Draper, Blake v. Captel, Inc.

Plaintiff: Blake Draper
Defendant: Captel, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00535
Filed: July 27, 2011
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying ruling on pending Stipulation for Conditional Class Certification and Court Authorized Notice pending submission of additional supporting affidavit(s) by 1/12/2012. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/29/2011. (llj)
July 5, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 28 Joint Stipulation for Class Certification and 29 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/5/12. (krj)
July 30, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving notice of class action settlement. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/30/12. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Class Action Settlement) (krj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Draper, Blake v. Captel, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Draper
Represented By: Danielle M. Schroder
Represented By: William Ernest Parsons
Represented By: David C. Zoeller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captel, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Bundy
Represented By: Thomas P. Godar
Represented By: Jeffrey A. McIntyre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]