Pulungan, Doli Syarief v. The United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin

Defendant: The United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Plaintiff: Doli Syarief Pulungan
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00470
Filed: July 6, 2011
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of Country
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER reassigning this case to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/23/2012. (jef),(ps)
September 6, 2013 23 Featured Case Order that a followup conference will be held on November 14, 2013. Telephone status conference set for 8:30 AM, 11/14/13, before Judge Barbara B. Crabb. Attorney Duchemin responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5447. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/6/2013. (jef),(ps)
March 4, 2014 27 Featured Case ORDER adjourning the trial set for 3/31/14. Telephone status conference set for 4/30/14 at 8:30 am. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/4/14. (rep)
April 30, 2014 29 Featured Case ORDER: It is ordered that plaintiff Doli Syarief Pulungan's attorney, Gregory T. Everts, is designated as counsel for purposes of obtaining funding from the Western District Bar Association's pro bono fund. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/30/2014. (voc)
February 13, 2012 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file his brief in support of his request for a certificate of innocence. Plaintiff's new deadline is February 27, 2012. Defendant will have until March 12, 2012 to file a response. Plaintiff will have until March 22, 2012 to file a reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/13/2012. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pulungan, Doli Syarief v. The United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doli Syarief Pulungan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]