Wisconsin Education Association Council et al v. Walker, Scott et al Featured Case

Defendant: Scott Walker, Michael Huebsch, Gregory L. Gracz, James R. Scott, Judith Neumann and Rodney G. Pasch
Amicus: Kristi Lacroix
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC and Wisconsin State AFL-CIO
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00428
Filed: June 15, 2011
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2012 107 Featured Case ORDER denying 56 Motion to Intervene by Nathan Berish, Ricardo Cruz, Kristi Lacroix; denying 63 Motion to Intervene by Wisconsin Law Enforcement Association, Tracy A. Fuller, Jill A. Buzick, Kathryn M. Rozmarynoski; granting 45 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Kristi Lacroix; granting 91 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Nathan Berish, Ricardo Cruz, Kristi Lacroix; denying 67 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by James R. Holmes; denying 98 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Landmark Legal Foundation; denying 102 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by United States Justice Foundation; granting in part and denying in part 80 Motion to Withdraw Affidavit of Cynthia A. Archer; denying 12 Motion for Oral Argument; denying 24 Supplemental Motion for Oral Argument; denying 105 Unopposed Motion for Oral Argument; granting 48 Motion for Leave to File Instanter Brief in Reply re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; denying as moot 11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; granting in part and denying in part 75 defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part 88 plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Sections 227, 242, 289, 298, 9132 and 9155 of 2011 Wis. Act 10 are declared null and void. Defendants are enjoined from enforcing Wis. Act 10's recertification requirements for general employee unions and from prohibiting deductions for general employee unions, and directed to facilitate voluntary deductions on or before May 31, 2012. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/30/2012. (arw) Modified on 3/30/2012. (rep)
December 30, 2011 106 Disregard. Filed in wrong case. To be filed in correct case (11-cv-462) per conversation with attorney's office. Modified on 12/30/2011 (jaf).
November 28, 2011 105 Unopposed Motion for Oral Argument on Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment re 88 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO. Response due 12/5/2011. (Hawks, Timothy)
November 28, 2011 104 Reply in Support of Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO re: 11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order/Prelim. Injunction. (Hawks, Timothy) Modified docket relationship on 11/29/2011. (mmo)
November 28, 2011 103 Brief in Reply by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO in Support of 88 Motion for Summary Judgment, (Hawks, Timothy)
November 22, 2011 102 Motion for Leave to File by Amicus United States Justice Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Proposed Order) (Fitzgerald, Lane)
November 21, 2011 101 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 97 Motion to Admit Richard P. Hutchinson Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/18/2011. (arw)
November 18, 2011 100 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 99 Motion for Extension of Time. Brief in Reply due 11/28/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/18/2011. (rep)
November 18, 2011 99 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief Supporting Summary Judgment Motion by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 11/25/2011. (Hawks, Timothy)
November 18, 2011 98 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Amicus Landmark Legal Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (Hutchison, Richard)
November 18, 2011 97 Motion to Admit Richard P Hutchison Pro Hac Vice. (Pro Hac Vice fee $50, receipt number 0758-882566) by Amicus Landmark Legal Foundation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Hutchison, Richard)
November 8, 2011 96 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker re: 88 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (McLeod, Eric)
November 8, 2011 95 Brief in Opposition re: 88 Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply Brief in Support of 75 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker. (McLeod, Eric) Modified docket text/docket relationship on 11/9/2011. (mmo)
October 25, 2011 94 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 93 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule by Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott and Scott Walker. Defendants' combined Brief in Reply/Brief in Opposition re: 75 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and 88 Motion for Summary Judgment is due 11/8/2011. Plaintiffs' Brief in Reply in support of 88 Motion for Summary Judgment is due 11/23/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/25/2011. (arw)
October 19, 2011 93 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule by Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 10/26/2011. (McLeod, Eric)
October 14, 2011 92 Corrected Brief in Support of 88 Motion for Summary Judgment, and in Opposition to 75 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO. (Hawks, Timothy)
October 13, 2011 91 Motion for Leave to File Amici Brief of Proposed Intervenors by Intervenor Defendants Nathan Berish, Ricardo Cruz, Kristi Lacroix. (Attachments: # 1 Amici Brief of Proposed Intervenors in Support of Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Injunctive Relief, # 2 Appendix to Amici Brief (Table: Key Features of Wisconsin Bargaining Laws) (Chappell, Milton)
October 13, 2011 90 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO re: 88 Motion for Summary Judgment, 75 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (Hawks, Timothy) Modified on 10/17/2011. (arw)
October 13, 2011 89 Brief in Support of 88 Motion for Summary Judgment, and in Opposition to 75 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO. (Hawks, Timothy)
October 13, 2011 88 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO. Brief in Opposition due 11/3/2011. Brief in Reply due 11/14/2011. (Hawks, Timothy)
September 30, 2011 87 Brief in Reply by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO in Support of 82 Motion for Extension of Time. (Hawks, Timothy) Modified docket relationship on 10/3/2011 (mmo).
September 27, 2011 86 Brief in Opposition re: 82 Motion for Extension of Time and Response to 85 Plaintiffs' Notice of Recent Pertinent Authority by Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker. (McLeod, Eric) Modified docket relationship/docket text on 9/28/2011. (mmo)
September 26, 2011 85 Notice of Recent Pertinent Authority by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO re: 11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Order in UFCW v Brewer (D. Ariz. Sept. 23, 2011) (Hawks, Timothy) Modified docket text on 9/28/2011. (arw)
September 22, 2011 Reset Briefing Deadlines re: 75 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Brief in Opposition due 10/13/2011. Brief in Reply due 10/24/2011. (arw)
September 22, 2011 84 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 82 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/22/2011. (arw)
September 21, 2011 83 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO re: 80 Motion to Withdraw, filed by Judith Neumann, Michael Huebsch, Scott Walker, Rodney G. Pasch, Gregory L. Gracz, James R. Scott (Hawks, Timothy)
September 21, 2011 82 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to 75 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 9/28/2011. (Hawks, Timothy) Modified docket relationship on 9/21/2011. (mmo)
September 20, 2011 81 Certificate of Service by Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker (McLeod, Eric)
September 20, 2011 80 Motion to Withdraw 42 Affidavit of Cynthia A. Archer, for Leave to File Amended Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction Motion, and for Protective Order by Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker. Response due 9/27/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Amended Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO and/or Preliminary Injunction) (McLeod, Eric) Modified on 9/21/2011. (arw)
September 20, 2011 79 Notice of Appearance filed by Bruce Norman Cameron for Intervenor Defendants Nathan Berish, Ricardo Cruz, Kristi Lacroix (Cameron, Bruce)
September 14, 2011 Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due 10/13/2011. (arw)
September 14, 2011 78 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions. Dispositive Motions due 10/13/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/14/2011. (arw)
September 13, 2011 77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 9/20/2011. (Hawks, Timothy)
September 13, 2011 76 Brief in Support of 75 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker (McLeod, Eric)
September 13, 2011 75 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker. Brief in Opposition due 10/4/2011. Brief in Reply due 10/14/2011. (McLeod, Eric)
August 26, 2011 74 Third Affidavit of Timothy E. Hawks filed by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO re: 11 Motion for TRO, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit GG. Draft WERC Rules) (Hawks, Timothy)
August 26, 2011 73 Corrected Notice of Significant Recent Developments by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO re: 11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. (Hawks, Timothy) Modified on 8/29/2011. (arw)
August 26, 2011 72 Disregard - refiled as entry 73 . Modified on 8/26/2011; counsel contacted clerk's office, will refile with correction. (arw)
August 9, 2011 71 Certificate of Service re: 67 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by James R. Holmes. (arw)
August 5, 2011 70 Featured Case ORDER on Status and Scheduling Conference. Dispositive Motions due 9/23/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/4/2011. (arw)
August 4, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 8/4/2011 [:15] (cak)
August 1, 2011 69 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO, Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker (Hawks, Timothy)
July 29, 2011 68 Brief in Reply by Intervenor Defendants Nathan Berish, Ricardo Cruz, Kristi Lacroix in Support of 56 Motion to Intervene as Defendants (Chappell, Milton)
July 28, 2011 67 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by James R. Holmes. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Curiae Brief) (arw)
July 26, 2011 66 Certificate of Service by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO (Hawks, Timothy)
July 26, 2011 65 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO re: 56 Motion to Intervene filed by Ricardo Cruz, Kristi Lacroix, Nathan Berish (Hawks, Timothy)
July 25, 2011 64 Intervenor COMPLAINT, filed by Wisconsin Law Enforcement Association, Kathryn M Rozmarynoski, Jill A. Buzick, Tracy A. Fuller. (Stix, Sally)
July 25, 2011 63 Motion to Intervene by Intervenor Plaintiffs Wisconsin Law Enforcement Association, Tracy A. Fuller, Jill A. Buzick, Kathryn M Rozmarynoski. Response due 8/1/2011. (Stix, Sally)
July 22, 2011 62 Notice of Appearance filed by Steven Carl Kilpatrick for Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Kilpatrick, Steven)
July 19, 2011 61 ANSWER by Intervenor Defendants Nathan Berish, Ricardo Cruz, Kristi Lacroix. (Chappell, Milton)
July 19, 2011 60 Declaration of Kristi Lacroix filed by Intervenor Defendant Kristi Lacroix re: 56 Motion to Intervene (Chappell, Milton)
July 19, 2011 59 Declaration of Ricardo Cruz filed by Intervenor Defendant Ricardo Cruz re: 56 Motion to Intervene (Chappell, Milton)
July 19, 2011 58 Declaration of Nathan Berish filed by Intervenor Defendant Nathan Berish re: 56 Motion to Intervene (Chappell, Milton)
July 19, 2011 57 Brief in Support of 56 Motion to Intervene by Intervenor Defendants Nathan Berish, Ricardo Cruz, Kristi Lacroix (Chappell, Milton)
July 19, 2011 56 Motion to Intervene by Intervenor Defendants Nathan Berish, Ricardo Cruz, Kristi Lacroix. Response due 7/26/2011. (Chappell, Milton)
July 8, 2011 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2011 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (rep)
July 6, 2011 55 Certificate of Service by Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker (McLeod, Eric)
July 6, 2011 54 ANSWER by Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker. (McLeod, Eric)
July 1, 2011 53 Brief in Opposition by Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker re: 48 Motion for Leave to File Instanter a Brief in Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO (Olson, Joseph)
June 30, 2011 52 Certificate of Service by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO (Hawks, Timothy)
June 30, 2011 51 Notice of Appearance filed by Milton L Chappell for Amicus Kristi Lacroix (Chappell, Milton)
June 30, 2011 50 Second Affidavit of Timothy E. Hawks filed by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO re: 11 Motion for TRO, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FF Crist memo 6-22-2011 "Prohibition of Union Dues Deduction") (Hawks, Timothy)
June 30, 2011 49 Brief in Reply by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO in Support of 11 Motion for TRO, (Hawks, Timothy)
June 30, 2011 48 Motion for Leave to File Instanter a Brief in Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO. (Hawks, Timothy)
June 29, 2011 47 Amicus Curiae Appearance entered by Thomas C. Kamenick Amicus Kristi Lacroix (Kamenick, Thomas)
June 27, 2011 46 Notice of Appearance of Eric M. McLeod, Joseph L. Olson and Michael P. Screnock filed by Eric M. McLeod for Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Scott Walker (McLeod, Eric)
June 27, 2011 45 Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by Kristi Lacroix re: 11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion, # 2 Stueck Affidavit in Support of Brief, # 3 Proposed Order) (Esenberg, Richard) Modified event and docket text on 6/28/2011. (arw)
June 27, 2011 44 Certificate of Service by Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker (McLeod, Eric)
June 27, 2011 43 Declaration of Patricia L. Kusenberger filed by Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker re: 12 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 24 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, 11 Motion for TRO, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Doc. from Prof. Firefighters of WI, # 2 Exhibit B - Doc. from WI Prof. Police Assoc., # 3 Exhibit C - Article dated 3/10/11, # 4 Exhibit D - Article dated 2/23/11, # 5 Exhibit E - Article dated 2/21/11, # 6 Exhibit F - Article dated 4/11/11, # 7 Exhibit G - Article dated 4/13/11, # 8 Exhibit H - Article dated 3/1/11, # 9 Exhibit I - Article dated 2/14/11, # 10 Exhibit J - Article dated 3/25/11, # 11 Exhibit K - Article dated 2/17/11, # 12 Exhibit L - Article dated 2/17/11, # 13 Exhibit M - Article dated 2/17/11, # 14 Exhibit N - Article dated 2/17/11, # 15 Exhibit O - Article dated 4/13/11, # 16 Exhibit P - Article dated 2/21/11, # 17 Exhibit Q - Article dated 2/24/11, # 18 Exhibit R - Document circulated by AFL-CIO, # 19 Exhibit S - Document circulated by AFL-CIO, # 20 Exhibit T - Article dated 3/30/11, # 21 Exhibit U - Complaint in 11CV1448, # 22 Exhibit V - 3/10/11 Ltr. to Tom Ellis at M&I Corp.) (McLeod, Eric)
June 27, 2011 42 Affidavit of Cynthia A. Archer filed by Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker re: 24 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, 11 Motion for TRO, 12 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (McLeod, Eric)
June 27, 2011 41 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker re: 24 Supplemental Motion for Oral Argument re 11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction, 12 Motion for Oral Argument re 11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction (McLeod, Eric) Modified on 6/28/2011 (mmo).
June 27, 2011 40 Brief in Opposition by Defendants Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker re: 24 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 12 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 11 Motion for TRO. (McLeod, Eric) Modified event on 6/28/2011. (mmo)
June 21, 2011 39 Certificate of Service re Attorney General J.B. Van Hollen by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO (Hawks, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2011 (mmo).
June 21, 2011 38 Certificate of Service re Representative Jeff Fitzgerald by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO (Hawks, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2011 (mmo).
June 21, 2011 37 Certificate of Service re Senator Michael Ellis by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO (Hawks, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2011 (mmo).
June 21, 2011 36 Certificate of Service by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO (Hawks, Timothy)
June 21, 2011 35 Summons Returned Executed. Rodney G. Pasch served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011. (Hawks, Timothy)
June 21, 2011 34 Summons Returned Executed. Judith Neumann served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011. (Hawks, Timothy)
June 21, 2011 33 Summons Returned Executed. James R. Scott served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011. (Hawks, Timothy)
June 21, 2011 32 Summons Returned Executed. Gregory L. Gracz served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011. (Hawks, Timothy)
June 21, 2011 31 Summons Returned Executed. Michael Huebsch served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011. (Hawks, Timothy)
June 21, 2011 30 Summons Returned Executed. Scott Walker served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011. (Hawks, Timothy)
June 20, 2011 29 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeremiah Collins for Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO (Collins, Jeremiah)
June 20, 2011 28 Notice of Appearance filed by Leon Dayan for Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO (Dayan, Leon)
June 20, 2011 27 Notice of Appearance filed by JASON WALTA for Plaintiff Wisconsin Education Association Council (WALTA, JASON)
June 20, 2011 26 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court is in receipt of plaintiffs' 11 motion for a temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction. It is ordered that: 1) plaintiffs must file proof of service of the complaint and motion, including all documents filed in support, and this order no later than 4:30 p.m. by Tuesday, June 21, 2011; and 2) provided service of process has already been accomplished, defendants shall have until 4:30 p.m. on Monday, June 27, 2011 to respond to the motion. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/20/2011. (lak)
June 20, 2011 25 Notice of Appearance of John West, Leon Dayan, and Jeremiah Collins filed by John West for Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO (West, John)
June 20, 2011 24 Supplemental Motion for Oral Argument re 11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction, 12 Motion for Oral Argument re 11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO. Response due 6/27/2011. (Hawks, Timothy) Modified docket text on 6/21/2011 (mmo).
June 20, 2011 23 Declaration of Joseph Slater filed by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO re: 11 Motion for TRO, (Hawks, Timothy)
June 20, 2011 22 Declaration of Gary Frank filed by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO re: 11 Motion for TRO, (Hawks, Timothy)
June 20, 2011 21 Declaration of Dian Palmer filed by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO re: 11 Motion for TRO, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Table of SEIU Healthcare WI Public Sector Bargaining Units, # 2 Exhibit 2. SEIU Healthcare WI 2008-2009 Contract - State) (Hawks, Timothy)
June 20, 2011 20 Declaration of Richard W. Abelson filed by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO re: 11 Motion for TRO, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Table of AFSCME District Council 48 Contracts, # 2 Exhibit 2. AFSCME DC 48 2007-2008 Contract - Milwaukee County) (Hawks, Timothy)
June 20, 2011 19 Declaration of Richard C. Badger II filed by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO re: 11 Motion for TRO, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Table of AFSCME District Council 40 Bargaining Units, # 2 Exhibit 2. AFSCME Local 3798 Contract, # 3 Exhibit 3. AFSCME Local 1241 Contract) (Hawks, Timothy)
June 20, 2011 18 Declaration of Martin Beil filed by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO re: 11 Motion for TRO, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Wisconsin State Employees Union (WSEU) 2008-2009 Contract - State (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit 1. WSEU 2008-2009 Contract - State (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit 2. WSEU Contract - UWHC Authority Board) (Hawks, Timothy)
June 20, 2011 17 Declaration of Steven Kowalsky filed by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO re: 11 Motion for TRO, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Table of AFT-Wisconsin Bargaining Units, # 2 Exhibit 2. Annotated Whitnall Area Federation of Teachers Contract, # 3 Exhibit 3. Annotated Wisconsin Professional Employees Council Contract) (Hawks, Timothy)
June 20, 2011 16 Declaration of Daniel Burkhalter filed by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO re: 11 Motion for TRO, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Fredonia Education Assn 2007-2009 Contract) (Hawks, Timothy)
June 20, 2011 15 Affidavit of Timothy E. Hawks filed by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO re: 11 Motion for TRO, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Senate Journal, 2/14/2011, # 2 Exhibit B. 2011 Wisconsin Act 10, # 3 Exhibit C. Bob Lang, Director, Legislative Fiscal Bureau (LFB) memo, "Budget Adjustment Legislation," 2/14/2011, # 4 Exhibit D. Legislative Reference Bureau (LRB) note, "Alternative Approach to Collective Bargaining", # 5 Exhibit E. LRB annotated note, "Alternative Approach to Collective Bargaining", # 6 Exhibit F. Wis. Exec. Order #14, 2/11/2011, # 7 Exhibit G. Press release, "Governor Walker Introduces Budget Repair," 2/11/2011, # 8 Exhibit H. Governor Walker letter to educators, 2/14/2011, # 9 Exhibit I. Editorial, "What 'shared' means," 2/16/2011, # 10 Exhibit J. Article, "Biggest Protest Yet," 2/19/2011, # 11 Exhibit K. Article, "Walker Takes Broad Swipe," 2/12/2011, # 12 Exhibit L. Blog post, "Wisconsin GOP Leader Admits the Truth," 3/11/2011, # 13 Exhibit M. Article, "Do-or-die union votes begin in April," 3/14/2011, # 14 Exhibit N. Annotated Wisconsin Employment Peace Act showing portions affected by Act 10, # 15 Exhibit O. Annotated Municipal Employment Relations Act showing portions affected by Act 10, # 16 Exhibit P. Annotated State Employment Labor Relations Act showing portions affected by Act 10, # 17 Exhibit Q. Classification Specification - Police Officer, # 18 Exhibit R. Classification Specification - Fire/Crash Rescue Specialist, # 19 Exhibit S. Press release, "Milwaukee Professional Firefighters Proudly Endorse," 8/13/2010, # 20 Exhibit T. Press release, "Wisconsin Troopers' Association Endorse," 9/13/2010, # 21 Exhibit U. Press release, "West Allis Professional Police Association Endorses," 10/28/2010, # 22 Exhibit V. Press release, "Milwaukee First Responders to Barrett: Fix Open Sky," 10/20/2010, # 23 Exhibit W. Press release, "ICYMI: Wisconsin Sheriffs and Deputy Sheriffs Endorse," 10/22/2010, # 24 Exhibit X. Judith Neumann, Chair, Wisconsin Employment Relations Commission (WERC), letter, 2/18/2011, # 25 Exhibit Y. Wisconsin Law Enforcement Association (WLEA) web page, # 26 Exhibit Z. Marshall Gratz, WERC, email, "your inquiry about sizes of municipal police-fire bargaining units," 3/30/2011, # 27 Exhibit AA. Wis. Exec. Order #1, 1/3/2011, # 28 Exhibit BB. Article, "Walker calls for cuts or big layoffs," 2/11/2011, # 29 Exhibit CC. Circuit Court decision, Ozanne v. Fitzgerald, 5/26/2011, # 30 Exhibit DD. Supreme Court order, Ozanne v. Fitzgerald, 6/14/2011, # 31 Exhibit EE. Article, "GOP lawmaker says police, fire unions 'bought out' colleagues," 6/9/2011) (Hawks, Timothy)
June 20, 2011 14 Brief in Support of 11 Motion for TRO, and/or Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO (Hawks, Timothy)
June 20, 2011 13 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO re: 11 Motion for TRO, filed by AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO , denominated "Statement of Record Facts proposed by Movants in Support of their Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction" (Hawks, Timothy)
June 20, 2011 12 Motion for Oral Argument re 11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO. Response due 6/27/2011. (Hawks, Timothy)
June 20, 2011 11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO. (Hawks, Timothy)
June 15, 2011 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Wisconsin Education Association Council (Hawks, Timothy)
June 15, 2011 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC (Hawks, Timothy)
June 15, 2011 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO (Hawks, Timothy)
June 15, 2011 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO (Hawks, Timothy)
June 15, 2011 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO (Hawks, Timothy)
June 15, 2011 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO (Hawks, Timothy)
June 15, 2011 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Wisconsin State AFL-CIO (Hawks, Timothy)
June 15, 2011 3 Summons Issued as to Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Summons - Michael Huebsch, # 2 Summons - Judith Neumann, # 3 Summons - Rodney G. Pasch, # 4 Summons - James R. Scott, # 5 Summons - Scott Walker) (arw)
June 15, 2011 2 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiffs AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: # 1 Summons to Gregory L. Gracz, # 2 Summons to Michael Huebsch, # 3 Summons to Judith Neumann, # 4 Summons to Rodney G. Pasch, # 5 Summons to James R. Scott, # 6 Summons to Scott Walker, # 7 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hawks, Timothy)
June 15, 2011 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: NORTC, Briefing Guidelines, Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
June 15, 2011 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
June 15, 2011 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Gregory L. Gracz, Michael Huebsch, Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott, Scott Walker. (Filing Fee $350, receipt number 0758-782830) filed by AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO, AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO, Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO, SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC, Wisconsin Education Association Council, Wisconsin State AFL-CIO. (Hawks, Timothy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2011: # 1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (mmo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wisconsin Education Association Council et al v. Walker, Scott et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Walker
Represented By: Eric M. McLeod
Represented By: Joseph Louis Olson
Represented By: Michael P. Screnock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Huebsch
Represented By: Eric M. McLeod
Represented By: Joseph Louis Olson
Represented By: Michael P. Screnock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory L. Gracz
Represented By: Eric M. McLeod
Represented By: Joseph Louis Olson
Represented By: Michael P. Screnock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Scott
Represented By: Eric M. McLeod
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Neumann
Represented By: Eric M. McLeod
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney G. Pasch
Represented By: Eric M. McLeod
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Kristi Lacroix
Represented By: Milton L Chappell
Represented By: Richard M. Esenberg
Represented By: Thomas C. Kamenick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Education Association Council
Represented By: John West
Represented By: JASON WALTA
Represented By: Mark A. Sweet
Represented By: Marianne Goldstein Robbins
Represented By: Barbara Zack Quindel
Represented By: Peggy Lautenschlager
Represented By: Kurt C. Kobelt
Represented By: Timothy E. Hawks
Represented By: Aaron N. Halstead
Represented By: Leon Dayan
Represented By: Jeremiah Collins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Council of County and Municipal Employees, AFSCME, District Council 40, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Leon Dayan
Represented By: Jeremiah Collins
Represented By: Aaron N. Halstead
Represented By: Timothy E. Hawks
Represented By: Kurt C. Kobelt
Represented By: Peggy Lautenschlager
Represented By: Barbara Zack Quindel
Represented By: Marianne Goldstein Robbins
Represented By: Mark A. Sweet
Represented By: John West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin State Employees Union, AFSCME, District Council 24, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Jeremiah Collins
Represented By: Leon Dayan
Represented By: Aaron N. Halstead
Represented By: Timothy E. Hawks
Represented By: Kurt C. Kobelt
Represented By: Peggy Lautenschlager
Represented By: Barbara Zack Quindel
Represented By: Marianne Goldstein Robbins
Represented By: Mark A. Sweet
Represented By: John West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFT-Wisconsin, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Jeremiah Collins
Represented By: Leon Dayan
Represented By: Aaron N. Halstead
Represented By: Timothy E. Hawks
Represented By: Kurt C. Kobelt
Represented By: Peggy Lautenschlager
Represented By: Barbara Zack Quindel
Represented By: Marianne Goldstein Robbins
Represented By: Mark A. Sweet
Represented By: John West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFSCME, District Council 48, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Jeremiah Collins
Represented By: Leon Dayan
Represented By: Aaron N. Halstead
Represented By: Timothy E. Hawks
Represented By: Kurt C. Kobelt
Represented By: Peggy Lautenschlager
Represented By: Barbara Zack Quindel
Represented By: Marianne Goldstein Robbins
Represented By: Mark A. Sweet
Represented By: John West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEIU Healthcare Wisconsin, CTW, CLC
Represented By: Jeremiah Collins
Represented By: Leon Dayan
Represented By: Aaron N. Halstead
Represented By: Timothy E. Hawks
Represented By: Kurt C. Kobelt
Represented By: Peggy Lautenschlager
Represented By: Barbara Zack Quindel
Represented By: Marianne Goldstein Robbins
Represented By: Mark A. Sweet
Represented By: John West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin State AFL-CIO
Represented By: Jeremiah Collins
Represented By: Leon Dayan
Represented By: Aaron N. Halstead
Represented By: Timothy E. Hawks
Represented By: Kurt C. Kobelt
Represented By: Peggy Lautenschlager
Represented By: Barbara Zack Quindel
Represented By: Marianne Goldstein Robbins
Represented By: Mark A. Sweet
Represented By: John West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]