Home Casual Enterprise Ltd. v. Home Casual, LLC et al

Defendant: Peter Knudsen, Home Casual, LLC, Don Corning, Erin Corning, Peter Hill and Kendra Farley
Counter_claimant: Kendra Farley, Erin Corning, Home Casual, LLC, Peter Hill, Peter Knudsen and Don Corning
Counter_defendant: Home Casual Enterprise Ltd.
Plaintiff: Home Casual Enterprise Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00661
Filed: September 26, 2011
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2012 161 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Hangzhou King-Rex Furniture Industry Co., Ltd., Hangzhou Volly Garden Furniture Co., Ltd., Home Casual Enterprise Ltd., Zhejiang Hemei Leisure Products Co., Ltd. against Home Casual, LLC in the amount of $10,813,493.74 entered pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b). (WMC / PAO) Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 11/19/2012. (llj)
September 10, 2013 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 185 Motion for Leave to File Amended counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint and Motion to Alter or Amend judgment ; Granting 191 Motion for Sanctions in the amount of $2,500.00. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/10/2013. (voc)
September 12, 2013 209 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Hangzhou King-Rex Furniture Industry Co., Ltd., Hangzhou Volly Garden Furniture Co., Ltd., Home Casual Enterprise Ltd., Zhejiang Hemei Leisure Products Co., Ltd. against Home Casual, LLC in the amount of $ 10,813,493.74 and $2,500.00 in attorney fees and costs (WMC / PAO). Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/12/2013. (voc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home Casual Enterprise Ltd. v. Home Casual, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Knudsen
Represented By: Catherine J Furay
Represented By: Margery Tibbetts-Wakefield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Casual, LLC
Represented By: Margery Tibbetts-Wakefield
Represented By: Catherine J Furay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Corning
Represented By: Margery Tibbetts-Wakefield
Represented By: Catherine J Furay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Corning
Represented By: Margery Tibbetts-Wakefield
Represented By: Catherine J Furay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Hill
Represented By: Margery Tibbetts-Wakefield
Represented By: Catherine J Furay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendra Farley
Represented By: Catherine J Furay
Represented By: Margery Tibbetts-Wakefield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Kendra Farley
Represented By: Catherine J Furay
Represented By: Margery Tibbetts-Wakefield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Erin Corning
Represented By: Catherine J Furay
Represented By: Margery Tibbetts-Wakefield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Home Casual, LLC
Represented By: Catherine J Furay
Represented By: Margery Tibbetts-Wakefield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Peter Hill
Represented By: Catherine J Furay
Represented By: Margery Tibbetts-Wakefield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Peter Knudsen
Represented By: Catherine J Furay
Represented By: Margery Tibbetts-Wakefield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Don Corning
Represented By: Catherine J Furay
Represented By: Margery Tibbetts-Wakefield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Home Casual Enterprise Ltd.
Represented By: Peter M. Garson
Represented By: Alan G. B. Kim
Represented By: Christopher J. Stroebel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home Casual Enterprise Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher J. Stroebel
Represented By: Alan G. B. Kim
Represented By: Peter M. Garson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]