 44 - TS 25.213 V3.1.1 technical specification, dated December 1999 and bearing production nos. 745-Apple7255696-721, # 22 Ex. 45 - letter dated January 26, 1998, bearing production nos. MOTO-APPLE-0006037953_91891, # 23 Ex. 46 - the ETSI Guide on IPRs, dated January 25, 2007 and bearing production nos. WI-Apple1604135-57, # 24 Ex. 47 - ETSI Guide on IPRs, dated November 27, 2008 and bearing production nos. MOTO-APPLE-0007191997-2014, # 25 Ex. 48 - Motorola's Responses to Apple Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admission in this litigation, dated August 18, 2011, # 26 Ex. 49 - International Application Published Under the Patent Cooperation Treaty, International Publication No. WO 99/038337, # 27 Ex. 50 - European Patent Specification No. EP 1053613) (Ernst, Samuel)
April 27, 2012 148 Exhibit to 147 Declaration filed by Apple Inc. Exhibits 1-30 to the Declaration of Cortlin Lannin (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 - Exhibit 2 to Motorola's Expert Report of Tim Williams, served on April 15, 2012, # 2 Ex. 2 - Exhibit C to Motorola's Infringement contentions in Case No. 11-cv-08540 (N.D. Ill), # 3 Ex. 3 - letter dated April 8, 2003, MOTO-APPLE-0004802652-MOTO-APPLE-0004802657, # 4 Ex. 4 - Exhibit B to Motorola's Infringement contentions in Case No. 11-cv-08540 (N.D. Ill), # 5 Ex. 5 - Exhibit 2 to Motorola's Expert Report of J. Stevenson Kenney ('559), # 6 Ex. 6 - letter dated December 20, 2002, bearing production nos. MOTO-APPLE-006037953_91873, # 7 Ex. 7 - Motorola's Expert Report of J. Stevenson Kenney ('697), # 8 Ex. 8 - Exhibit 2 to Motorola's Expert Report of Kevin Almeroth ('516), # 9 Ex. 9 - Exhibit D to Motorola's Infringement contentions in Case No. 11-cv-08540 (N.D. Ill), # 10 Ex. 10 - Exhibit F to Motorola's Infringement contentions in Case No. 11-cv-08540 (N.D. Ill), # 11 Ex. 11 - Motorola's Expert Report of Kevin Almeroth ('223), # 12 Ex. 12 - Motorola's Responses to Apple's First Set of Requests for Admission, served in In the Matter of Certain Wireless Communication Devices, Portable Music and Data Processing Devices, Computers and Components Thereof, ITC Inv. No. 337-TA-745 (U.S.I.T.C.), # 13 Ex. 13 - Exhibit E to Motorola's Infringement contentions in Case No. 11-cv-08540 (N.D. Ill), # 14 Ex. 14 - ETSI Rules of Procedure dated November 18, 1997, bearing production nos. WI-Apple1711250-54, # 15 Ex. 15 - ETSI Rules of Procedure dated November 2, 2000, bearing production nos. WI-Apple1711350-55, # 16 Ex. 16 - ETSI Rules of Procedure dated November 21, 2001, bearing production nos. WI-Apple1711404-09, # 17 Ex. 17 - ETSI Rules of Procedure dated November 30, 2004, bearing production nos. WI-Apple1711599-1604, # 18 Ex. 18 - ETSI Rules of Procedure dated November 23, 2005, bearing production nos. WI-Apple1604129-34, # 19 Ex. 19 - ETSI Rules of Procedure dated November 22, 2006, bearing production nos. WI-Apple1711659-64, # 20 Ex. 20 - ETSI Rules of Procedure dated March 29, 2007, bearing production nos. WI-Apple1711690-95, # 21 Ex. 21 - ETSI Rules of Procedure dated November 26, 2008, bearing production nos. WI-Apple1711791-1801, # 22 Ex. 22 - ETSI Rules of Procedure dated April 8, 2009, bearing production nos. WI-Apple0034369-79, # 23 Ex. 23 - IEEE Standards Board Bylaws dated December 1993 and December 1994, bearing production nos. IEEE-APP-ITC-000190-222, # 24 Ex. 24 - IEEE Standards Board Bylaws dated December 1995, December 1996, and December 2000, bearing production nos. IEEE-APP-ITC-000223-000272, # 25 Ex. 25 - IEEE Standards Board Bylaws dated January 1998 and January 1999, bearing production nos. IEEE-APP-ITC-000334-000365, # 26 Ex. 26 - IEEE Standards Board Bylaws dated January 2005, bearing production nos. IEEE-APP-ITC-000374-000396, # 27 Ex. 27 - IEEE Standards Board Bylaws dated October 1999, bearing production nos. IEEE-APP-ITC-000433-000449, # 28 Ex. 28 - Letter dated March 1, 1994, bearing production nos. MOTO-APPLE-0006200362_00028848, # 29 Ex. 29 - Motorola, Inc.'s First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Wi-LAN, Inc.'s Third Amended Complaint, Wi-LAN, Inc. v. Research in Motion Corp., et al., Case No. 08-cv-247 (E.D. Tex.), dated April 16, 2010, # 30 Ex. 30 - Order in Microsoft Corp. v. Motorola, Inc., --- F. Supp. 2d ---, 2012 WL 627989 (W.D. Wash.) (Ernst, Samuel)
April 27, 2012 147 Declaration of Cortlin H. Lannin filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 143 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
April 27, 2012 146 Declaration of Professor Philippe Delebecque filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 143 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, Part 1 - Expert Report of Professor Philippe Delebecque and Exhibits - refiled as 159 , # 2 Ex. A, Part 2 - Expert Report of Professor Philippe Delebecque and Exhibits) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified on 4/30/2012; requested attorney refile Expert Report as separate document with exhibits attached separately and described. (mmo)
April 27, 2012 145 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 143 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
April 27, 2012 144 Brief in Support of 143 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
April 27, 2012 143 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Brief in Opposition due 5/18/2012. Brief in Reply due 5/29/2012. (Ernst, Samuel)
April 27, 2012 142 Deposition of Nicholas Whinnett taken on June 7, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
April 27, 2012 141 Deposition of Dominic Tolli taken on August 9, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
April 27, 2012 140 Deposition of Jeffrey Smolinske taken on August 19, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
April 27, 2012 139 Deposition of John Phillips taken on November 4, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
April 27, 2012 138 Deposition of Richard Holleman taken on June 7, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
April 27, 2012 137 Deposition of Richard Holleman taken on April 20, 2012 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
April 27, 2012 136 Deposition of Tyler Brown taken on June 28, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Ernst, Samuel)
April 19, 2012 135 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 134 Motion to Admit Jason Raofield Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 4/19/2012. (arw)
April 17, 2012 134 Motion to Admit Jason Raofield Pro Hac Vice. (Pro Hac Vice Fee $50, receipt number 0758-967968) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (Raofield, Jason)
April 2, 2012 133 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 131 Motion to Admit Shawna Marie Reeder Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 4/2/2012. (arw)
April 2, 2012 132 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 125 Joint Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Apple Inc., Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 3/30/2012. (arw)
March 28, 2012 131 Motion to Admit Shawna Marie Reeder Pro Hac Vice. (Pro Hac Vice Fee $50, receipt number 0758-957487) by Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (Reeder, Shawna)
March 28, 2012 130 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 129 Motion to Admit Deborah Ann Garza Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 3/28/2012. (arw)
March 28, 2012 129 Motion to Admit Deborah Ann Garza Pro Hac Vice. (Pro Hac Vice Fee $50, receipt number 0758-956861) by Plaintiff Apple Inc., Counter Defendant Apple Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (Garza, Deborah)
March 27, 2012 128 Notice by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Notice of Attorney Name Change. (Schmidt, Jill)
March 27, 2012 127 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 126 Motion to Admit Stephen William Rodger Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 3/27/2012. (arw)
March 27, 2012 126 Motion to Admit Stephen William Rodger Pro Hac Vice. (Pro Hac Vice Fee $50, receipt number 0758-955987) by Plaintiff Apple Inc., Counter Defendant Apple Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (Rodger, Stephen)
March 26, 2012 125 Joint Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Apple Inc., Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Order of March 14, 2012 (Northern District of Illinois Case No 11-cv-8540) (Stathas, Lynn)
March 26, 2012 124 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 123 Motion to Admit Cortlin Hall Lannin Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 3/26/2012. (arw)
March 23, 2012 123 Motion to Admit Cortlin Hall Lannin Pro Hac Vice. (Pro Hac Vice Fee $50, receipt number 0758-954907) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (Lannin, Cortlin)
February 23, 2012 122 Featured Case ORDER of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker recused, case reassigned for referral purposes to Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/23/2012. (arw)
December 1, 2011 121 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting and entering 120 Joint Stipulation for Documentary Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/1/2011. (arw)
November 30, 2011 120 Joint Stipulation for Documentary Evidence by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Haskett, Christine)
November 17, 2011 119 Reply to Counterclaim by Plaintiff Apple Inc., Counter Defendant Apple Inc. (Haslam, Robert)
November 10, 2011 118 Featured Case ORDER granting 113 Motion for Issuance of Letters of Request by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/9/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Request for International Judicial Assistance) (arw)
November 2, 2011 117 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The parties' joint motion to modify the case schedule 112 is accepted and entered with one change: the deadline for filing summary judgment motions shall be extended only to April 27, 2012. Any additional extension of this deadline would jeopardize the court's ability to provide a timely ruling before trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/2/2011. (arw)
October 27, 2011 116 Notice by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re 113 Motion for Issuance of Letters of Request Proposed Order Issuing Letter of Request. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A - Request for International Judicial Assistance, # 2 Ex. B - Instructions, # 3 Ex. C - Table: BEG Production Number, End Production Number) (Ernst, Samuel) Modified exhibit descriptions on 10/31/2011. (mmo)
October 27, 2011 115 Declaration of Samuel F. Ernst filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 113 Motion for Issuance of Letters of Request (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 - July 25, 2011 Letter to ETSI, # 2 Ex. 2 - August 1, 2011 Letter to ETSI, # 3 Ex. 3 - 18 U.S.C.A. § 1781) (Ernst, Samuel)
October 27, 2011 114 Brief in Support of 113 Motion for Issuance of Letters of Request by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Ernst, Samuel)
October 27, 2011 113 Motion for Issuance of Letters of Request by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 11/3/2011. (Ernst, Samuel)
October 25, 2011 112 Joint Motion to Modify the Case Schedule by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Response due 11/1/2011. (Ernst, Samuel)
October 24, 2011 111 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Cannon, Brian) Modified on 10/25/2011 (mmo).
October 6, 2011 110 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document), filed by Apple Inc.. (Ernst, Samuel)
October 5, 2011 109 Notice of Appearance filed by Catherine Cetrangolo for Plaintiff Apple Inc., Counter Defendant Apple Inc. (Cetrangolo, Catherine)
September 27, 2011 108 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 107 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel by Godfrey & Kahn, S.C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/27/2011. (arw)
September 26, 2011 107 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel by Godfrey & Kahn, S.C. by Plaintiff Apple Inc., Counter Defendant Apple Inc. Response due 10/3/2011. (Peterson, James)
September 12, 2011 106 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 104 Motion to Admit David Elihu Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/12/2011. (arw)
September 1, 2011 105 Declaration of David Elihu filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 104 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECF Registration Form) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
September 1, 2011 104 Motion to Admit David Elihu Pro Hac Vice by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
July 25, 2011 103 Answer to Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Counterclaims by Plaintiff Apple Inc., Counter Defendant Apple Inc. (Peterson, James) Modified event wording on 7/26/2011. (mmo)
July 22, 2011 102 Pretrial Conference Order: Amendments to the Pleadings due 10/6/2011. Dispositive Motions due 2/21/2012. Settlement Letters due 9/28/2012. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and Motions in Limine due 9/28/2012. Responses to Motions due 10/12/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2012 at 4:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 11/5/2012 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/22/2011. (arw)
July 21, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 7/21/2011 [:07] (cak)
July 20, 2011 101 Corrected Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff Apple Inc., Counter Defendant Apple Inc., Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cross Use Agreement 745) (Peterson, James)
July 18, 2011 100 Disregard; refiled as entry 101 with exhibit attached. Modified on 7/21/2011. (mmo)
July 8, 2011 99 Notice by Plaintiff Apple Inc. of Change of Address as to Attorneys Matthew D. Powers and Steven S. Cherensky. (Peterson, James)
July 1, 2011 98 ANSWER with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Apple Inc. by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Cannon, Brian) Modified on 7/5/2011 (mmo).
June 24, 2011 97 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Plaintiff Apple Inc. as to Penny P. Reid. (Peterson, James)
June 24, 2011 96 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 95 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/24/2011. (arw)
June 23, 2011 95 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Notice of Removal, Counterclaims by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 6/30/2011. (Stathas, Lynn)
June 22, 2011 Reset Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference reset for 7/21/2011 at 1:30 PM to accommodate the court's calendar. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
June 9, 2011 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 7/14/2011 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
June 7, 2011 94 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 37 Motion to Strike 5 Affidavit of Richard Lutton. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/7/2011. (arw)
June 7, 2011 93 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss, denying 39 Motion to Sever and Consolidate. Plaintiff's claim of waiver is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/7/2011. (arw)
June 2, 2011 92 Notice by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 33 MOTION TO DISMISS - Notice of Decision in Related Case. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order on Motions to Dismiss) (Peterson, James)
June 1, 2011 Notice to Counsel: Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2011 is canceled. (arw)
May 19, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Barbara B. Crabb: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/19/2011 [:20] (Court Reporter ls.) (skv)
May 16, 2011 91 Transcript of Motion Hearing (Sealed Excerpts) held on 4/26/2011 before Judge Barbara B. Crabb. Court Reporter: CS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see Electronic Transcript Instructions and Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Excerpt - Page 12, # 2 Sealed Excerpt - Page 20, # 3 Sealed Excerpt - Page 21, # 4 Sealed Excerpt - Pages 41-55, # 5 Sealed Excerpt - Page 75, # 6 Sealed Excerpt - Page 76, # 7 Sealed Excerpt - Page 81, # 8 Sealed Excerpt - Page 100, # 9 Sealed Excerpt - Page 104) (Sealed Document) (arw)
May 16, 2011 90 Transcript of Motion Hearing, held 4/26/2011 before Judge Barbara B. Crabb. Court Reporter: CS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see Electronic Transcript Instructions and Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (arw)
May 10, 2011 Set Status and Scheduling Conference: Telephone Status Conference set for 5/19/2011 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Barbara B. Crabb. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5447. (arw/skv)
May 9, 2011 89 Certificate of Service by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Nelson, David)
May 9, 2011 88 Brief in Reply by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. in Support of 33 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Appendix A - Excerpt from 4-26-11 Hearing Tr.) (Nelson, David)
May 9, 2011 Reorganization of case 10-cv-662-bbc and other scheduling matters; briefing completed. (arw)
May 6, 2011 87 Response re: 85 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Nelson, David)
May 6, 2011 86 Response re: 85 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Peterson, James)
May 2, 2011 85 Featured Case ORDER denying 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Counsel are to advise the court by 5/6/2011 whether they want a scheduling conference to discuss the reorganization of case 10-cv-662-bbc and other scheduling matters. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/29/2011. (arw)
May 2, 2011 84 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 83 Motion to Seal by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/2/2011. (arw)
April 29, 2011 83 Motion to Seal 81 Apple's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and 82 Declaration by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Peterson, James) Modified docket relationship on 5/2/2011. (mmo)
April 29, 2011 82 Declaration of Penny Reid filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 33 MOTION TO DISMISS (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Motorola, Inc.'s Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss or Stay Plaintiff's Antitrust And Contract Claims, filed Apr. 10, 2008, in Research in Motion Ltd. (RIM) v. Motorola, Inc., No. 3:08-CV-0284 (N.D. Tex.), ECF No. 33, # 2 Exhibit 2, Wi-LAN, Inc.'s Complaint, filed June 19, 2008, in Wi-LAN, Inc. v. Research in Motion Corp., No. 2:08-CV-247-TJW (E.D. Tex.) (the Wi-LAN action), # 3 Exhibit 3, Motorola, Inc.'s Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Wi-LAN, Inc.'s Third Amended Complaint, filed Sept. 18, 2009, in the Wi-LAN action, ECF No. 63, # 4 Exhibit 4, RIM's Complaint, filed February 16, 2008, in RIM v. Motorola, Inc., No. 3:08-cv-0284 (N.D. Tex.), ECF No. 1, # 5 Exhibit 5, Court's Order Denying Nokia's Motion to Dismiss, Nokia Corp. v. Apple Inc., No. 1:09-cv-00791-GMS (D. Del. June 7, 2010), ECF No. 55, # 6 Exhibit 6, Apple Inc.'s First Amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims, filed February 19, 2010, in Nokia Corp. v. Apple Inc., No. 1:09-cv-00791-GMS (D. Del.), ECF No. 21) (Peterson, James)
April 29, 2011 81 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 33 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Peterson, James)
April 26, 2011 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Barbara B. Crabb: Motion Hearing held on 4/26/2011. [2:35] (Court Reporter CS.) (voc)
April 25, 2011 79 Motion to Clear Courtroom Should HIghly Confidential Information Be Published at Hearing by Plaintiff Apple Inc., Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Response due 5/2/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service to Joint Motion) (Stathas, Lynn)
April 25, 2011 78 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 74 Motion to Seal Reply in Support of Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/25/2011. (arw)
April 25, 2011 77 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 72 Motion to Admit Robert W. Stone Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/25/2011. (arw)
April 22, 2011 76 Certificate of Service by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Nelson, David)
April 22, 2011 75 Brief in Reply by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. in Support of 37 Motion to Strike, Certain Paragraphs of the Affidavit of Richard Lutton (Sealed Document) (Nelson, David)
April 22, 2011 74 Motion to Seal 75 Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Certain Paragraphs of Lutton Affidavit by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Nelson, David) Modified docket relationship on 4/25/2011. (mmo)
April 22, 2011 73 Declaration of Robert W. Stone filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 72 Motion to Admit Robert W. Stone Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
April 22, 2011 72 Motion to Admit Robert W. Stone Pro Hac Vice by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 CM/ECF Registration Form, # 2 Certificate of Service) (Kass, Lisa)
April 22, 2011 71 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 70 Joint Motion for Approval of Additional Presentation Equipment During Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/22/2011. (arw)
April 22, 2011 70 Joint Motion for Approval of Additional Presentation Equipment During Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Plaintiff Apple Inc., Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Response due 4/29/2011. (Peterson, James)
April 20, 2011 69 Notice by Plaintiff Apple Inc., Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Sealed Document) Regarding Preliminary Injunction Hearing. (Peterson, James)
April 20, 2011 68 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 19 Motion to Admit Melissa N. Chan Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/20/2011. (arw)
April 20, 2011 67 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 19 Motion to Admit Linda J. Brewer and Kathleen M. Sullivan Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/20/2011. (arw)
April 19, 2011 NOTE TO COUNSEL: Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2011 at 9:00 AM re: 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Apple Inc. will take place as scheduled before District Judge Barbara B. Crabb. (arw)
April 18, 2011 66 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 60 Motion to Seal by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/18/2011. (arw)
April 15, 2011 65 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Peterson, James)
April 15, 2011 64 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 39 Motion to Sever and Consolidate filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. Apple's Opposition to Motorola Mobility's Motion to Sever and Consolidate. (Sealed Document) (Peterson, James) Modified docket text on 4/19/2011. (arw)
April 15, 2011 63 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 37 Motion to Strike 5 Affidavit of Richard Lutton (Sealed Document) filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Motorola Mobility's Motion to Strike Paragraphs of the Affidavit of Richard Lutton Submitted in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Sealed Document) (Peterson, James) Modified docket text on 4/19/2011. (arw)
April 15, 2011 62 Declaration of Penny Reid in Support of Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum re: 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - RIM Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2 - RIM 3rd Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Moto Answer to 3rd Am. Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 4 - ETSI Website - About ETSI, # 5 Exhibit 5 - ETSI Directive, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Moto Notice of Deposition, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Samsung Agreement, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Ericsson Agmt, # 9 Exhibit 9 - LG Agreement) (Peterson, James) Modified docket text on 4/19/2011. (arw)
April 15, 2011 61 Brief in Reply by Plaintiff Apple Inc. in Support of 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Further Support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Sealed Document) (Peterson, James)
April 15, 2011 60 Motion to Seal 61 Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Preliminary Injunction; 62 Declaration of Penny Reid; 64 Opposition to Motorola Mobility's Motion to Sever and Consolidate; 63 Opposition to Motorola Mobility's Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Peterson, James) Modified docket text on 4/18/2011. (arw) Modified docket relationship on 4/18/2011. (mmo)
April 15, 2011 59 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 19 Motion to Admit David L. Shaul, Carlos A. Rodriguez and Thomas R. Watson Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/15/2011. (arw)
April 15, 2011 58 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 54 Motion to Seal by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/15/2011. (arw)
April 15, 2011 57 Deposition of Richard Lutton taken on April 1, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Peterson, James)
April 15, 2011 56 Deposition of Richard J. Holleman taken on April 11, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Peterson, James)
April 15, 2011 55 Deposition of Kirk W. Dailey taken on April 12, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Peterson, James)
April 15, 2011 54 Motion to Seal Deposition Transcripts of Kirk Dailey, Richard Holleman and Richard Lutton by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Peterson, James) Modified docket text on 4/15/2011. (arw)
April 15, 2011 53 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 19 Motion to Admit Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine and Meghan E. Bordonaro Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/14/2011. (arw)
April 14, 2011 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
April 13, 2011 52 Notice of Appearance of Covington & Burling LLP Attorneys filed by Robert T. Haslam for Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Haslam, Robert)
April 12, 2011 Set Deadlines and Hearings re: 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Apple Inc. If necessary, a hearing on the motion will be held on 4/26/2011 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Barbara B. Crabb. (arw/sp)
April 11, 2011 51 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 44 Motion to Admit Penny Reid Pro Hac Vice, granting 47 Motion to Admit Carrie M. Anderson Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/11/2011. (arw)
April 11, 2011 50 Declaration of Kirk W. Dailey filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Sealed Document). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - License Agreement dated 07/01/2007, # 2 Exhibit 2 - License Agreement dated 07/30/2004, # 3 Exhibit 3 - License Agreement dated 04/06/2004, # 4 Exhibit 4.1 - License Agreement dated 06/10/2010 (part 1 of 2), # 5 Exhibit 4.2 - License Agreement dated 06/10/2010 (part 2 of 2), # 6 Exhibit 5 - Licensing Executives Society Article, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Letter dated 08/06/2007, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Non-Disclosure Agreement dated 08/06/2007, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Letter dated 09/11/2007, # 10 Exhibit 9 - 09/27/2007 Presentation, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Letter dated 03/05/2008, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Non-Disclosure Agreement dated 01/04/2011) (Bauer, Jennifer)
April 11, 2011 49 Declaration of Brian C. Cannon filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 37 Motion to Strike 5 Affidavit of Richard Lutton (Sealed Document), 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Sealed Document). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Motorola Corporate History, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Motorola Corporate History, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Letter of Assurance to IEEE, # 4 Exhibit 4 - IPR Information Statement and Licensing Declaration to ETSI, # 5 Exhibit 5 - IPR Information Statement and Licensing Declaration to ETSI, # 6 Exhibit 6 - IPR Information Statement and Licensing Declaration to ETSI, # 7 Exhibit 7 - IPR Information Statement and Licensing Declaratoin to ETSI, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Intellectual Property Statement to IEEE, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Letter of Assurance to IEEE, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Letter of Assurance to IEEE, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Letter of Assurance to IEEE, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Letter of Assurance to IEEE, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Letter of Assurance to IEEE, # 14 Exhibit 14 - 06/28/2007 Apple Press Release, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Excerpts from Deposition of R. Lutton, # 16 Exhibit 16 - Joint Report Concerning First Mandatory Settlement Conference submitted in ITC investigation No. 337-TA-745, # 17 Exhibit 17 - Joint Motion for Extension of Deadline to Select a Mediatory submitted in ITC investigation No. 337-TA-745, # 18 Exhibit 18 - 10/28/2009 Motorola Press Release, # 19 Exhibit 19 - 03/02/2010 Apple Press Release, # 20 Exhibit 20 - Order No. 5 in ITC investigation No. 337-TA-745, # 21 Exhibit 21 - Joint Motion to Stay Claims and Counterclaims filed in Case No. 3:10-CV-00661-BBC (D.I. 12), # 22 Exhibit 22 - civil docket for Case No. 3:10-cv-00661-BBC, # 23 Exhibit 23 - Apple's Response in ITC investigation No. 377-TA-745, # 24 Exhibit 24 - Notice of Deposition to Motorola in ITC investigation No. 377-TA-745, # 25 Exhibit 25 - letter dated 04/07/2011, # 26 Exhibit 26 - ETSI Intellectual Property Rights Policy, # 27 Exhibit 27 - IEEE Certificate of Incorporation, # 28 Exhibit 28 - TIA Contact Information, # 29 Exhibit 29 - Deposition of R. Lutton Exhibit 11, # 30 Exhibit 30 - Apple Store Listing for iPod touch, # 31 Exhibit 31 - Best Buy online listing for iPhone 4) (Bauer, Jennifer) Modified on 4/11/2011; added exhibit numbers 10-12. (mmo)
April 11, 2011 48 Declaration of Carrie Anderson filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 47 Motion to Admit Carrie M. Anderson Pro Hac Vice (Cahill, Bryan)
April 11, 2011 47 Motion to Admit Carrie M. Anderson Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 CM/ECF Registration) (Cahill, Bryan)
April 11, 2011 46 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 32 Motion to Seal by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/11/2011. (arw)
April 11, 2011 45 Declaration of Penny Reid filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 44 Motion to Admit Penny Reid Pro Hac Vice (Cahill, Bryan)
April 11, 2011 44 Motion to Admit Penny Reid Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 CM/ECF Registration) (Cahill, Bryan)
April 8, 2011 43 Certificate of Service by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Bauer, Jennifer)
April 8, 2011 42 Disregard-Refiled as entry 50 ; Modified on 4/11/2011; asked to refile with exhibit descriptions. (mmo)
April 8, 2011 41 Disregard-Refiled as entry 49 ; Modified on 4/11/2011; asked to refile with exhibit descriptions. (mmo)
April 8, 2011 40 Declaration of Richard J. Holleman filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. in support of Motorola's Opposition to Apple's re: 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Sealed Document) (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Holleman Curriculum Vitae) (Nelson, David) Modified exhibit descripiton on 4/11/2011 (mmo).
April 8, 2011 39 Motion to Sever and Consolidate by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Response due 4/15/2011. (Nelson, David)
April 8, 2011 38 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Sealed Document) (Sealed Document) (Bauer, Jennifer)
April 8, 2011 37 Motion to Strike and Memorandum in Support re 5 Affidavit of Richard Lutton (Sealed Document) by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Response due 4/15/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Nelson, David) Modified docket text on 4/11/2011. (mmo)
April 8, 2011 36 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Sealed Document) filed by Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bauer, Jennifer)
April 8, 2011 35 Brief in Support of 33 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Appendix A, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Nelson, David)
April 8, 2011 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Bauer, Jennifer)
April 8, 2011 33 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Brief in Opposition due 4/29/2011. Brief in Reply due 5/9/2011. (Nelson, David)
April 8, 2011 32 Motion to Seal 35 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss; 37 Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike; 36 Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction; 38 Response to Apple Inc.'s Statement of Proposed Facts; Declarations of 50 Dailey, 40 Holleman and 49 Cannon, filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Bauer, Jennifer) Modified docket relationships on 4/11/2011. (mmo)
April 8, 2011 31 Notice by Plaintiff Apple Inc. of Agreement Regarding Email Discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreement Regarding Email Discovery) (Peterson, James)
April 8, 2011 30 Notice by Plaintiff Apple Inc. of Cross-Use Agreement for Discovery Materials. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Cross-Use Agreement) (Peterson, James)
April 8, 2011 29 Certificate of Service by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Kass, Lisa)
April 8, 2011 28 Declaration of Thomas R. Watson filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 19 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, Melissa N. Chan, and Kathleen M. Sullivan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
April 8, 2011 27 Declaration of Kathleen M. Sullivan filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 19 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, Melissa N. Chan, and Kathleen M. Sullivan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
April 8, 2011 26 Declaration of David L. Shaul filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 19 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, Melissa N. Chan, and Kathleen M. Sullivan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
April 8, 2011 25 Declaration of Carlos A. Rodriguez filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 19 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, Melissa N. Chan, and Kathleen M. Sullivan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
April 8, 2011 24 Declaration of Richard W. Erwine filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 19 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, Melissa N. Chan, and Kathleen M. Sullivan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
April 8, 2011 23 Declaration of Melissa N. Chan filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 19 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, Melissa N. Chan, and Kathleen M. Sullivan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
April 8, 2011 22 Declaration of Brian C. Cannon filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 19 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, Melissa N. Chan, and Kathleen M. Sullivan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
April 8, 2011 21 Declaration of Linda J. Brewer filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 19 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, Melissa N. Chan, and Kathleen M. Sullivan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
April 8, 2011 20 Declaration of Meghan E. Bordonaro filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 19 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, Melissa N. Chan, and Kathleen M. Sullivan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
April 8, 2011 19 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, Melissa N. Chan, and Kathleen M. Sullivan Pro Hac Vice by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Kass, Lisa)
March 25, 2011 Reset Answer Deadline: Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. answer due 4/8/2011. (arw)
March 25, 2011 Reset Briefing Deadlines re: 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Brief in Opposition due 4/8/2011. Brief in Reply due 4/15/2011. (arw)
March 25, 2011 18 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 16 Motion to Seal by Plaintiff Apple Inc., granting 14 Joint Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order. Brief in Opposition re: 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction due 4/8/2011. Brief in Reply due 4/15/2011. Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. answer due 4/8/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 3/25/2011. (arw)
March 24, 2011 17 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Peterson, James)
March 24, 2011 16 Motion to Seal 15 Notice: Update Regarding Apples Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Apple Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Peterson, James) Modified docket relationship on 3/25/2011 (mmo).
March 24, 2011 15 Notice by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Sealed Document) Update Regarding Apples Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Sealed Document) (Peterson, James)
March 23, 2011 14 Joint Motion for Modification of the Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Apple Inc., Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Response due 3/30/2011. (Peterson, James)
March 18, 2011 13 Summons Returned Executed. Motorola Mobility, Inc. served on 3/15/2011, answer due 4/5/2011. (Peterson, James)
March 16, 2011 12 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 2 Motion to Seal Documents by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/16/2011. (arw)
March 16, 2011 Set Briefing Deadlines re: 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Plaintiff Apple Inc. Brief in Opposition due 3/30/2011. Brief in Reply due 4/6/2011. (arw/skv)
March 14, 2011 11 Summons Issued as to Motorola Mobility, Inc. (arw)
March 14, 2011 Standard attachments for Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: NORTC, Briefing Guidelines, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Order on Dispositive Motions, Preliminary Injunction Procedure. (arw)
March 14, 2011 Case assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
March 12, 2011 10 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Peterson, James)
March 11, 2011 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Peterson, James)
March 11, 2011 8 EXIBITS to 7 Declaration of Cherensky filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. - Exhibits 26 through 40 to the Declaration of Steven Cherensky 7 re: 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 26 697 File History, # 2 Exhibit 27 3GPP 25 213 version 3 1 1, # 3 Exhibit 28 559 Patent, # 4 Exhibit 29 Motorola Mobility's Asserted Claims and Accused Products, # 5 Exhibit 30 559 File History, # 6 Exhibit 31 898 Patent, # 7 Exhibit 32 898 File History, # 8 Exhibit 33 898 Provisional Application, # 9 Exhibit 34-part 1 GSM 4 60 v 6 3 1 Release 1997), # 10 Exhibit 34-part 2 GSM 4 60 v 6 3 1 Release 1997), # 11 Exhibit 34-part 3 GSM 4 60 v 6 3 1 Release 1997), # 12 Exhibit 34-part 4 GSM 4 60 v 6 3 1 Release 1997), # 13 Exhibit 35 230 Patent, # 14 Exhibit 36 3GPP 26 090 version 3 1 0 Release 1999, # 15 Exhibit 37 Notice of Removal, # 16 Exhibit 38 Countdown Value Definition 898 Moto Nov 97 submission, # 17 Exhibit 39 Evaluation of Proposed RACH Signatures, # 18 Exhibit Exh 40 Proposal of RACH Preambles) (Peterson, James)
March 11, 2011 7 Declaration of Steven Cherensky filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 337-745, Corrected Public Verified Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2 ND. ILL. Complaint- 10-cv-6381, # 3 Exhibit 3 S.D. Fla. Complaint- 10-cv-23580, # 4 Exhibit 4 Old Version ITC 745 Complaint Motorola v Apple, # 5 Exhibit 5 D. Del Complaint- 10-cv-00867, # 6 Exhibit 6 337-TA-745 Notice of Investigation 2010-11-03, # 7 Exhibit 7 Motorola Answer and Counterclaims to Apple Complaint 10-cv-00662 2010-11-09, # 8 Exhibit 8 Complaint for Patent Infringement 10-cv-00661 2010-10-29, # 9 Exhibit 9 Apple's Verified Complaint in 337-TA-750- Stamped Version 2010 10 28, # 10 Exhibit 10 ETSI IPR-Policy, # 11 Exhibit 11 3GPP Working Procedures - full text, # 12 Exhibit 12 IEEE Standards Board Guidelines, # 13 Exhibit 13 TIA Engineering Manual, # 14 Exhibit 14 697 ETSI Essential Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 15 559 ETSI Essential Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 16 898 ETSI Essential Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 17 230 ETSI Essential Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 18 IEEE 802 11 Motorola letter 01Mar1994, # 19 Exhibit 19 IEEE 802.16e Letter of Assurance, # 20 Exhibit 20 TIA Statement from Patent Holder, # 21 Exhibit 21 2011 03 11 CBI-Counterclaims, # 22 Exhibit 22 Lemley Article, # 23 Exhibit 23 Miller Article, # 24 Exhibit 24 697 Patent, # 25 Exhibit 25 Exhibit 21 of Motorola ITC 745 Complaint -Infringement contentions for the 697 Patent) (Peterson, James)
March 11, 2011 6 Brief in Support of 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Peterson, James)
March 11, 2011 5 Affidavit of Richard Lutton filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 3G Cellular Standards and Patents, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Press Release) (Peterson, James)
March 11, 2011 4 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiff Apple Inc. re: 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Sealed Document) filed by Apple Inc. (Sealed Document) (Peterson, James)
March 11, 2011 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Peterson, James)
March 11, 2011 2 Motion to Seal Document 1 Removal, 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 4 Proposed Findings of Facts, 5 Affidavit of Lutton, 6 Brief in Support, 7 Declaration of Cherensky and 8 Exhibits by Plaintiff Apple Inc. (Peterson, James) Modified docket text/relationship on 3/14/2011 (mmo).
March 11, 2011 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from United States International Trade Commission, case number 337-TA-745, filed by Apple Inc. (Filing Fee $350, receipt number 34690010320) (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Counterclaims, # 2 Summons, # 3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Peterson, James) Modified security setting on 3/14/2011. (arw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer A Bauer
Represented By: Meghan Bordonaro
Represented By: Linda J Brewer
Represented By: Brian Cannon
Represented By: Melissa N Chan
Represented By: Edward John DeFranco
Represented By: Richard W Erwine
Represented By: Rebecca Frihart Kennedy
Represented By: Scott W. Hansen
Represented By: Kevin Johnson
Represented By: Lisa Nester Kass
Represented By: David A Nelson
Represented By: Carlos A Rodriguez
Represented By: Alexander Rudis
Represented By: David L. Shaul
Represented By: Lynn Marie Stathas
Represented By: Robert William Stone
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Sullivan
Represented By: Thomas R. Watson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Bryan J Cahill
Represented By: Carrie Anderson
Represented By: Steven Cherensky
Represented By: Mark G. Davis
Represented By: Samuel F. Ernst
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Represented By: Christine Saunders Haskett
Represented By: Robert T. Haslam
Represented By: James Donald Peterson
Represented By: Matthew D Powers
Represented By: Penny Reid
Represented By: Winslow B. Taub
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]