Carlon Company v. DelaGet, LLC

Intervenor_defendant: Acuity
Plaintiff: Carlon Company
Defendant: DelaGet, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00477
Filed: July 8, 2011
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Waukesha
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2012 106 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Intervenor Defendant Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company, granting its motion for summary judgment, declaring that it has no duty to defend or indemnify Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiff DelaGet, LLC and dismissing Acuity from this case. (JPS/LAK) (arw)
January 3, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendant DelaGet, LLC granting its motion for summary judgment, declaring that third-party defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company has a duty to defend and indemnify DelaGet, LLC; further ordered and adjudged that judgment is entered in favor of DelaGet, LLC and against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company in the amount of $24,187.94 in costs and $75,748.08 in attorneys' fees. (JPS/LAK) (arw)
September 12, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge William M. Conley recused. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/12/2011. (arw)
September 20, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal. District Judge Barbara B. Crabb recused. Case to be reassigned to a visiting judge. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/19/2011. (lak)
May 21, 2012 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J. P. Stadtmueller on 5/21/12 as follows: DENYING 73 defendant and third-party plaintiff's Motion to Strike; GRANTING 53 intervenor defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment - intervenor defendant Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company, has no duty to defend or indemnify defendant and third-party plaintiff Delaget, LLC. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(nam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Carlon Company v. DelaGet, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Acuity
Represented By: Michelle D. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlon Company
Represented By: Douglas Robert Lindstrom
Represented By: Michael Patrick Byrne
Represented By: Steven Bogart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DelaGet, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Henry Boyd
Represented By: Brent A Lorentz
Represented By: David J. Pliner
Represented By: Brooks F Poley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]